Sherlie Virginia Burns v. Bridge Home Health Riverside, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sherlie Burns and Sherlie Virginia Burns
Defendant: Bridge Home Health Riverside, LLC, Natasha Gamboa and Does 1-50, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2021cv02045
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #12 by Judge John W. Holcomb. In light of the ongoing settlement discussions, Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to February 11, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
January 11, 2022 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to February 11, 2022 re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Bridge Home Health Riverside, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rubaum, David)
January 5, 2022 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alexandra Concetta Martino counsel for Defendant Bridge Home Health Riverside, LLC. Alexandra C. Martino is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants BRIDGE HOME HEALTH RIVERSIDE, LLC and NATASHA GAMBOA. (Martino, Alexandra)
January 5, 2022 Filing 10 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Bridge Home Health Riverside, LLC.(Rubaum, David)
January 5, 2022 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David Jonathan Rubaum counsel for Defendant Bridge Home Health Riverside, LLC. Adding David J. Rubaum as counsel of record for Defendants BRIDGE HOME HEALTH RIVERSIDE, LLC and NATASHA GAMBOA for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants BRIDGE HOME HEALTH RIVERSIDE, LLC and NATASHA GAMBOA. (Rubaum, David)
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Repond as to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Bridge Home Health Riverside, LLC.(Martino, Alexandra)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
December 8, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
December 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
December 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (car)
December 7, 2021 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Bridge Home Health Riverside, LLC, (Martino, Alexandra)
December 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Bridge Home Health Riverside, LLC, Natasha Gamboa. (Martino, Alexandra)
December 7, 2021 FILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. ACACDC-32436273 for $402 filing fee. (Martino, Alexandra)
December 6, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Bridge Home Health Riverside, LLC, Does 1-50, inclusive, filed by Plaintiff Sherlie Virginia Burns. Filed in State Court on 12/6/2021 Submitted with Notice of Removal #1 (car)
December 6, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Sherlie Virginia Burns, upon Defendant Bridge Home Health Riverside, LLC served on 10/22/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Natasha Gamboa Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. Submitted with Exhibit B to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
December 6, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Sherlie Virginia Burns, upon Defendant Natasha Gamboa served on 10/22/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Scarlet Roman Lena Person in Charge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. Submitted with Exhibit B to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
December 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, case number CVRI2103005 Fee Exemption in accordance with statute, filed by Defendants Bridge Home Health Riverside, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Alexandra Concetta Martino added to party Bridge Home Health Riverside, LLC(pty:dft))(Martino, Alexandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherlie Virginia Burns v. Bridge Home Health Riverside, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherlie Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherlie Virginia Burns
Represented By: Timothy Paul Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridge Home Health Riverside, LLC
Represented By: Alexandra Concetta Martino
Represented By: David Jonathan Rubaum
Represented By: James J Kjar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natasha Gamboa
Represented By: David Jonathan Rubaum
Represented By: James J Kjar
Represented By: Alexandra Concetta Martino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?