Suraya M. Crump v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Suraya M. Crump
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2022cv01266
Filed: July 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheri Pym
Referring Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2023 Filing 41 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Campbell counsel for Plaintiff Suraya M. Crump. Adding Christopher Campbell as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Suraya M. Crump. (Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Suraya M. Crump(pty:pla))(Campbell, Christopher)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S COSTS AND EXPENSESORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS FEES #39 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: Plaintiff SURAYA M. CRUMP and Defendant FCA US, LLC have agreed FCA will pay $11,000.00 to resolve Plaintiff's attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses. Payment is due to Plaintiffs counsel within 60 days of entry of Order. Upon satisfaction of funding, the Parties will dismiss the case with prejudice within 10 business days. Accordingly, the Court hereby enters an ORDER for Defendant to pay Plaintiff's Counsel in the amount of $11,000.00 to resolve Plaintiffs attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses. (lc)
July 5, 2023 Filing 39 Joint STIPULATION for Order Plaintiffs Attorneys Fees, Costs, and Expenses filed by plaintiff Suraya M. Crump. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER)(Dolin, Tionna)
June 22, 2023 Filing 38 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 68(a) #36 . First, as identified by the Clerk, (Notice to Filer of Deficiencies, ECF No. 37), the proposed judgment does not specify the material terms of the judgment. Second, the Court questions the efficacy of the Rule 68(a) offer. Accordingly, the Court will not enter judgment at this time. The Court applauds the parties efforts to resolve this case and is available to facilitate the resolution of the case in whatever manner the parties deem appropriate. Based on the parties' representation that they have reached an agreement to resolve the case, the Court on its own motion vacates the case schedule and dismisses the case without prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction to vacate this Order and reopen the action within 45 days upon a request supported by a showing of good cause why the settlement cannot be completed within the 45-day period, explaining what further settlement processes are necessary and when the party or parties making the request reasonably expect the process to be concluded. This Order does not preclude the filing of a stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, which does not require the approval of the Court, Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A), or a renewed request for entry of judgment clarifying the parties' intent. Such submissions shall be filed within 45 days unless otherwise ordered by the Court pursuant to a stipulation of the parties supported by good cause. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
May 26, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: REQUEST for Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) #36 . The following error(s) was/were found: 1) Offer of Judgment FRCP 68 was not filed separately under its own event; but submitted within the request in a COMBINED format of Offer and Acceptance as one document. 2) MISSING specific money amounts in the proposed judgment In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
May 26, 2023 Filing 36 REQUEST for Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) filed by Plaintiff Suraya M. Crump. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment) (Dolin, Tionna)
November 18, 2022 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiff Suraya M. Crump. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Suraya M. Crump for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Suraya M. Crump. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Suraya M. Crump(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
November 14, 2022 Filing 34 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant FCA US LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Suraya M. Crump (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Warranty, #2 Appendix Redline FAC)(Law, Daniel)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS #20 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: Defendant FCA US LLC moves for judgment on the pleadings as to Plaintiff Suraya Crump's fraudulent concealment claim.Plaintiff filed a brief opposing the motion, and Defendant filed a reply. The Court deems the motion appropriate for decision without oral argument. The Defendant's motion is GRANTED. The fraudulent concealment claim is dismissed.Court gives Plaintiff leave to amend. Plaintiff shall file an amended Complaint within 14 days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff shall attach to the amended Complaint a "redline" version showing all additions and deletions of material. Failure to file a timely amended complaint will waive the right to do so. Leave to add new defendants or claims must be sought by a separate, properly noticed motion, (lc)
October 31, 2022 Filing 32 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The Court has revised its procedures regarding mandatory chambers copies in civil cases newly assigned to Judge Scarsi. The Court authorizes the parties to this case to follow the new procedures in lieu of the procedures stated in Initial Standing Order 9(e). More information about the new procedures is available at https://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-mark-c-scarsi THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2023 at 2:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 8/1/2023 at 8:30 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. See document for additional pretrial dates and deadlines. (smo)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than May 8, 2023. (smo)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2023 02:00 PM ; Jury Trial set for 8/1/2023 08:30 AM (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ALL SPECIFIED DEADLINES). (lc)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on October 24, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar and under submission. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbe) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (ECF No. #20 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court has considered the matters raised with respect to the Motion and has concluded that pursuant to Local Rule 7.15, the matter can be decided without oral argument. The Court advises counsel that the Motion, noticed for hearing on October 24, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. has been taken under submission and off its motion calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbe) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 10, 2022 Filing 26 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff Suraya M. Crump. Amendment to Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan #25 (Worksheet Added) (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
October 7, 2022 Filing 25 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Suraya M. Crump.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
October 5, 2022 Filing 24 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to as to Plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action #20 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey)
September 26, 2022 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGEMENT ON THE PLEADINGS filed by Plaintiff Suraya M. Crump. (Law, Daniel)
September 26, 2022 Filing 22 Opposition In Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to as to Plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action #20 filed by Plaintiff Suraya M. Crump. (Law, Daniel)
September 26, 2022 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Law counsel for Plaintiff Suraya M. Crump. Adding Daniel Law as counsel of record for Suraya M. Crump for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Suraya M. Crump. (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Suraya M. Crump(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
September 12, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to as to Plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points andAuthorities in support of MJOP, #2 Declaration of Attorney in support of MJOP, #3 Proposed Order in support of MJOP, #4 Certificate of Service) (Rogerson, Hailey)
August 25, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initial judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a magistrate judge. This case is not under that program. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
August 24, 2022 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC; FCA North America Holdings LLC; FCA Holdco B.V.; Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey)
August 24, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey)
August 24, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer)
August 24, 2022 Filing 14 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey)
August 24, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ali Azemoon on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Ali Azemoon added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Azemoon, Ali)
August 24, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Greg Gruzman on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Greg Gruzman added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Gruzman, Greg)
August 24, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Hailey Marie Rogerson on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Hailey Marie Rogerson added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Rogerson, Hailey)
August 3, 2022 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Suraya M. Crump, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 8/3/2022, answer due 8/24/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, CT Corporation System, Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge Mark C. Scarsi for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:22-cv-01266-MCS-(SPX). (dve)
July 22, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
July 22, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 22, 2022 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant FCA US LLC. (car)
July 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (car)
July 20, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Suraya M. Crump. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 20, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Suraya M. Crump. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33664895 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Suraya M. Crump. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Suraya M. Crump(pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suraya M. Crump v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suraya M. Crump
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Ali Azemoon
Represented By: Greg Gruzman
Represented By: Hailey Marie Rogerson
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?