Jeff T. Grange v. Lori Pozuelos et al
Plaintiff: Jeff T. Grange, M.D.
Defendant: Lori Pozuelos, Jason Wessely, California Department of Insurance and Does 1-10, individuals
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Steven Moyer
Case Number: 5:2022cv00340
Filed: February 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg re Stipulation for Protective Order #36 . (see document for details) (hr)
January 20, 2023 Filing 36 Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Jeff T. Grange, MD.(Larson, Stephen)
December 7, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Steven Moyer has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 11/27/23. (rfi)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order re Jury Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2024 at 3:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Jury Trial set for 2/20/2024 at 8:30 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
November 1, 2022 Filing 32 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court takes the Scheduling Conference off calendar and establishes the case management dates as proposed by parties in the Joint Rule 26(f) Report as further described in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates except as noted in the Order re Trial. (See Order re Trial for specific dates and times.) These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine unless the Court orders otherwise. All fictitiously named defendants are dismissed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 31, 2022 Filing 31 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10 Days, filed by Plaintiff Jeff T. Grange, MD.. (Larson, Stephen)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
October 7, 2022 Filing 29 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #14 with JURY DEMAND For Jury Trial filed by Defendant Jason Wessely(official capacity).(Angres, Elizabeth)
October 7, 2022 Filing 28 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #14 with JURY DEMAND For Jury Trial filed by Defendant Lori Pozuelos(official capacity).(Angres, Elizabeth)
September 30, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Orders #23 and #26 were not properly flattened. The clerk will replace with flattened versions. (jp)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Extending the Date for Defendants to Answer the First Amended Complaint #25 . Defendants shall have until 10/7/2022 to file their answer to the First Amended Complaint. (jp) (Main Document 26 replaced on 9/30/2022) (jp).
September 8, 2022 Filing 25 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Lori Pozuelos(in her individual ), Jason Wessely(in his individual). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending the Date for Defendants to Answer the First Amended Complaint)(McMahon, Thomas)
August 2, 2022 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Thomas M McMahon counsel for Defendants Lori Pozuelos, Lori Pozuelos, Jason Wessely, Jason Wessely. Elizabeth S. Angres is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Lori Pozuelos and Jason Wessely. (McMahon, Thomas)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING in Part and DENYING in Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #17 . An amended complaint must be filed and served no later than 8/29/2022. See Order for specifics. (jp)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) #17 set for July 25, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pk)
July 11, 2022 Filing 21 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) #17 filed by Defendants Lori Pozuelos, Jason Wessely. (McMahon, Thomas)
June 29, 2022 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel R Lahana counsel for Plaintiff Jeff T. Grange, MD. Adding Daniel R. Lahana as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Jeff T. Grange, M.D.. (Attorney Daniel R Lahana added to party Jeff T. Grange, MD(pty:pla))(Lahana, Daniel)
June 29, 2022 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jerry A. Behnke counsel for Plaintiff Jeff T. Grange, MD. Adding Jerry A. Behnke as counsel of record for Jeff T. Grange, M.D. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Jeff T. Grange, M.D.. (Attorney Jerry A. Behnke added to party Jeff T. Grange, MD(pty:pla))(Behnke, Jerry)
June 28, 2022 Filing 18 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) #17 filed by Plaintiff Jeff T. Grange, MD. (Larson, Stephen)
June 15, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants Lori Pozuelos(in her individual ), Jason Wessely(in his individual). Motion set for hearing on 7/25/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)) (McMahon, Thomas)
June 15, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Lori Pozuelos(in her individual ), Jason Wessely(in his individual), (Attorney Thomas M McMahon added to party Lori Pozuelos(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas M McMahon added to party Jason Wessely(pty:dft))(McMahon, Thomas)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer that Defendants Response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint will be due no later than 6/15/2022 #13 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
May 26, 2022 Filing 14 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Lori Pozuelos(official capacity), Lori Pozuelos(in her individual ), Jason Wessely(official capacity), Jason Wessely(in his individual) amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Jeff T. Grange, MD(Larson, Stephen)
May 26, 2022 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jeff T. Grange, MD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Larson, Stephen)
April 25, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Jeff T. Grange, MD, upon Defendant California Department of Insurance acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 4/25/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Thomas M. McMahon, Counsel for California Department of Insurance. (Behnke, Jerry)
April 25, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Jeff T. Grange, MD, upon Defendant Jason Wessely(official capacity) acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 4/25/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Thomas M. McMahon, Counsel for Jason Wessely. (Behnke, Jerry)
April 25, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Jeff T. Grange, MD, upon Defendant Lori Pozuelos(official capacity) acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 4/25/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Thomas M. McMahon, Counsel for Lori Pozuelos. (Behnke, Jerry)
March 10, 2022 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants California Department of Insurance, Lori Pozuelos, Jason Wessely. (jp)
March 8, 2022 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jeff T. Grange, MD. (Larson, Stephen)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
February 25, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
February 25, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 25, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh)
February 24, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jeff T. Grange, identifying Plaintiff Jeff T. Grange, M.D.; Defendant Lori Pozuelos; Defendant Jason Wessely; Defendant California Department of Insurance. (Larson, Stephen)
February 24, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jeff T. Grange. (Larson, Stephen)
February 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32848059 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Jeff T. Grange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Jeff T. Grange(pty:pla))(Larson, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeff T. Grange v. Lori Pozuelos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff T. Grange, M.D.
Represented By: Stephen Gerard Larson
Represented By: Daniel R Lahana
Represented By: Jerry A. Behnke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Pozuelos
Represented By: Elizabeth S Angres
Represented By: Thomas M McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Wessely
Represented By: Elizabeth S Angres
Represented By: Thomas M McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, individuals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Steven Moyer
Represented By: Steven E Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?