Lorrie Young et al v. FCA US, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lorrie Young and Terri Young
Defendant: FCA US, LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2022cv00503
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
September 2, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gurpreet Sandhu on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Gurpreet Sandhu added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Sandhu, Gurpreet)
September 2, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Lambert, Sarah)
September 2, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric D Sentlinger on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Eric D Sentlinger added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Sentlinger, Eric)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Spencer P. Hugret for Defendant FCA US, LLC in place of Attorneys Richard L. Stuhlbarg and Jennifer C. Koo #22 . (gk)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ACCEPTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 68 by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Having reviewed the parties' Joint Stipulation for costs and expenses and request for judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 68(a) and proof of service #24 , the Court hereby ORDERS the clerk to enter judgment as stipulated and close the case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (gk)
August 16, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Judgment, Stipulation for Costs #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 15, 2022 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Spencer P. Hugret re Generic Text Only Entry,,, 23 filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
August 12, 2022 Filing 24 Joint STIPULATION for Judgment as to Request for Entry, STIPULATION for Costs against FCA US, LLC filed by Plaintiff Lorrie Young, Terri Young.(Dolin, Tionna)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court is in receipt of the Request for Approval of Substitution of Counsel (Dkt. No. #22 ). Proposed counsel have not submitted a certification that "the substitution of counsel, if allowed, will not cause delay in prosecution of the case to completion." See Local Rule 83-2.3.5. Proposed counsel shall have until 9 a.m. on August 15, 2022 to file the certification if counsel is able to truthfully represent that the substitution will not cause delays. Otherwise, current counsel must file a regularly noticed motion requesting substitution and continue to represent his or her client diligently unless and until relieved. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 11, 2022 Filing 22 First REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Spencer P. Hugret in place of attorney Richard L. Stuhlbarg and Jennifer C. Koo Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attoney) (Stuhlbarg, Richard)
July 28, 2022 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Lorrie Young, Terri Young. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Lorrie Young and Terri Young. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRETRIAL AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The DOE defendants remaining after 7/25/2022 are dismissed by operation of this Order and without further notice. The Court vacates the mandatory scheduling conference set for 5/27/2022 and issues this case management order. The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report #17 and sets the pretrial and trial dates noted in this order based on an evaluation of the complexity of the case. Jury Trial set for 12/5/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 11/25/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties (Hearing Deadline) 7/25/2022. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 9/23/2022. Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline 9/30/2022. Non-Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline 9/30/2022. Settlement Conference Deadline 10/14/2022. Post-Settlement Status Conference set for 10/28/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Status Report due by 10/21/2022. Trial Filings (First Set) Deadline 11/4/2022. Trial Filings (Second Set) Deadline 11/14/2022. See document for further details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
May 17, 2022 Filing 17 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 days, filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC.. (Koo, Jennifer)
April 26, 2022 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiffs Lorrie Young, Terri Young. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Lorrie Young and Terri Young for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs' Lorrie Young and Terri Young. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Lorrie Young (pty:pla), Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Terri Young (pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court sets an in-person Scheduling Conference set for hearing on May 27, 2022 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by May 17, 2022. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr)
April 14, 2022 Filing 14 FCA US LLC'S NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC, identifying Lorrie Young; Terri Young; FCA US LLC; FCA North America Holdings, LLC; FCA Holdco B.V.; Stellantis N.V.. (Koo, Jennifer)
April 14, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 of FCA US LLC filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC.(Attorney Jennifer Koo added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Koo, Jennifer)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon the filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:22-cv-00503-SB-AGRx. (aco)
March 28, 2022 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lorrie Young, Terri Young, upon Defendant Does served on 3/24/2022, answer due 4/14/2022; FCA US, LLC served on 3/24/2022, answer due 4/14/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, CT Corporation System, Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
March 22, 2022 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant FCA US, LLC. (ghap)
March 22, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
March 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 22, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap)
March 22, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Lorrie Young, Terri Young. Adding Karin Kuemerle as counsel of record for Lorrie Young and Terri Young for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs' Lorrie Young and Terri Young. (Dolin, Tionna)
March 21, 2022 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiffs' Lorrie Young, Terri Young, identifying FCA US LLC. (Dolin, Tionna)
March 21, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs' Lorrie Young, Terri Young. (Dolin, Tionna)
March 21, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Lorrie Young, Terri Young. (Dolin, Tionna)
March 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32981691 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs' Lorrie Young, Terri Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2017 Dodge Ram 1500 Diesel Warranty) (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Lorrie Young (pty:pla), Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Terri Young (pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lorrie Young et al v. FCA US, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorrie Young
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Young
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Koo
Represented By: Richard L Stuhlbarg
Represented By: Eric D Sentlinger
Represented By: Gurpreet Sandhu
Represented By: Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?