Empyreal Enterprises, LLC v. The United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Empyreal Enterprises, LLC doing business as Empyreal Logistics
Defendant: The United States of America, Merrick Garland, Christopher A. Wray, Kristi Koons Johnson, Drug Enforcement Administration, Anne Milgram, Shannon D. Dicus, U.S. Department of Justice and Federal Bureau of Investigation
Case Number: 5:2022cv00094
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
2 Judge: Fred W Slaughter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DISMISSING SHERIFF WITH PREJUDICE #80 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter that the above-captioned action is dismissed with prejudice against Defendant Shannon D. Dicus, San Bernardino County Sheriff-Coroner, in his official capacity as the head of the San Bernardino County Sheriff's Office, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the FRCP, each side to bear its own costs, fees, and expenses. The Court's entry of the order disposes of the entire action. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
May 6, 2022 Filing 80 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule Procedure, Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Shannon D. Dicus, San Bernardino County Sheriff-Coroner, in his official capacity Shannon D. Dicus filed by Defendants Shannon D. Dicus. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing Sheriff with Prejudice)(Williams, Heidi)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Please refer to Order for complete details. (jp)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#22-068) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Slaughter, Fred W., this case is transferred from Judge John W. Holcomb to the calendar of Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:22-cv-00094-FWS-SHKx. (ap)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SHERIFF TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #75 by Judge John W. Holcomb. The Stipulation is GRANTED. Defendant SHANNON D. DICUS, San Bernardino County Sheriff- Coroner, in his official capacity, shall file a response to Plaintiff EMPYREAL ENTERPRISES, LLC d/b/a EMPYREAL LOGISTICSs First Amended Complaint on or before May 13, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
April 13, 2022 Filing 76 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Defendants Drug Enforcement Administration, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Merrick Garland, Kristi Koons Johnson, Anne Milgram, The United States of America, U.S. Department of Justice, Christopher A. Wray. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Seidman, Talya)
April 13, 2022 Filing 75 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Amended Complaint/Petition #74 filed by Defendant Shannon D. Dicus. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time for Sheriff to Respond to First Amended Complaint)(Williams, Heidi)
March 16, 2022 Filing 74 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants Empyreal Enterprises, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC(Alban, Daniel)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING CONSENT MOTION AND STIPULATION by Judge John W. Holcomb #72 . Stipulation is APPROVED. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint on or before March 16, 2022. Federal Defendants and Sheriff Dicus shall file their respective responses to the Amended Complaint on or before April 15, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
February 25, 2022 Filing 72 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alban, Daniel)
February 10, 2022 Filing 71 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Shannon D. Dicus answer now due 3/16/2022, filed by Defendant Shannon D. Dicus.(Williams, Heidi)
February 2, 2022 Filing 70 SEALED DOCUMENT O'Gorman Declaration re Renewed EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction #36 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #60 filed by Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Alban, Daniel)
February 2, 2022 Filing 69 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC, upon Defendant Shannon D. Dicus served on 1/24/2022, answer due 2/14/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Civil Liabilities Clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Alban, Daniel)
February 2, 2022 Filing 68 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC, upon Defendant Anne Milgram served on 1/24/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Alban, Daniel)
February 2, 2022 Filing 67 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC, upon Defendant Drug Enforcement Administration served on 1/24/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Alban, Daniel)
February 2, 2022 Filing 66 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC, upon Plaintiff Kristi Koons Johnson served on 1/24/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Alban, Daniel)
February 2, 2022 Filing 65 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC, upon Defendant Christopher A. Wray served on 1/24/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Alban, Daniel)
February 2, 2022 Filing 64 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC, upon Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 1/24/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Alban, Daniel)
February 2, 2022 Filing 63 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC, upon Defendant Merrick Garland served on 1/24/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Alban, Daniel)
February 2, 2022 Filing 62 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC, upon Defendant U.S. Department of Justice served on 1/24/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Alban, Daniel)
February 2, 2022 Filing 61 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC, upon Defendant The United States of America served on 1/24/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Alban, Daniel)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL [49 by Judge John W. Holcomb: (See document for further details) (yl)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER [ECF No. 36] by Judge John W. Holcomb. (yl)
January 28, 2022 Filing 58 OBJECTIONS to Reply (Motion related) #51 filed by Defendants Drug Enforcement Administration, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Merrick Garland, Kristi Koons Johnson, Anne Milgram, The United States of America, U.S. Department of Justice, Christopher A. Wray. (Seidman, Talya)
January 28, 2022 Filing 57 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLCto Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #56 (Bass, David)
January 28, 2022 Filing 56 Defendant Shannon D. Dicus Objection To Plaintiffs New Evidence Filed With Reply Opposition re: Renewed EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction #36 filed by Defendant Shannon D. Dicus. (Williams, Heidi)
January 27, 2022 Filing 55 DECLARATION of Michael Jerome in support of Renewed EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction #36 filed by Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. (Bass, David)
January 27, 2022 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Eric Picardal in support of Renewed EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction #36 filed by Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. (Bass, David)
