Richard R. Lawless v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Richard R. Lawless
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2022cv01700
Filed: September 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
2 Judge: John W Holcomb
3 Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2022 Filing 21 SUMMONS SERVICE CONFIRMATION OF CERTIFIED RETURN RECEIPT RE PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Richard R. Lawless. (yl)
November 7, 2022 Filing 20 NOTIFICATION OF SUMMONS SERVICE DISPUTE Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to N/A. See attached Proof of delivery receipts attached. (lom)
November 2, 2022 Filing 19 EVIDENCE EXHIBIT TWENTY-THREE WITHHELD FOIA DOCUMENTS Filed filed by Plaintiff Richard R. Lawless. (yl)
October 25, 2022 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Richard R. Lawless, upon Defendant United States of America served on 10/25/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to "Mail room". Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Prandy. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (yl)
October 19, 2022 Filing 17 Summons Issued on Complaint - (Discovery), #1 on the Civil Process Clerk as to United States of America. (yl)
October 18, 2022 Filing 16 Summons Issued re Complaint #1 re US Attorney General as to Defendant United States of America. (yl)
October 18, 2022 Filing 15 Summons Issued re Complaint #1 re Civil Process Clerk as to Defendant United States of America. (yl)
October 18, 2022 Filing 14 Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 re US Attorney's Office as to Defendant United States of America. (yl)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (yl)
October 13, 2022 Filing 12 EVIDENCE EXHIBIT 23 FOIA DISCOVERY WITHHELD EVIDENCE Filed filed by Plaintiff Richard R. Lawless. (yl)
October 13, 2022 Filing 11 EVIDENCE EXHIBIT 22 FOIA DISCOVERY WITHHELD EVIDENCE Filed filed by Plaintiff Richard R. Lawless. (yl)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for further details) (yl)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:21-cv-01637 JWH(SPx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero and Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr to Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:22-cv-01700 JWH(SPx). Signed by Judge John W. Holcomb (rn)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
October 3, 2022 Filing 9 EVIDENCE EXHIBIT TEN filed by Plaintiff Richard R. Lawless. (gk)
September 30, 2022 Filing 6 EVIDENCE EXHIBIT NINE filed by Plaintiff Richard R. Lawless. (gk)
September 29, 2022 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
September 29, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 29, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (lh)
September 27, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Richard R. Lawless. (lh)
September 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant United States of America. Case assigned to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Richard R. Lawless. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 to Complaint, #2 Part 3 to Complaint, #3 Part 4 to Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Request, #6 Summons Request, #7 Summons Request) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard R. Lawless v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard R. Lawless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?