Steve Zurba v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Steven Zurba
Defendant: FCA US LLC, DHC Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Fiat of Temecula and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2021cv01824
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation Regarding Plaintiff's Fees, Costs, and Expenses (Doc. #51 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton, the Court enters an Order awarding Plaintiff $46,000.00 for reasonably incurred Attorney's Fees, Costs, and Expenses and retains jurisdiction for 60 days after the issuance of this Order as requested in the Parties' Joint Stipulation Regarding Plaintiff's Fees, Costs, and Expenses (Doc. 51). (jp)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Joint STIPULATION for Attorney Fees in the amount of $46,000.00, Joint STIPULATION for Order Request for Entry of Order filed by STEVE ZURBA Steven Zurba. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dolin, Tionna)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 FINAL JUDGMENT #49 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Plaintiff STEVE ZURBA (Plaintiff) accepted Defendant FCA US LLC's Offer of Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 68 on December 2, 2022. Accordingly, the Court enters JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff pursuant to the terms of the accepted Rule 68 Offer. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lom)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REQUEST for Judgment filed by STEVE ZURBA Steven Zurba. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment) (Dolin, Tionna)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant FCA US, LLC FCA US LLC amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Steven Zurba (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Warranty))(Law, Daniel)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: denying #46 Request for Protective Order re REQUEST for Protective Order for Moran Class Action Confidential Materials #46 . The parties are encouraged to review the Magistrate Judge's procedures regarding protectiveorders. A model protective order can be found at http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorableshashi-h-kewalramani. Accordingly, for the reasons stated above, the Request is DENIED, without prejudice. (dc)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REQUEST for Protective Order for Moran Class Action Confidential Materials filed by Plaintiff Steven Zurba.(Dolin, Tionna)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. #37 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court GRANTS FCA's Motion and DISMISSES Plaintiff's fraud by omission claim, but WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint consistent with this Order within twenty-one (21) days of the issuance of this Order. (jp)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to as to Pltfs 6th Cause of Action for Fraud by Omission #37 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to as to Pltfs 6th Cause of Action for Fraud by Omission #37 filed by Plaintiff Steven Zurba. (Law, Daniel)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to as to Pltfs 6th Cause of Action for Fraud by Omission #37 filed by Plaintiff Steven Zurba. (Law, Daniel)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christine J Haw counsel for Plaintiff Steven Zurba. Adding Christine Haw as counsel of record for Steven Zurba for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Steven Zurba. (Attorney Christine J Haw added to party Steven Zurba(pty:pla))(Haw, Christine)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo counsel for Plaintiff Steven Zurba. Adding Matthew Pardo as counsel of record for Steven Zurba for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Steven Zurba. (Attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo added to party Steven Zurba(pty:pla))(Pardo, Matthew)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge Josephine L. Staton re Joint Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order and Continue Discovery Related Deadlines #38 . See document for further information. (jp)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Joint STIPULATION to Amend Scheduling Order,,,, Terminate Hearings,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,, #14 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to as to Pltfs 6th Cause of Action for Fraud by Omission filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities iso MJOP, #2 Declaration of Atty iso MJOP, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Rogerson, Hailey)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program #35 . The following error(s) was/were found: The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initial judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a magistrate judge. This case is not under that program. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ali Azemoon on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Ali Azemoon added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Azemoon, Ali)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Greg Gruzman on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Greg Gruzman added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Gruzman, Greg)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Hailey Marie Rogerson on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Hailey Marie Rogerson added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Rogerson, Hailey)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #29 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. The Court hereby orders that the request of: FCA US, LLC to substitute Spencer P. Hugret/ GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI LLP who is retained counsel as attorney of record instead of BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP is hereby GRANTED. (rolm)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 First REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Spencer P. Hugret in place of attorney Richard L. Stuhlbarg and Jennifer C. Koo Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney) (Stuhlbarg, Richard)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Steven Zurba. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Steven Zurba. