Kevin Payton v. City of Shreveport Louisiana et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Payton
Defendant: City of Shreveport Louisiana, Shreveport Police Department, TD Weldon, Roy Nations, Shreveport City Court Public Defender Office, Caddo Parish District Attorney Office, Caddo Correctional Center, Betty Bryant, Justin Lister, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Vice President Kamala Harris, Governor Gavin Newsome, Senator Dianne Feinstein, Congressman Pete Aguilar, Attorney Frank Woo, Attorney Jeffrey Lawrence, City of San Bernardino California, San Bernardino Police Department, San Bernardino County Distict Attorney Office, San Bernardino County Public Defender Office, San Bernardino County Court, Governor John Bel Edwards and DOES 1 through 100 inclusive
Case Number: 5:2021cv02041
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Referring Judge: Margo A Rocconi
2 Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2022 Filing 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED that the District Court issue an order: (1) accepting this Report and Recommendation; and (2) directing Judgment be entered dismissing this action with prejudice. Re Complaint - (Referred) #1 (es)
February 3, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. Objections to R&R due by 3/7/2022. (es)
January 26, 2022 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint, #13 as to Defendant(s) Pete Aguilar, Betty Bryant, Caddo Correctional Center, Caddo Parish District Attorney Office, City of San Bernardino California, John Bel Edwards, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Dianne Feinstein, Kamala Harris, Jeffrey Lawrence, Justin Lister, Roy Nations, Gavin Newsome, San Bernardino County Court, San Bernardino County Distict Attorney Office, San Bernardino County Public Defender Office, Shreveport City Court Public Defender Office, Frank Woo. (es) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/26/2022: #1 Attachment to Summons) (es).
January 24, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO CHANGE OF VENUE AND AMENDED VIOLATIONS OF CIVIL RIGHTS (42 USC 1983) #9 filed by Plaintiff Kevin Payton (es)
January 24, 2022 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Pete Aguilar, Betty Bryant, Caddo Correctional Center, Caddo Parish District Attorney Office, City of San Bernardino California, John Bel Edwards, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Dianne Feinstein, Kamala Harris, Jeffrey Lawrence, Justin Lister, Roy Nations, Gavin Newsome, San Bernardino County Court, San Bernardino County Distict Attorney Office, San Bernardino County Public Defender Office, San Bernardino Police Department, Shreveport City Court Public Defender Office, TD Weldon, Frank Woo; Party City of Shreveport Louisiana and Shreveport Police Department terminated amending Complaint - (Referred) #1 , filed by plaintiff Kevin Payton(es)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. IT IS ORDERED THAT within twenty-one (21) days of the service date of this Order, by January 24, 2022, Plaintiff must choose one (1) of the following three (3) options: 1. Plaintiff may file a First Amended Complaint ("FAC") to attempt to cure the deficiencies discussed above. 2. Alternatively, Plaintiff may voluntarily dismiss the action without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a). Finally, Plaintiff may file a notice with the Court that he intends to stand on the allegations in his Complaint. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 . [See order for further details.] (es)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi: IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby GRANTED. Granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (es)
January 5, 2022 Filing 12 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Western District of Louisiana, 5:22-cv-00025 filed 1/5/2022. (iv)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF LOUISIANA by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Louisiana Defendants and the claims against the Louisiana Defendants are SEVERED and TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Louisiana for further disposition. The Clerk shall effect such severance and transfer and notify Plaintiff. re Complaint - (Referred) #1 [See order for further details.] (es)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi: granting #6 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (et)
December 16, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kevin Payton. (et)
December 16, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Kevin Payton. (et)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:21-cv-02041 JFW(MAR). (rn)
December 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and referred to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (jtil)
December 6, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Kevin Payton. (jtil)
December 6, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kevin Payton. (jtil)
December 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Kevin Payton filed against All Defendants. Case assigned to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and referred to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (Attachments: #1 CV71) (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kevin Payton v. City of Shreveport Louisiana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Payton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Shreveport Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shreveport Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shreveport City Court Public Defender Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caddo Parish District Attorney Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caddo Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Lister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vice President Kamala Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Gavin Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senator Dianne Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Congressman Pete Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney Frank Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney Jeffrey Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Bernardino California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Bernardino Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Bernardino County Distict Attorney Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Bernardino County Public Defender Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Bernardino County Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor John Bel Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?