Scott Gibson et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Scott Gibson and Leslie Bingham
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 5:2022cv00343
Filed: February 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Pursuant to Stipulation #10 , is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' Motion To Remand #9 is hereby withdrawn without prejudice to Plaintiffs re-filing. (gk)
April 1, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
March 31, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Withdraw Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #9 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nassihi, Amir)
March 28, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Leslie Bingham, Scott Gibson. Motion set for hearing on 4/29/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (Johnson, Mark)
February 28, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Related Case(s) #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on 2/25/2022. (Maclear, Amy)
February 25, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
February 25, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
February 25, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (ghap)
February 25, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Related Case(s): 2:18-ml-02814-AB-PVC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Maclear, Amy)
February 25, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, identifying State Street Corporation; Evercore Trust Company, N.A.; Black Rock, Inc.; The Vanguard Group. (Maclear, Amy)
February 25, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Maclear, Amy)
February 25, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number CVPS2200269 Receipt No: ACACDC-32850041 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet of Amy Maclear, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Ford's Answer) (Attorney Amy Patricia Maclear added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Maclear, Amy)
February 25, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 10, Ford Motor Company. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Leslie Bingham, Scott Gibson. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/11/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
February 25, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/14/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott Gibson et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Gibson
Represented By: Jeffrey Orville Moses
Represented By: Brian Kelly Cline
Represented By: Mark Anthony Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Bingham
Represented By: Jeffrey Orville Moses
Represented By: Brian Kelly Cline
Represented By: Mark Anthony Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Amy Patricia Maclear
Represented By: Amir M Nassihi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?