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc. #9 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court finds that Defendant's contentions here are sufficient in establishing that removal was proper. For the above reasons, the Court DENIES Plaintiffs Motion. (See document for further information). (jp)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc. #9 ) and Taking Matter Under SUB MISSION by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the matter is taken under submission, and the hearing set for 5/6/2022, at 10:30am is VACATED. (jp)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiff Steven Zurba. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Steve Zurba for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs' Steve Zurba. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Steven Zurba(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to County of Riverside #9 filed by Plaintiff Steven Zurba. (Law, Daniel)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to County of Riverside #9 filed by Plaintiff Steven Zurba. (Law, Daniel)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Opposition Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to County of Riverside #9 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer C. Koo)(Koo, Jennifer)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Josephine L. Staton - Effective Monday, March 21, 2022, Judge Josephine L. Staton will be located in the First Street U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 8A, on the 8th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 8A of the First Street U.S. Courthouse unless otherwise ordered by the Court. For additional information regarding mandatory chambers copies and the use of Zoom hearings in civil matters, please refer to Judge Staton's Procedures & Schedules Page on the Court's website: https://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-josephine-l-staton. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incomplete docket text; missing name of event and text content. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (Attorney Jennifer Koo added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Koo, Jennifer)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mikaela Marie Jackson counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Mikaela M. Jackson is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Jackson, Mikaela)
January 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiff Steven Zurba. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiff Steven Zurba. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton. (mku)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than April 28, 2023. (mku)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES (In Chambers) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing 12/10/2021, is VACATED and the following schedule is set. Last Day to File a Motion to Add Parties or Amend Pleadings: 3/17/2022. Fact Discovery Cutoff: 10/7/2022. Last Day to File Motions (Excluding Daubert Motions and all other Motions in Limine): 10/21/2022. Last Day to Serve Initial Expert Reports: 10/21/2022. Last Day to Serve Rebuttal Expert Reports: 11/18/2022. Expert Discovery Cutoff: 12/16/2022. Last Day to Conduct Settlement Proceedings: 4/28/2023. Last Day to File Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions: 6/2/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2023 at 10:30 AM. (See document for further information). (jp)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court, on its own motion, hereby VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for December 17, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. The Court will issue a separate Scheduling Order pursuant to the parties' Joint 26(f) Report. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 to 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Steven Zurba.. (Law, Daniel)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel A Law on behalf of Plaintiff Steven Zurba (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Steven Zurba(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to County of Riverside #9 filed by Plaintiff Steven Zurba. (Kuemerle, Karin)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to County of Riverside filed by Plaintiff Steven Zurba. Motion set for hearing on 5/6/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration Declaration of Karin Kuemerle in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) (Kuemerle, Karin)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Plaintiff Steven Zurba (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Steven Zurba(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): The case initiating documents such as the Civil Cover Sheet and Notice of Interested Parties were incorrectly filed as attachments. Please utilize the CM/ECF search tool to locate the appropriate events for filing. No further action is required unless directed by the Court. (jtil)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. A Scheduling Conference is set for Friday 12/17/2021 at 10:30 a.m. See attached Order for details. (eva)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (eva)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Josephine L. Staton. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:21-cv-01824 JLS (SHKx). (jtil)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Steven Zurba in Riverside Superior Court on 3/15/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant FCA US LLC in Riverside Superior Court on 4/19/2021, attached as Exhibit D. (jtil)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside, case number CVSW2102070 with filing fee previously paid ($402.00 paid on 10/27/2021, receipt number 32228028), filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration Declaration of Richard L. Stuhlbarg in Support of Defendant FCA US LLC's Notice of Removal, #3 Declaration Declaration of Mikaela M. Jackson in Support of Defendant FCA US LLC's Notice of Removal, #4 Notice of Interested Parties) (Attorney Mikaela Marie Jackson added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Jackson, Mikaela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steve Zurba v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Zurba
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Pardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Mikaela Marie Jackson
Represented By: Richard L Stuhlbarg
Represented By: Jennifer Koo
Represented By: Ali Azemoon
Represented By: Greg Gruzman
Represented By: Hailey Marie Rogerson
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHC Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Fiat of Temecula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?