Miguel Licea v. Old Navy, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Miguel Licea
Defendant: Old Navy, LLC, DOES 1 through 25, and Does 1 through 25. inclusive
Case Number: 5:2022cv01413
Filed: August 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheri Pym
Referring Judge: Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE PORTIONS OF DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 79.5 #44 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. The Court, having considered the Application and compelling reasons appearing therefor, hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's Application and seals the limited portions of the Confidential Agreement related to the settlement sum and Plaintiff's counsel's identifying client trust account details. (lom)
September 1, 2023 Filing 46 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff Miguel Licea. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document)(Ferrell, Scott)
September 1, 2023 Filing 45 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Confidential Settlement Agreement under seal #44 filed by Plaintiff Miguel Licea. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document)(Ferrell, Scott)
September 1, 2023 Filing 44 APPLICATION to file document Confidential Settlement Agreement under seal filed by Plaintiff Miguel Licea. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ferrell, Scott) Modified on 9/11/2023 (lom).
September 1, 2023 Filing 43 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Miguel Licea. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ferrell, Scott)
August 29, 2023 Filing 42 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #41 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Pursuant to L.R. 5-4.4.1, counsel is DIRECTED to electronically lodge the proposed order, as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging, no later than noon on September 1, 2023. Counsel is reminded to comply with L.R. 5-4.4.1 and L.R. 5-4.4.2. Failure to comply with the Court's Order will result in the counsel's request being STRICKEN. (iva)
August 28, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Complete Settlement and Dismissal #40 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iva)
August 25, 2023 Filing 40 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Complete Settlement and Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Miguel Licea. (Ferrell, Scott)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER NOTIFYING PLAINTIFF OF THE COURTS EXPECTATIONS FOR DISMISSAL UPON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT [DKT. 37] by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: The Court seeks to make Licea aware of its expectations for dismissal of thisaction as it relates to the putative class. Based on the Diaz factors outlined above, Licea is DIRECTED to provide information sufficient for the Court to determine whether dismissal of the case is collusive or prejudicial to the putative class and whether notice to all members of the putative class is required. The information should also include the terms, form, and value of any settlement or consideration being paid for the dismissal, and a fully executed copy of any settlement agreement. Licea must provide this information before August 25, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. See order for more information. (shb)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on July 28, 2023 is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 11, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Miguel Licea. (Ferrell, Scott)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2023 at 01:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
May 19, 2023 Filing 35 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #14 - Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint - filed by Defendant Old Navy, LLC.(Duffy, Joseph)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (Dkt. #33 ). Accordingly, Plaintiffs second cause of action remains. Pursuant to this Courts previous Order, Defendant must file its responsive pleading no later than Friday, May 19, 2023. [Dkt. 33]. (twdb)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS [DKT. 29] by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. the forgoing reasons, the Court ORDERS as follows: 1. Plaintiff's first cause of action based on Defendant's direct liability under Section 631(a) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. 2. Plaintiff's first cause of action based on Defendant's liability for aiding and abetting third parties is DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. 3. Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's second cause of action isDENIED. Plaintiff may file his second amended complaint on or before May 5, 2023. Plaintiff is further DIRECTED to file a "redlined" version of his complaint, identifying all additions and deletions of material, as an appendix to the amended complaint. An additional copy of this redlined version must be provided to Chambers by email at SSS_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov on the same day it is filed electronically. Plaintiff's failure to file a second amended complaint may result in dismissal with prejudice of his first cause of action. Defendant must file its responsive pleading on or before May 19, 2023. (lom)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: The Court finds that the Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 29] is appropriate for resolution without a hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the Court vacates the hearing set on March 24, 2023. The motion stands submitted on the papers timely filed. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 10, 2023 Filing 31 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case /First Amended Class Action Complaint #29 filed by Defendant Old Navy, LLC. (Duffy, Joseph)
March 3, 2023 Filing 30 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case /First Amended Class Action Complaint #29 filed by Plaintiff Miguel Licea. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ferrell, Scott)
