Chasmine Shaw v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: CHASMINE SHAW
Defendant: KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC. and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2021cv01923
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Filing 30 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Riverside County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Riverside County Superior Court. (twdb)
February 24, 2022 Filing 29 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: GRANTING Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand (Dkt. No. #11 ); and VACATING the 2/28/22 Hearing. Case Remanded to Riverside County Superior Court. Case Number CVRI2102203. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (twdb)
February 24, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David R Markham on behalf of Plaintiff Chasmine Shaw (Attorney David R Markham added to party Chasmine Shaw(pty:pla))(Markham, David)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #24 Plaintiff Chasmine Shaw's Request for Leave to Appear Telephonically on Motion to Strike Hearing. NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. (twdb)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #23 Plaintiff Chasmine Shaw's Request for Leave to Appear by Zoom or Telephonically on Motion to Remand hearing. NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. (twdb)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. On the Court's own motion, the Motion to Strike Class Allegations and Motion to Dismiss Case #12 , and the Motion to Remand Case #11 set for hearing on January 31, 2022, is hereby CONTINUED to February 28, 2022, at 9:00 A.M. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 18, 2022 Filing 24 REQUEST for Leave of Richard E. Quintilone, II; Jeffrey T. Green to Appear for Telephonic/Zoom Appearance for Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff Chasmine Shaw. Request set for hearing on 1/31/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Request to Appear Telephonically for Motion to Strike Hearing) (Quintilone, Richard)
January 18, 2022 Filing 23 REQUEST for Leave of Richard E. Quintilone, II; Jeffrey T. Green to Appear for Telephonic/Zoom Appearance for Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Chasmine Shaw. Request set for hearing on 1/31/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Request to Appear Telephonically for Motion to Remand Hearing) (Quintilone, Richard)
January 18, 2022 Filing 22 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside County Superior Court #11 filed by Plaintiff Chasmine Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey T. Green ISO Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case)(Quintilone, Richard)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO APPEAR REMOTELY BY ZOOM OR TELEPHONICALLY AT HEARING ON ITS MOTION TO STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS AND MOTION TO DISMISS BASED ON FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #16 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. It is hereby ordered that counsel for Defendants, Bailey K. Bifoss, is permitted to appear remotely at the January 31, 2022 hearing on its Motion to Strike Class Allegations and Motion to Dismiss Based on Failure to State a Claim. Counsel is referred to the courts website for the Zoom link. (lom)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO APPEAR REMOTELY BY ZOOM OR TELEPHONICALLY AT HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND #17 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. It is hereby ordered that counsel for Defendants, Andrew M. McNaught, is permitted to appear at the January 31, 2022 hearing on Plaintiff Chasmine Shaw's Motion to Remand. Counsel is referred to the courts website for the Zoom link. (lom)
January 14, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside County Superior Court #11 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nam, Yoon-Woo)
January 14, 2022 Filing 18 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Class Allegations Amended Complaint, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 (Defendant's Reply ISO Motion) filed by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (McNaught, Andrew)
January 12, 2022 Filing 17 REQUEST for Leave of Bailey K. Bifoss to Appear for Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Remotely by Zoom filed by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. Request set for hearing on 1/31/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nam, Yoon-Woo)
January 12, 2022 Filing 16 REQUEST for Leave of Bailey K. Bifoss to Appear for Motion to Strike Remotely by Zoom filed by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. Request set for hearing on 1/31/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nam, Yoon-Woo)
January 10, 2022 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Class Allegations Amended Complaint, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 filed by Plaintiff Chasmine Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey T. Green ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Strike and Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration Objection to Declaration of Bifoss ISO Opposition to Motion to Strike and Motion to Dismiss)(Quintilone, Richard)
January 10, 2022 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside County Superior Court #11 filed by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of B. Bifoss, #2 Exhibit 1 to B. Bifoss Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to B. Bifoss Declaration)(Nam, Yoon-Woo)
January 10, 2022 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Yoon-Woo Nam counsel for Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. Adding Yoon-Woo Nam as counsel of record for Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Attorney Yoon-Woo Nam added to party Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.(pty:dft))(Nam, Yoon-Woo)
December 17, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Class Allegations Amended Complaint, , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/31/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bailey K. Bifoss in Support of Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Class Allegations and Motion to Dismiss Based on Failure to State a Claim, #2 Proposed Order Granting Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Class Allegations and Motion to Dismiss Based on Failure to State a Claim) (McNaught, Andrew)
December 13, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Chasmine Shaw. Motion set for hearing on 1/31/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points and Authorities ISO Motion for Remand, #2 Declaration Declaration of JTG ISO Motion for Remand, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Quintilone, Richard)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
November 16, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. answer now due 12/20/2021, re Amended Complaint, filed by defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc..(McNaught, Andrew)
November 15, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap)
November 11, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiff Chasmine Shaw. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/10/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1)(ghap)
November 11, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Chasmine Shaw. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/12/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap) Modified on 11/15/2021 (gHap).
November 11, 2021 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 11-11-2021. (Rowley, Christian)
November 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC., identifying Kaiser Foundation Health Plan. (Rowley, Christian)
November 11, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC. (Rowley, Christian)
November 11, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.. (Rowley, Christian)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County, case number CVRI2102203 Receipt No: ACACDC-32311961 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christian Rowley, #2 Declaration of Leonard Prymus) (Attorney Christian J Rowley added to party KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.(pty:dft))(Rowley, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chasmine Shaw v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHASMINE SHAW
Represented By: Richard E Quintilone, II
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Green
Represented By: David R Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.
Represented By: Christian J Rowley
Represented By: Andrew M McNaught
Represented By: Bailey K Bifoss
Represented By: Yoon-Woo Nam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?