Miguel Licea v. Adidas America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Miguel Licea
Defendant: DOES 1 - 25,, Adidas America, Inc and Does 1 through 25 inclusive
Amicus Curiae: National Retail Federation
Case Number: 5:2022cv02077
Filed: November 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheri Pym
Referring Judge: Fred W Slaughter
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS #29 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Accordingly, the court the court DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE Plaintiff's claims and DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE the putative class claims. Therefore, the court DENIES as moot the pending motion to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, (Dkt. #14 ), and motion to file an amicus brief, (Dkt. #17 ). MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (lom)
March 22, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) #29 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): No [Prop] Order attached. Plaintiff is requesting the Court enter a dismissal of this action with prejudice as to the named Plaintiff and without prejudice as to the putative class. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
March 21, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Miguel Licea. Dismissal is with Prejudice. (Ferrell, Scott) Modified on 3/22/2023 (lom).
March 20, 2023 Filing 28 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Before the court are Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #14 and National Retail Federation's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curaie Brief #17 . The court finds these matters appropriate for decision without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearings set for March 23, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. are VACATED/OFF CALENDAR and the court takes the matters UNDER SUBMISSION. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING COUNSEL'S REQUEST TO APPEAR REMOTELY #26 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Accordingly, the court DENIES counsel's request to appear remotely. To the extent that Counsel Gonazalez-Araiza requires a continuance of the in-person hearing on March 23, 2023, any stipulation or other request for a continuance must be made by 9:00 a.m. PST on March 21, 2023. Denying #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Remotely. [See document for further details.] (es)
March 17, 2023 Filing 26 REQUEST for Leave of Gabriela Gonzalez-Araiza to Appear for Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief via Zoom filed by Amicus Curiae National Retail Federation. Request set for hearing on 3/23/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Request to Appear Via Zoom) (Gonzalez Araiza, Gabriela)
March 10, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Entry of Decision or Ruling by a Judge of this Court Granting Motions to Dismiss in Miguel Licea v. American Eagle Outfitters, Inc. and Jose Licea v. Cinmar LLC filed by Defendant Adidas America, Inc. (Patel, Purvi)
March 2, 2023 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief #17 filed by Plaintiff Miguel Licea. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ferrell, Scott)
February 23, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Adidas America, Inc. correcting Request for Judicial Notice #20 regarding CM/ECF event for Defendant adidas America, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Request for Judicial Notice in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Patel, Purvi)
February 22, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Adidas America, Inc. correcting Reply (Motion related) #19 (Patel, Purvi)
February 22, 2023 Filing 21 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint #14 filed by Defendant Adidas America, Inc. (Patel, Purvi)
February 22, 2023 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint #14 filed by Defendant Adidas America, Inc. (Patel, Purvi)
February 22, 2023 Filing 19 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint #14 filed by Defendant Adidas America, Inc. (Patel, Purvi)
February 8, 2023 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint #14 filed by Plaintiff Miguel Licea. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff Response in Opposition to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Ferrell, Scott)
January 20, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curiae National Retail Federation. Motion set for hearing on 3/23/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Brief of Amicus Curiae the National Retail Federation In Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Exhibit B - [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Leave for the National Retail Federation to File Amicus Curiae Brief) (Attorney Gabriela Gonzalez Araiza added to party National Retail Federation(pty:am)) (Gonzalez Araiza, Gabriela)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Scheduling Conference set for 4/6/2023 at 9:00 a.m. See Order for details. (mku)
January 16, 2023 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint #14 filed by Defendant Adidas America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Request for Judicial Notice)(Patel, Purvi)
January 16, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Adidas America, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 3/23/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lairen Baller, #2 Declaration of Anne Palm, #3 Declaration of Purvi G. Patel, #4 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint) (Patel, Purvi)
December 9, 2022 Filing 13 First AMENDED COMPLAINT All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Miguel Licea(Ferrell, Scott)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING (1) RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE; (2) PLAINTIFFS FORTHCOMING AMENDED COMPLAINT; AND (3) POTENTIAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON ANTICIPATED MOTION TO DISMISS #10 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Having considered and reviewed the Parties Joint Stipulation Regarding (1) Responsive Pleading Deadline; (2) Plaintiffs Forthcoming Amended Complaint; and (3) Potential Briefing Schedule on Anticipated Motion to Dismiss #10 (the Stipulation), and good cause appearing, the court ORDERS the following: 1. Plaintiff Miguel Licea (Plaintiff) shall file an Amended Complaint on or before December 9, 2022. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku)
November 23, 2022 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend filed by Defendant Adidas America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Patel, Purvi)
November 23, 2022 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
November 23, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
November 23, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:22-cv-02077 FWS (SPx). (sh)
November 22, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Adidas America, Inc., filed by Plaintiff Miguel Licea.[FILED IN STATE COURT 07/28/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh)
November 22, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Adidas America, Inc, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 11/22/2022. (Patel, Purvi)
November 22, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Yegishe Erik Manukyan counsel for Defendant Adidas America, Inc. Adding Erik Manukyan as counsel of record for Adidas America Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Adidas America Inc.. (Attorney Yegishe Erik Manukyan added to party Adidas America, Inc(pty:dft))(Manukyan, Yegishe)
November 22, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Earl Ladew counsel for Defendant Adidas America, Inc. Adding Matthew E. Ladew as counsel of record for Adidas America Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Adidas America Inc.. (Attorney Matthew Earl Ladew added to party Adidas America, Inc(pty:dft))(Ladew, Matthew)
November 22, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Adidas America, Inc identifying adidas North America, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Patel, Purvi)
November 22, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Adidas America, Inc. (Patel, Purvi)
November 22, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior, case number CIV-SB- 2216418 Receipt No: ACACDC-34367239 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Adidas America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Purvi G Patel added to party Adidas America, Inc(pty:dft))(Patel, Purvi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miguel Licea v. Adidas America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Licea
Represented By: Scott J Ferrell
Represented By: David W. Reid
Represented By: Victoria C. Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 - 25,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adidas America, Inc
Represented By: Yegishe Erik Manukyan
Represented By: Purvi G Patel
Represented By: Matthew Earl Ladew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Retail Federation
Represented By: Gabriela Gonzalez Araiza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?