Guadalupe Arechiaga v. United States Postal Service et al
Plaintiff: GUADALUPE ARECHIGA and Guadalupe Arechiaga
Defendant: United States Postal Service and PATRICIA ANN RYAN
Case Number: 5:2021cv02044
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
December 7, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
December 7, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form, #7 . Document # 7 Due to clerical error. The docket clerk docketed the Notice of Deficiencies with wrong dated filed. The dated filed need to be 12/6/2021 and not 12/7/2021. (ghap)
December 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
December 7, 2021 Filing 7 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 12/7/2021, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 9] NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap) Modified on 12/7/2021 (ghap).
December 7, 2021 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Patricia Ann Ryan, United States Postal Service. (ghap)
December 7, 2021 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
December 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
December 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap)
December 6, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF COUNSEL GUADALUPE ARECHIGA. (Rios, Ralph)
December 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32434073 - Fee: $402, filed by PLAINTIFF COUNSEL GUADALUPE ARECHIGA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Ralph R Rios added to party GUADALUPE ARECHIGA(pty:pla))(Rios, Ralph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guadalupe Arechiaga v. United States Postal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUADALUPE ARECHIGA
Represented By: Ralph R Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Arechiaga
Represented By: Ralph R. Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICIA ANN RYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?