Steven Christopher Homer v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Steven Christopher Homer
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2021cv02165
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV21-2165 AFM on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
January 18, 2022 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Tina Naicker added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Naicker, Tina)
January 14, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Steven Christopher Homer. (Krank, Laura)
January 14, 2022 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Steven Christopher Homer, upon Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi served on 1/5/2022, answer due 4/5/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Attorney General. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Office of Regional Counsel,. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Krank, Laura)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers): ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL(Joint Stipulation) by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . [See order for further details.] (es)
December 29, 2021 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (car)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Steven Christopher Homer, (Krank, Laura)
December 29, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Steven Christopher Homer. (Krank, Laura)
December 29, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Steven Christopher Homer. (Krank, Laura)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32548154 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Steven Christopher Homer. (Attorney Laura E Krank added to party Steven Christopher Homer(pty:pla))(Krank, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steven Christopher Homer v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Christopher Homer
Represented By: Laura E Krank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Tina Naicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?