Rigoberto Cabral Guzman v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Rigoberto Cabral Guzman
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2021cv02099
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV21-2099 on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
January 4, 2022 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Susan L Smith added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Smith, Susan)
January 3, 2022 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Rigoberto Cabral Guzman. (Benavides, Francesco)
January 3, 2022 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rigoberto Cabral Guzman, upon Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi served on 12/27/2021, answer due 3/28/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Torres. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Eddie Anderson. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to No Data. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipts)(Benavides, Francesco)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. Plaintiff shall serve the summons and complaint on the government promptly in accordance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(i) and 20 C.F.R. 423.1. Plaintiff shall file an appropriate proof of service within thirty (30) days after the date of this Order. [See document for further details.] (et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2021: #1 Consent) (et).
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (et)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (et)
December 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (lh)
December 16, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Rigoberto Cabral Guzman. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Benavides, Francesco)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Rigoberto Cabral Guzman. (Benavides, Francesco)
December 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rigoberto Cabral Guzman, (Benavides, Francesco)
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Rigoberto Cabral Guzman. (Benavides, Francesco)
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Rigoberto Cabral Guzman. (Attorney Francesco P Benavides added to party Rigoberto Cabral Guzman(pty:pla))(Benavides, Francesco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rigoberto Cabral Guzman v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rigoberto Cabral Guzman
Represented By: Francesco P Benavides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Susan L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?