Miguel A. Licea v. GameStop, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Miguel A. Licea
Defendant: GameStop, Inc., DOES 1 through 25, and DOES 1 through 25, inclusive
Amicus Curiae: National Retail Federation
Case Number: 5:2022cv01562
Filed: September 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Miguel A. Licea. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Ferrell, Scott)
February 9, 2023 Filing 26 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal re: MOTION to Dismiss Case #13 . THE HEARING ON THE MOTION IS CONTINUED FROM 2/13/2023 TO 2/27/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 6, 2023 Filing 25 REQUEST to appear via zoom filed by Plaintiff Miguel A. Licea. Request set for hearing on 2/13/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Appear via Zoom) (Ferrell, Scott)
February 6, 2023 Filing 24 REQUEST for Leave of Sheri B. Pan to Appear for remotely at hearing on motion to dismiss filed by defendant GameStop, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pan, Sheri)
February 6, 2023 Filing 23 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Plaintiff Miguel A. Licea. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ferrell, Scott)
January 30, 2023 Filing 22 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #13 filed by Defendant GameStop, Inc.. (Pan, Sheri)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE FOR THE NATIONAL RETAIL FEDERATION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF #16 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. On December 9, 2022, the National Retail Federation filed a motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief in support of Defendant's motion to dismiss. (Dkt. No. 16) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion for leave. The hearing on the Motion set for January 30, 2023 is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rolm)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply in Light of Court Holiday and Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss #19 . GameStops Reply in support of the Motion shall be due on or before January 30, 2023; ( Motion hearing continued to 2/13/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal.) (twdb)
January 11, 2023 Filing 19 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss from January 30, 2023 to February 13, 2023 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #13 filed by defendant GameStop, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pan, Sheri)
January 9, 2023 Filing 18 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief #16 filed by Plaintiff Miguel A. Licea. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ferrell, Scott)
January 9, 2023 Filing 17 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #13 filed by Plaintiff Miguel A. Licea. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ferrell, Scott)
December 9, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curiae National Retail Federation. Motion set for hearing on 1/30/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Brief of Amicus Curiae the National Retail Federation In Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order C - [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Leave for the National Retail Federation to File Amicus Curiae Brief) (Gonzalez Araiza, Gabriela)
December 9, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gabriela Gonzalez Araiza on behalf of Amicus National Retail Federation (Attorney Gabriela Gonzalez Araiza added to party National Retail Federation(pty:am))(Gonzalez Araiza, Gabriela)
November 10, 2022 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant GameStop, Inc. identifying GameStop Corp. as Corporate Parent. (Pan, Sheri)
November 10, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant GameStop, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/30/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) (Pan, Sheri)
October 27, 2022 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Miguel A. Licea(Ferrell, Scott)
October 4, 2022 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Miguel A. Licea, upon Defendant GameStop, Inc. served on 9/12/2022, answer due 11/2/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz, at CT Corporation System, Inc. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Ferrell, Scott)
September 15, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to GameStop, Inc. answer now due 11/2/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant GameStop, Inc..(Attorney Sheri Bo Pan added to party GameStop, Inc.(pty:dft))(Pan, Sheri)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
September 8, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant GameStop, Inc. (jtil)
September 8, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
September 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 8, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (jtil)
September 6, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Miguel A. Licea. (Ferrell, Scott)
September 6, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Miguel A. Licea, (Ferrell, Scott)
September 6, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Miguel A. Licea. (Ferrell, Scott)
September 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33936014 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Miguel A. Licea. (Attorney Scott J Ferrell added to party Miguel A. Licea(pty:pla))(Ferrell, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miguel A. Licea v. GameStop, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel A. Licea
Represented By: Scott J Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GameStop, Inc.
Represented By: Sheri Bo Pan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 25,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Retail Federation
Represented By: Gabriela Gonzalez Araiza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?