Kristina Spalding v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Kristina Spalding
Defendant: FCA US LLC and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2022cv00532
Filed: March 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Charles F Eick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES AND JURISDICTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court GRANTS the Joint Stipulation #35 and ORDERS that the Court continues the filing deadline of Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses to 1/15/2024. (gk)
November 2, 2023 Filing 35 Joint STIPULATION to Continue JURISDICTION from November 8, 2023 to January 15, 2024 filed by plaintiff Kristina Spalding. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES AND JURISDICTION)(Dolin, Tionna)
October 23, 2023 Filing 34 JUDGMENT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has been notified that Plaintiff KRISTINA SPALDING accepted Defendant FCA US, LLC's Offer of Judgment pursuant toFederal Rule of Civil Procedure 68 on 7/6/2023 #32 . Accordingly, the Court enters JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $68,000.00 pursuant to the terms of the Rule 68 Offer. All dates are vacated. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (gk)
October 13, 2023 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Campbell counsel for Plaintiff Kristina Spalding. Adding Christopher Campbell as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kristina Spalding. (Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Kristina Spalding (pty:pla))(Campbell, Christopher)
October 9, 2023 Filing 32 REQUEST to Enforce Judgment filed by Plaintiff Kristina Spalding. (Attachments: #1 [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT) (Dolin, Tionna)
June 7, 2023 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi counsel for Plaintiff Kristina Spalding. Adding Rabiya Tirmizi as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kristina Spalding. (Attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi added to party Kristina Spalding (pty:pla))(Tirmizi, Rabiya)
June 7, 2023 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Law counsel for Plaintiff Kristina Spalding. Adding Daniel Law as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kristina Spalding. (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Kristina Spalding (pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #28 , the Court HEREBY ORDERS that the trial date and related dates shall be CONTINUED. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 6/23/2023. Last Date to Hear Motions 8/18/2023. First Round of Trial Filings due by 10/20/2023. Second Round of Trial Filings due by 10/27/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/2023 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Jury Trial set for 11/28/2023 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. See document for further details. (gk)
April 28, 2023 Filing 28 First STIPULATION to Continue Trial and Related Dates from Currently Set to Approximately 60 days filed by Plaintiff's Attorney Kristina Spalding. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ariel Harman-Holmes, #2 Proposed Order)(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 14, 2023 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nino Sanaia counsel for Plaintiff Kristina Spalding. Adding Nino Sanaia as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kristina Spalding. (Attorney Nino Sanaia added to party Kristina Spalding (pty:pla))(Sanaia, Nino)
July 7, 2022 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Kristina Spalding. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kristina Spalding. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 6, 2022 Filing 25 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Spencer Hugret in place of attorney Mark W Skanes filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Request for approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney) (Skanes, Mark)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RE: JURY/COURT TRIAL: I. SCHEDULE; II. TRIAL PREPARATION; III. CONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Jury Trial set for 9/26/2023 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions In Limine set for 9/8/2023 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Last Date to Hear Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties 9/23/2022. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 4/21/2023. Last Date to Hear Motions 6/16/2023. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference 6/30/2023. Trial Filings (first round): Motions In Limine, Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law, Witness Lists, Joint Exhibit List, Joint Status Report Regarding Settlement due by 8/18/2023. Trial Filings (second round): Oppositions to Motions In Limine, Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order due by 8/25/2023. See document for further details. (gk)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than June 30, 2023. (dbe)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties, and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the July 8, 2022 Scheduling Conference. Order re Jury/Court Trial to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbe) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 28, 2022 Filing 21 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4, filed by Plaintiff Kristina Spalding.. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 27, 2022 Filing 20 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff Kristina Spalding. Amendment to Status Report #19 Joint Rule 26 (f) (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
June 24, 2022 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT Plaintiff's Scheduling Report filed by Plaintiff Kristina Spalding. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 26, 2022 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiff Kristina Spalding. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Kristina Spalding for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs' Kristina Spalding. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Kristina Spalding (pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
April 22, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alejandro Blake on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attorney Alejandro Blake added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Blake, Alejandro)
April 22, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC,FCA North America Holdings, LLC, FCA Holdco B.V.,Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.). (Skanes, Mark)
April 22, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mark W Skanes on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Skanes, Mark)
April 22, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC.(Attorney Mark W Skanes added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Skanes, Mark)
April 18, 2022 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kristina Spalding, upon Defendant DOES served on 4/1/2022, answer due 4/22/2022; FCA US LLC served on 4/1/2022, answer due 4/22/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sarai Marin, CT Corporation System, Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (droj)
March 29, 2022 Filing 10 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kristina Spalding, (Kuemerle, Karin)
March 29, 2022 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karin Kuemerle counsel for Plaintiff Kristina Spalding. Adding Karin Kuemerle as counsel of record for Kristina Spalding for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kristina Spalding. (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Kristina Spalding (pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
March 29, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant FCA US LLC. (jtil)
March 29, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil)
March 28, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
March 28, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
March 28, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil)
March 28, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Kristina Spalding. (Dolin, Tionna)
March 28, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kristina Spalding. (Dolin, Tionna)
March 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33018914 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Kristina Spalding. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2019 Jeep Cherokee Express Warranty) (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Kristina Spalding (pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kristina Spalding v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Spalding
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Christopher Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Alejandro Blake
Represented By: Mark W Skanes
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?