Donald Ray White v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Donald Ray White
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2021cv02160
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Service slip to Attorney General, SSA re Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA,, #10 (Rosales, Steven)
January 19, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV21-2160 RAO on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
January 18, 2022 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Susan L Smith added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Smith, Susan)
January 13, 2022 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Donald Ray White. (Rosales, Steven)
January 13, 2022 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Donald Ray White, upon Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi served on 1/10/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Office of Regional Counsel,. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rosales, Steven)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. See Order for complete details. [Chambers courtesy copies not required.] (dml)
January 3, 2022 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (dml)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #3 . (dml)
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Donald Ray White, (Rosales, Steven)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Donald Ray White. (Rosales, Steven)
December 29, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Donald Ray White. (Rosales, Steven)
December 29, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Donald Ray White. (Rosales, Steven)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Donald Ray White. (Attorney Steven G Rosales added to party Donald Ray White(pty:pla))(Rosales, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donald Ray White v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Ray White
Represented By: Steven G Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Susan L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?