February 3, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case /First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by defendant Old Navy, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 3/24/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Old Navy, LLC's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint (Doc. #29)) (Duffy, Joseph)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING THIRD STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDEDCOMPLAINT, #27 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: NOTE CHANGE MADE BY COURT. The Court, having considered the Parties Stipulation and finding good cause, hereby GRANTS the Stipulation and ORDERS that the deadline for Defendant Old Navy, LLC to respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint shall be extended to and including February 3, 2023. No further extensions will be permitted. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
January 10, 2023 Filing 27 Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Amended Complaint/Petition #14 filed by defendant Old Navy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Third Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint)(Duffy, Joseph)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 83-1.3.1 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 5:22-CV-01358-SSS(KKx) (ap)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDEDCOMPLAINT (Doc. #19) by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. The Court, having considered the Parties Stipulation and finding good cause, hereby GRANTS the Stipulation and ORDERS that the deadline for Defendant Old Navy, LLC to respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint shall be extended to and including January 13, 2023. The Court will not grant any further extensions absent extraordinary circumstances of good cause. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY, #23 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: The Court hereby orders that the request of: Old Navy, LLC, Defendant to substitute Joseph Duffy, of Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP who is retained counsel as attorney of record instead of Emily Johnson and Matthew Q. Verdin of Covington & Burling LLP. Added attorney Joseph Duffy for Old Navy, LLC. Attorney Emily Johnson Henn and Matthew Q Verdin terminated (shb)
November 8, 2022 Filing 23 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Emily Johnson Henn and Matthew Q. Verdin as counsel of record filed by Defendant Old Navy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Henn, Emily)
November 8, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order re Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form, #21 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint (DOC # 19))(Duffy, Joseph)
November 8, 2022 Filing 21 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #20 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Counsel is DIRECTED to L.R. 7-1. Pursuant to L.R. 5-4.4.1, counsel is further DIRECTED to electronically lodge the proposed order, as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging. Counsel is reminded to comply with L.R. 5-4.4.1 and L.R. 5-4.4.2. (iva)
November 8, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
November 7, 2022 Filing 19 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Amended Complaint/Petition #14 filed by Defendant Old Navy, LLC.(Duffy, Joseph)
November 7, 2022 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Megan A Suehiro counsel for Defendant Old Navy, LLC. Adding Megan A. Suehiro as counsel of record for Old Navy, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Old Navy, LLC. (Attorney Megan A Suehiro added to party Old Navy, LLC(pty:dft))(Suehiro, Megan)
November 7, 2022 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph Duffy counsel for Defendant Old Navy, LLC. Adding Joseph Duffy as counsel of record for Old Navy, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Old Navy, LLC. (Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Old Navy, LLC(pty:dft))(Duffy, Joseph)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (Doc. #15), by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: The Court, having considered the Parties Stipulation and finding good cause, hereby GRANTS the Stipulation and ORDERS that the deadline for Defendant Old Navy, LLC to respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint shall be extended to November 14, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
October 6, 2022 Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 14, 2022 re Amended Complaint/Petition #14 filed by Defendant Old Navy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint)(Henn, Emily)
September 30, 2022 Filing 14 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Miguel Licea(Ferrell, Scott)
September 6, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Old Navy, LLC answer now due 10/6/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Old Navy, LLC.(Henn, Emily)
September 6, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Old Navy, LLC, identifying Gap, Inc.. (Henn, Emily)
September 6, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew Q Verdin on behalf of Defendant Old Navy, LLC (Attorney Matthew Q Verdin added to party Old Navy, LLC(pty:dft))(Verdin, Matthew)
September 6, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Emily Johnson Henn on behalf of Defendant Old Navy, LLC (Attorney Emily Johnson Henn added to party Old Navy, LLC(pty:dft))(Henn, Emily)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
August 11, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Old Navy, LLC. (ghap)
August 11, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
August 11, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 11, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap)
August 10, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Miguel Licea. (Ferrell, Scott)
August 10, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Miguel Licea, (Ferrell, Scott)
August 10, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Miguel Licea. (Ferrell, Scott)
August 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33784466 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Miguel Licea. (Attorney Scott J Ferrell added to party Miguel Licea(pty:pla))(Ferrell, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miguel Licea v. Old Navy, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Licea
Represented By: Scott J Ferrell
Represented By: Victoria C. Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Navy, LLC
Represented By: Emily Johnson Henn
Represented By: Matthew Q Verdin
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Megan A Suehiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 25,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25. inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?