Lorena Casillas et al v. FCA US, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lorena Casillas and Corwin De Veas
Defendant: FCA US, LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2022cv00790
Filed: May 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Wesley L Hsu
2 Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
3 Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: Please refer to the Order for complete details. (cbr)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-126) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, this case is transferred from Judge Wesley L. Hsu to the calendar of Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:22-cv-00790 KK(SPx). (rn)
October 12, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher Campbell on behalf of Plaintiffs Lorena Casillas, Corwin De Veas (Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Lorena Casillas (pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Corwin De Veas (pty:pla))(Campbell, Christopher)
August 9, 2023 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Grace Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Lorena Casillas, Corwin De Veas. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Lorena Casillas and Corwin De Veas for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Lorena Casillas and Corwin De Veas. (Dolin, Tionna)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CIVIL CASES by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. (hc)
July 28, 2023 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gurpreet Sandhu counsel for Defendant FCA US, LLC. Gurpreet Sandhu is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. (Sandhu, Gurpreet)
July 10, 2023 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Lorena Casillas. Filed by plaintiff Lorena Casillas. (LaRocque, Elizabeth)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES #28 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. The dates are continued to the following dates: a. Expert Disclosure (Initial): November 17, 2023; b. Expert Disclosure (Rebuttal): December 1, 2023; c. Expert Discovery Cut-Off: December 1, 2023; d. Dispositive Motion Hearing Cut-Off: December 15, 2023; e. Last Date to Hear Daubert Motions: January 12, 2024; f. Last Day to Conduct Settlement Conference: February 2, 2024; g. Deadline for Hearing on Motions in Limine: February 23, 2024; h. Final Pretrial Conference: March 8, 2024 at 3:00 p.m.; i. Trial: March 26, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. (lom)
June 9, 2023 Filing 28 STIPULATION to Continue Trial Date and Related Dates filed by Plaintiffs Lorena Casillas, Corwin De Veas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Laroque in Support of Stipulation to Continue Trial Date and Related Dates, #2 Proposed Order)(Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Lorena Casillas (pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Corwin De Veas (pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-046) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Wesley L. Hsu, this case is transferred from Judge John W. Holcomb to the calendar of Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:22-cv-00790 WLH(SPx). (rn)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 3 by Judge John W. Holcomb. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than August 4, 2023. (dgo)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: Discovery cut-off 7/7/2023, Last date to conduct Settlement Conference is 8/4/2023, Dispositive Motion cut-off 9/15/2023,Motions in Limine cut-off 10/20/2023, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/27/2023 at 1:00 PM, Jury Trial set for 11/13/2023 at 9:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (dgo)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on September 16, 2022 is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 2, 2022 Filing 23 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiffs Lorena Casillas, Corwin De Veas.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
July 27, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to case under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initial judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a Magistrate Judge. This case is not under that program. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (et)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (dgo)
July 26, 2022 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sandhu, Gurpreet)
July 26, 2022 Filing 19 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Suarez, Jeanette)
July 26, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nejla Nassirian on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Nejla Nassirian added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Nassirian, Nejla)
July 26, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffery J Fadeff on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Jeffery J Fadeff added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Fadeff, Jeffery)
July 26, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeanette Catuira Suarez on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Jeanette Catuira Suarez added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Suarez, Jeanette)
July 26, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer)
July 26, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gurpreet Sandhu on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Gurpreet Sandhu added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Sandhu, Gurpreet)
July 26, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Lambert, Sarah)
July 26, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric D Sentlinger on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Eric D Sentlinger added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Sentlinger, Eric)
July 6, 2022 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lorena Casillas, Corwin De Veas, upon Defendant FCA US, LLC served on 7/5/2022, answer due 7/26/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation Inc., Registered Agent, authorized to accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 19, 2022 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES by District John W. Holcomb. Effective Monday, May 23, 2022, Judge John W. Holcomb will be located in the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 9D, on the 9th Floor, located at 411 W. 4th Street, Santa Ana, California 92701-4516. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 9D of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All required mandatory chambers copies shall be delivered and placed in the drop box located on the 9th Floor of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse. Judge Holcomb's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, may be reached at JWH_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
May 11, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant FCA US, LLC. (lh)
May 11, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
May 11, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 11, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (lh)
May 9, 2022 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiffs' Lorena Casillas, Corwin De Veas, identifying LORENA CASILLAS and CORWIN DE VEAS. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 9, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiffs' Lorena Casillas, Corwin De Veas. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 9, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Lorena Casillas, Corwin De Veas. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33263247 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs' Lorena Casillas, Corwin De Veas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2015 Jeep Cherokee Express Warranty) (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Lorena Casillas (pty:pla), Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Corwin De Veas (pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lorena Casillas et al v. FCA US, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorena Casillas
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Christopher Campbell
Represented By: Tionna Carvalho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corwin De Veas
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Christopher Campbell
Represented By: Tionna Carvalho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Eric D Sentlinger
Represented By: Gurpreet Sandhu
Represented By: Jeanette Catuira Suarez
Represented By: Jeffery J Fadeff
Represented By: Nejla Nassirian
Represented By: Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?