Terry McDonald v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Terry McDonald
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Diebold, Incorporated Long Term Disability Insurance Plan and Diebold, Incorporated
Case Number: 5:2022cv00747
Filed: May 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: Please refer to Order for complete details., (iva)
June 24, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Ellis, Patricia)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 22-110) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Sykes, Sunshine Suzanne, this case is transferred from Judge John W. Holcomb to the calendar of Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:22-cv-00747-SSS-SHKx. (dve)
May 26, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Court's Standing Order and Notice to Parties filed by Plaintiff Terry McDonald. (Grabarsky, Susan)
May 26, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America, identifying The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Prudential Financial, Inc. (Attorney Jason A James added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(James, Jason)
May 26, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer now due 6/24/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Patricia A Ellis added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Ellis, Patricia)
May 19, 2022 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES by District John W. Holcomb. Effective Monday, May 23, 2022, Judge John W. Holcomb will be located in the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 9D, on the 9th Floor, located at 411 W. 4th Street, Santa Ana, California 92701-4516. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 9D of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All required mandatory chambers copies shall be delivered and placed in the drop box located on the 9th Floor of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse. Judge Holcomb's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, may be reached at JWH_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 6, 2022 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Terry McDonald, upon Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 5/5/2022, answer due 5/26/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Intake Specialist of CT Corporation System Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Grabarsky, Susan)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
May 4, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:22-cv-00747 JWH(SHKx). (rn)
May 3, 2022 Filing 8 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Terry McDonald. (Grabarsky, Susan)
May 3, 2022 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Diebold, Incorporated, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Diebold, Incorporated) (sh)
May 3, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (sh)
May 2, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Terry McDonald. (Grabarsky, Susan)
May 2, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Terry McDonald. (Grabarsky, Susan)
May 2, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Terry McDonald. (Grabarsky, Susan)
May 2, 2022 Filing 2 Certification & NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Terry McDonald, (Grabarsky, Susan)
May 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33219818 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Terry McDonald. (Attorney Susan B Grabarsky added to party Terry McDonald(pty:pla))(Grabarsky, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry McDonald v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry McDonald
Represented By: Susan B Grabarsky
Represented By: Frank N Darras
Represented By: Phillip S Bather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Jason A James
Represented By: Patricia A Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diebold, Incorporated Long Term Disability Insurance Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diebold, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?