Juan Jesus Flores v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Mr Juan Jesus Flores and Juan Jesus Flores
Defendant: Social Security Administration and Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2021cv02081
Filed: December 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV21-2081 KES on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
January 4, 2022 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Commissioner of Social Security Administration(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
January 4, 2022 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Juan Jesus Flores, upon Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 12/29/2021, answer due 3/29/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C Veloz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Emily Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to LSPS. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Monge, Troy)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. The Court has issued its Order Re: Procedures in Social Security Appeal. The parties are further ordered to comply with the following additional procedures. [See document for further details.] (et)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL(JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. [See document for details.] (et)
December 17, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Juan Jesus Flores. (Monge, Troy)
December 16, 2021 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (jtil)
December 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff Juan Jesus Flores. (Monge, Troy)
December 14, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Juan Jesus Flores, (Monge, Troy)
December 14, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Juan Jesus Flores. (Monge, Troy)
December 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32476182 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Juan Jesus Flores. (Attorney Troy Dana Monge added to party Juan Jesus Flores(pty:pla))(Monge, Troy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juan Jesus Flores v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr Juan Jesus Flores
Represented By: Troy Dana Monge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Jesus Flores
Represented By: Troy Dana Monge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Tarn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?