Trista Parker v. FCA US, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Trista Parker
Defendant: FCA US, LLC, DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2022cv00028
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATES AND RELATED DEADLINES [ECF NO. #38 ] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court, having considered the parties Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial Dates and Related Deadlines (ECF No. 38), and finding good cause therefor, hereby GRANTS the stipulation. The pretrial and trial deadlines are amended as follows: Jury Trial is set for at 1/15/2024 at 8:30 AM. The final pretrial conference is set for 12/20/2023 at 9:00 a.m. The last day to hear motions by 9/21/2023. The last date to conduct settlement conference is 10/11/2023. The foregoing deadlines supersede and replace those included in the Civil Trial Order issued by this Court on July 12, 2022, and found at ECF No. 25. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
February 23, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Stipulation to Continue, #38 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed orders SHALL NOT have counsels name, address, and phone number in the upper left corner. Please refer to the Judge's Procedure page at http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-maame-ewusi-mensah-frimpong for counsel to review the Proposed Order Sample. A new proposed order must be re-submitted in accordance with the Judge's procedures and posted sample. (yl)
February 21, 2023 Filing 38 Joint STIPULATION to Continue CONTINUE TRIAL DATES AND RELATED DEADLINES from August 28, 2023 to January 15, 2024 filed by Plaintiff Trista Parker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED ORDER] ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATES AND RELATED DEADLINES, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF ARIEL HARMAN-HOLMES IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATES AND RELATED DEADLINES)(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
February 14, 2023 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nino Sanaia counsel for Plaintiff Trista Parker. Adding Nino Sanaia as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Trista Parker. (Attorney Nino Sanaia added to party Trista Parker (pty:pla))(Sanaia, Nino)
August 31, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program #35 . The following error(s) was/were found: The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initial judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a magistrate judge. This case is not under that program. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
August 30, 2022 Filing 35 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Jeffery J Fadeff added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Fadeff, Jeffery)
August 29, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
August 29, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Reshma A Bajaj on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Reshma A Bajaj added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Bajaj, Reshma)
August 29, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney James Patrick Mayo on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney James Patrick Mayo added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Mayo, James)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #28 by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court hereby orders that attorney Spencer Peter Hugret shall substitute Michael Benjamin Sachs as attorney of record for Defendant, FCA US, LLC. (yl)
August 11, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Lodging #28 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request for Substitution of Counsel G01. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 11, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request for Substitution of Counsel G01. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 10, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #27 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PROPOSED) ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY)(Sachs, Michael)
August 10, 2022 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Benjamin Sachs counsel for Defendant FCA US, LLC. Michael B. Sachs; Candace J. Frazier is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Sachs, Michael)
July 28, 2022 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Trista Parker. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Trista Parker. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 13, 2022 Filing 24 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court is in receipt of the Joint Report filed on 07/01/2022 #21 . As such, the Court takes the Scheduling Conference off calendar, with no appearances necessary on July 14, 2022. The Court will issue the Scheduling Order based solely on the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b). IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CIVL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Scheduling Order governing this action is set forth in the Schedule of Pretrial and TrialDates chart. Amended Pleadings due by 8/25/2022. Discovery cut-off 2/22/2023. Exhibit List due by 7/12/2023. Witness List due by 7/12/2023. Motions due by 5/18/2023. Motions in Limine to be filed by 7/12/2023. Status Report due by 7/12/2023. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 5/31/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2023 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 8/28/2023 08:30 AM. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
July 11, 2022 Filing 23 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Counsel shall disregard docket entry 22 as it was issued in error. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 11, 2022 Filing 22 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court advances the Scheduling Conference to 8/4/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Counsel shall take notice of this new date. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 1, 2022 Filing 21 STATEMENT Joint Rule 26(f) Conference Statement (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
June 2, 2022 Filing 20 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court continues the Scheduling Conference to 7/14/2022 at 10:00 AM. Counsel shall take notice of this new date. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 26, 2022 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiff Trista Parker. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Trista Parker and Stephen Parker for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff's Trista Parker and Stephen Parker. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Trista Parker (pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
March 17, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Scheduling Conference set at June 23, 2022 Time: 10:00 AM. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT GOVERNS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom) Modified on 3/17/2022 (lom).
March 16, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant FCA US LLC FCA US, LLC.(Attorney Michael Benjamin Sachs added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Sachs, Michael)
February 25, 2022 Filing 15 STATEMENT Case Management Statement Pursuant to Reassignment Order filed by Plaintiff Trista Parker (Kuemerle, Karin)
February 24, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Trista Parker, upon Defendant FCA US, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 2/22/2022, answer due 3/15/2022. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Douglas Forrest, Registered Agent. (Dolin, Tionna)
February 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong, Please refer to the attached order for complete details. IT IS SO ORDERED. (kd)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#22-007) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong, this case is transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal to the calendar of Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:22-cv-00028 MEMF(SHKx). (rn)
January 31, 2022 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant FCA US, LLC. (twdb)
January 29, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiff Trista Parker. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiff Trista Parker. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 28, 2022 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Trista Parker. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 27, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Plaintiff Trista Parker (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Trista Parker (pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
January 7, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
January 7, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (et)
January 6, 2022 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Trista Parker, identifying Trista Parker. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Trista Parker. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32582997 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Trista Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2013 Dodge Ram 1500 Express Warranty) (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Trista Parker (pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trista Parker v. FCA US, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trista Parker
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Sachs
Represented By: James Patrick Mayo
Represented By: Jeffery J Fadeff
Represented By: Reshma A Bajaj
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?