January 27, 2022 Filing 53 DECLARATION of David Bass in support of Renewed EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction #36 filed by Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bass, David)
January 27, 2022 Filing 52 REPLY Renewed EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction #36 re Sheriff's Opposition filed by Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. (Bass, David)
January 27, 2022 Filing 51 REPLY Renewed EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction #36 re Federal Defendants' Opposition filed by Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. (Bass, David)
January 27, 2022 Filing 50 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Declaration and Exhibits A, B, C, D under seal #49 filed by Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit A, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit B, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit C, #4 Unredacted Document Exhibit D)(Bass, David)
January 27, 2022 Filing 49 APPLICATION to file document Declaration and Exhibits A, B, C, D under seal filed by Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Exhibit A, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit B, #3 Redacted Document Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Bass, David)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: granting #38 Non-Resident Attorney Daniel L. Alban APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Empyreal Enterprises, LLC, dba Empyreal Logistics, designating Daniella Litvak as local counsel. (lom)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: granting #39 Non-Resident Attorney Kirby T. West APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Empyreal Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Empyreal Logistics, designating Daniella Litvak as local counsel. (lom)
January 25, 2022 Filing 46 Sheriff's Opposition to Plaintiff's Renewed Ex Parte Application for TRO Opposition re: Renewed EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction #36 filed by Defendant Shannon D. Dicus. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sgt. A. Naoum, #2 Exhibit Ex. A to Decl of Sgt. A. Naoum)(Attorney Heidi Kathleen Williams added to party Shannon D. Dicus(pty:dft))(Williams, Heidi)
January 25, 2022 Filing 45 OPPOSITION re: Renewed EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction #36 filed by Defendants Drug Enforcement Administration, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Merrick Garland, Kristi Koons Johnson, Anne Milgram, The United States of America, U.S. Department of Justice, Christopher A. Wray. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Ricker, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Attorney Talya M Seidman added to party Drug Enforcement Administration(pty:dft), Attorney Talya M Seidman added to party Federal Bureau of Investigation(pty:dft), Attorney Talya M Seidman added to party Merrick Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Talya M Seidman added to party Kristi Koons Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Talya M Seidman added to party Anne Milgram(pty:dft), Attorney Talya M Seidman added to party The United States of America(pty:dft), Attorney Talya M Seidman added to party U.S. Department of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Talya M Seidman added to party Christopher A. Wray(pty:dft))(Seidman, Talya)
January 24, 2022 Filing 44 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kirby T. West to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 1/20/2022, Receipt No. 32654342) filed by plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Litvak, Daniella)
January 24, 2022 Filing 43 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel L. Alban to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 1/20/2022, Receipt No. 32654197) filed by plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Litvak, Daniella)
January 24, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kirby T. West to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32654342) #39 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel L. Alban to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32654197) #38 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): The attorney seeking to appear pro hac vice must complete Section 1 of this Application, personally sign, in ink, the certification in Section II, and have the designated Local Counsel sign in Section III. ELECTRONIC SIGNATURES ARE NOT ACCEPTED. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (lt)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
January 20, 2022 Filing 40 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Shannon D. Dicus. (lom)
January 20, 2022 Filing 39 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kirby T. West to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32654342) filed by plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Litvak, Daniella)
January 20, 2022 Filing 38 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel L. Alban to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32654197) filed by plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Daniella Litvak added to party Empyreal Enterprises, LLC(pty:pla)) (Litvak, Daniella)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND JOINT REQUEST FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE #35 by Judge John W. Holcomb: Plaintiff shall file its renewed application for temporary restraining order and order to show cause why a preliminary injunction should not be granted on Wednesday, January 19, 2022. In view of the Court considering ex parte applications on the papers, the hearing currently set for January 28, 2022 is hereby VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
January 19, 2022 Filing 36 Renewed EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction filed by plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. Ex Parte Application set for hearing on 1/28/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Declaration O'Gorman, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to O'Gorman Declaration, #3 Declaration Bass, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Bass Declaration, #5 Proposed Order Proposed TRO Order to Show Cause) (Bass, David)
January 19, 2022 Filing 35 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File response/reply filed by plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bass, David)
January 19, 2022 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC, identifying Andrew Romanow; Antonio J. Ripepi; Ark Holdings LLC; Aaron Rasty; Audrey Heberle; Berlekamp Family Investments LLC; Tom Pipich; Brad Johnson; Carolyn and Eugene Backhaus; Charlou Investments LLC; Charles McGrath; David Root; DX Consulting Corporation; Deidra O'Gorman; Donna and Richard Fultineer; G Media Inc.; Greg Messinger; Hailo Enterprises LLC; Kurt Miller; Jason Sarasnick; Joel Warshaw; Lisa Jason; Madrone Ventures, LLC; Mark Forse; Richard Farrell; RObert Hallman; Scott Forse; Shetty Adarsh; Thomas Ramsay; Timothy J. Alcock; Wade Zirkle. (Bass, David)
