Vanna Chanhkhiao v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Vanna Chanhkhiao
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kikolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2021cv01842
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Vanna Chanhkhiao, upon Defendant Kikolo Kijakazi served on 11/5/2021, answer due 2/3/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Ealy Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Yancey, Martha)
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kikolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Tina Naicker added to party Kikolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Naicker, Tina)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers): ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (Joint Stipulation) by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: 1. Plaintiff shall promptly serve the summons and complaint on the government in accordance with Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff shall file an appropriate proof of service within 30 days of the date of this Order. Government counsel must file a notice of appearance within 30 days of service of the action. re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.] (es)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kikolo Kijakazi. (et)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Vanna Chanhkhiao. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Yancey, Martha)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Vanna Chanhkhiao, (Yancey, Martha)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Vanna Chanhkhiao. (Yancey, Martha)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32250851 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Vanna Chanhkhiao. (Attorney Martha Woods Yancey added to party Vanna Chanhkhiao(pty:pla))(Yancey, Martha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanna Chanhkhiao v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanna Chanhkhiao
Represented By: Martha Woods Yancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kikolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Tina Naicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?