Hrair Kaladjian v. Joseph R. Biden et al
Plaintiff: Hrair Kaladjian
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden, Jr., U.S. Department of State, Antony Blinken and United States of America
Case Number: 5:2022cv00733
Filed: April 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER #2 AND DISMISSING CASE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Accordingly, Plaintiff's application for TRO is DENIED and this case is DISMISSED with prejudice for lack of standing; denying #2 EX PARTE APPLICATION for TRO; denying #2 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause; denying #2 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
May 9, 2022 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hrair Kaladjian, upon Defendant Joseph R. Biden, Jr served on 5/9/2022, answer due 7/8/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Executed upon the United States Attorney General's Office by certified mail. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (aco)
May 9, 2022 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hrair Kaladjian, upon Defendant U.S. Department of State served on 5/9/2022, answer due 7/8/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorney General's Office by certified mail. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (aco)
May 9, 2022 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hrair Kaladjian, upon Defendant United States of America served on 5/9/2022, answer due 7/8/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Attorney General's Office of the United States by certified mail. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (aco)
May 9, 2022 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hrair Kaladjian, upon Defendant Antony Blinken served on 5/9/2022, answer due 7/8/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorney General's Office by certified mail. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (aco)
May 9, 2022 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hrair Kaladjian, upon Defendant United States of America served on 5/9/2022, answer due 7/8/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Executed upon the United States Attorney's Office by certified mail. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (aco)
May 9, 2022 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hrair Kaladjian, upon Defendant U.S. Department of State served on 5/9/2022, answer due 7/8/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Executed upon the United States Attorney's Office by certified mail. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (aco)
May 9, 2022 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hrair Kaladjian, upon Defendant Joseph R. Biden, Jr served on 5/9/2022, answer due 7/8/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by certified mail. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (aco)
May 9, 2022 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hrair Kaladjian, upon Defendant Antony Blinken served on 5/9/2022, answer due 7/8/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (aco)
May 4, 2022 Filing 19 REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support of Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue #2 filed by Plaintiff Hrair Kaladjian. (gk)
May 3, 2022 Filing 18 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to Show Cause re: Re Preliminary Injunction EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction re Should not issue #2 filed by Defendants Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Antony Blinken, U.S. Department of State, United States of America. (Attorney Paul B La Scala added to party Joseph R. Biden, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Paul B La Scala added to party Antony Blinken(pty:dft), Attorney Paul B La Scala added to party U.S. Department of State(pty:dft), Attorney Paul B La Scala added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(La Scala, Paul)
May 2, 2022 Filing 17 FURTHER DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF HRAIR KALADJIAN REGARDING PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER #2 filed by Plaintiff Hrair Kaladjian. (lom)
May 2, 2022 Filing 16 DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF HRAIR KALADJIAN REGARDING EXIGENCY OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, AND SERVICE OF TRO APPLICATION #2 filed by Plaintiff Hrair Kaladjian. (lom)
May 2, 2022 Filing 15 FURTHER MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE #2 filed by Plaintiff Hrair Kaladjian. (lom)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Plaintiff shall serve the government with his application for a temporary restraining order immediately and advise the government that their opposition to the TRO is due by Tuesday, May 3, 2022. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 28, 2022 Filing 12 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
April 28, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 28, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
April 28, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Hrair Kaladjian. (ghap)
April 28, 2022 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Joseph R. Biden, Jr. (ghap)
April 28, 2022 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Antony Blinken. (ghap)
April 28, 2022 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant U.S. Department of State. (ghap)
April 28, 2022 Filing 5 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant United States of America. (ghap)
April 28, 2022 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Hrair Kaladjian in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #2 filed by Plaintiff Hrair Kaladjian. (ghap)
April 28, 2022 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause why a Preliminary Injunction re Should not issue #2 filed by Plaintiff Hrair Kaladjian. (ghap)
April 28, 2022 Filing 2 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause why a Preliminary Injunction should not issue, filed by plaintiff Hrair Kaladjian. (ghap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/28/2022: #1 Lodged Proposed Order Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause why a Preliminary Injunction should not issue) (ghap).
April 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Antony Blinken, U.S. Department of State, United States of America.Case assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar.(Filing fee $ 402:PAID), filed by plaintiff Hrair Kaladjian. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hrair Kaladjian v. Joseph R. Biden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hrair Kaladjian
Represented By: Hrair Kaladjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden, Jr.
Represented By: Paul B La Scala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Represented By: Paul B La Scala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antony Blinken
Represented By: Paul B La Scala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Paul B La Scala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?