January 19, 2022 Filing 33 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #27 filed by plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. (Bass, David)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Application is DENIED for failure to comply with Rule 65's notice requirement. The Court makes this Order without prejudice to Empyreal's right or ability to seek appropriate injunctive relief through a regularly noticed motion. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
January 15, 2022 Filing 31 OPPOSITION OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction #18 , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction #17 filed by Defendants Drug Enforcement Administration, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Merrick Garland, Kristi Koons Johnson, Anne Milgram, The United States of America, U.S. Department of Justice, Christopher A. Wray. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joanne Osinoff, #2 Exhibit 1- Complaint in United States of America v. $165,620.00 in United States Currency, #3 Exhibit 2- Warrant of Arrest In Rem)(Osinoff, Joanne)
January 15, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by FEDERAL DEFENDANTS Drug Enforcement Administration, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Merrick Garland, Kristi Koons Johnson, Anne Milgram, The United States of America, U.S. Department of Justice, Christopher A. Wray. (Osinoff, Joanne)
January 15, 2022 Filing 29 OPPOSITION OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction #18 , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction #17 filed by Defendants Drug Enforcement Administration, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Merrick Garland, Kristi Koons Johnson, Anne Milgram, The United States of America, U.S. Department of Justice, Christopher A. Wray. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joanne Osinoff, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint in United States of America v. $165,620.00 in United States Currency, #3 Exhibit 2- Warrant of Arrest In Rem)(Attorney Joanne I Osinoff added to party Drug Enforcement Administration(pty:dft), Attorney Joanne I Osinoff added to party Federal Bureau of Investigation(pty:dft), Attorney Joanne I Osinoff added to party Merrick Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Joanne I Osinoff added to party Kristi Koons Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Joanne I Osinoff added to party Anne Milgram(pty:dft), Attorney Joanne I Osinoff added to party The United States of America(pty:dft), Attorney Joanne I Osinoff added to party U.S. Department of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Joanne I Osinoff added to party Christopher A. Wray(pty:dft))(Osinoff, Joanne)
January 14, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
January 14, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
January 14, 2022 Filing 26 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Anne Milgram. (ghap)
January 14, 2022 Filing 25 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Drug Enforcement Administration. (ghap)
January 14, 2022 Filing 24 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kristi Koons Johnson. (ghap)
January 14, 2022 Filing 23 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Christopher A. Wray. (ghap)
January 14, 2022 Filing 22 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (ghap)
January 14, 2022 Filing 21 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Merrick Garland. (ghap)
January 14, 2022 Filing 20 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant U.S. Department of Justice. (ghap)
January 14, 2022 Filing 19 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The United States of America. (ghap)
January 14, 2022 Filing 18 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction filed by plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. Ex Parte Application set for hearing on 1/20/2022 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed TRO, #2 Declaration OGorman Declaration, #3 Exhibit O'Gorman Exhibit, #4 Declaration Bass Declaration) (Bass, David)
January 14, 2022 Filing 17 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preliminary Injunction filed by plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. Ex Parte Application set for hearing on 1/20/2022 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed TRO) (Bass, David)
January 14, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kirby Thomas on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
January 14, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Dan Alban on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
January 14, 2022 Filing 14 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
January 14, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 14, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap)
January 14, 2022 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. (Bass, David)
January 14, 2022 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. (Bass, David)
January 14, 2022 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC. (Bass, David)
January 14, 2022 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Empyreal Logistics. (Bass, David)
January 14, 2022 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Empyreal Logistics. (Bass, David)
January 14, 2022 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Empyreal Logistics. (Bass, David)
January 14, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Empyreal Logistics. (Bass, David)
January 14, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Empyreal Logistics. (Bass, David)
January 14, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Empyreal Logistics. (Bass, David)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Empyreal Logistics. (Bass, David)
January 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32627623 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Empyreal Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Empyreal Logistics. (Attorney David Christopher Bass added to party Empyreal Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Empyreal Logistics(pty:pla))(Bass, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Empyreal Enterprises, LLC v. The United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Empyreal Enterprises, LLC doing business as Empyreal Logistics
Represented By: David Christopher Bass
Represented By: Jerome R Satran
Represented By: Daniel L. Alban
Represented By: Daniella Litvak
Represented By: Kirby Thomas West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Represented By: Joanne I Osinoff
Represented By: Talya M Seidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Joanne I Osinoff
Represented By: Talya M Seidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Represented By: Joanne I Osinoff
Represented By: Talya M Seidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Koons Johnson
Represented By: Joanne I Osinoff
Represented By: Talya M Seidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drug Enforcement Administration
Represented By: Joanne I Osinoff
Represented By: Talya M Seidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Milgram
Represented By: Joanne I Osinoff
Represented By: Talya M Seidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon D. Dicus
Represented By: Heidi Kathleen Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Joanne I Osinoff
Represented By: Talya M Seidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Joanne I Osinoff
Represented By: Talya M Seidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?