Roy Dandridge et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Roy Dandridge and Debbie Dandridge
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and Does 1-50, Inclusive
Case Number: 5:2022cv00985
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444 Notice of Removal - Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. The parties have filed a Joint Scheduling Conference Report ("Report," ECF No. 19). As stated therein, "Defendant filed Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike on July 15, 2022. Plaintiffs elected to amend their pleading and will file a First Amended Complaint on August 1, 2022. Defendant will likely file another Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike thereafter." Report at 2. In light thereof, the Court continues the Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) scheduling conference from August 4, 2022 to September 26, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are to file a joint report by September 21. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint #15 , and Defendant's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint #16 , set for hearing on August 15, 2022, are vacated and taken off-calendar. (aco)
August 2, 2022 Filing 21 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel are to appear telephonically for Thursday's 08/04/2022 scheduling conference at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 1, 2022 Filing 20 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Does, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Roy Dandridge, Debbie Dandridge(Shapero, Sarah)
August 1, 2022 Filing 19 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan JOINT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE REPORT ; estimated length of trial 3 days, filed by Plaintiffs Debbie Dandridge, Roy Dandridge.. (Shapero, Sarah)
July 25, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint #16 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint #16 and NOTICE OF INTENT to Amend Complaint as a Matter of Course filed by Plaintiff Roy Dandridge. (Warden, Stephanie)
July 15, 2022 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 filed by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-12)(Dailey, Steven)
July 15, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/15/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dailey, Steven)
July 15, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/15/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dailey, Steven)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. The Court has received the parties' stipulation extending time to answer (ECF No. 12) which provides that Defendant will be given until July 15, 2022 to file its response to the complaint in this matter. Based thereon, the Court continues the July 14, 2022 Rule 26(f) scheduling conference from July 14, 2022 to August 4, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. The parties shall file the Rule 25(f) report by August 1, 2022. (aco)
July 11, 2022 Filing 13 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel are to appear telephonically for Thursday's 07/14/2022 scheduling conference at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 16, 2022 Filing 12 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. answer now due 7/15/2022, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc..(Dailey, Steven)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for July 14, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than July 7, 2022. See Local Rule 26-1. (aco)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
June 13, 2022 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
June 13, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge George H. Wu. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:22-cv-00985 GW (SHKx). (ghap)
June 13, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Shashi H. Kewalramani. New Case Number 5:22-cv-985 JGB (SHKx). (ghap)
June 10, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-50, Inclusive, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Roy Dandridge, Debbie Dandridge. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/12/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 2) (ghap)
June 10, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., identifying Credit Suisse First Boston. (Dailey, Steven)
June 10, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Notice of Removal filed by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Proof of Service)(Dailey, Steven)
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Dailey, Steven)
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on June 10, 2022. (Dailey, Steven)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number CVRI2201951 Receipt No: ACACDC-33453867 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Department Assignment) (Attorney Steven M Dailey added to party Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.(pty:dft))(Dailey, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roy Dandridge et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Dandridge
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Shapero
Represented By: Stephanie Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Dandridge
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Shapero
Represented By: Stephanie Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M Dailey
Represented By: Jennifer L Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?