Rio Vista Ventures, LLC v. Fresh Life Co. et al
Plaintiff: Rio Vista Ventures, LLC
Defendant: Fresh Life Co., Rose Mata, Elvira Mata and Gabriel Gomez
Case Number: 5:2023cv00786
Filed: May 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John F Walter
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DECLARATION of Lawrence H. Meuers of Lead Trial Counsle filed by Plaintiff Rio Vista Ventures, LLC. (Meuers, Lawrence)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Fresh Life Co., Rose Mata, Elvira Mata, Gabriel Gomez. (iv)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:23-cv-00786-JFW-MRWx. (aco)
June 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants All Defendants filed by Plaintiff Rio Vista Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support of Motion) (Meuers, Lawrence)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (dc)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rio Vista Ventures, LLC, upon Defendant Elvira Mata served on 5/13/2023, answer due 6/5/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe, Co-Occupant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy (Meuers, Lawrence)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rio Vista Ventures, LLC, upon Defendant Gabriel Gomez served on 5/13/2023, answer due 6/5/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriel Gomez in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service (Meuers, Lawrence)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rio Vista Ventures, LLC, upon Defendant Rose Mata served on 5/10/2023, answer due 5/31/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marlon Abarca - Co-Occupant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy (Meuers, Lawrence)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rio Vista Ventures, LLC, upon Defendant Fresh Life Co. served on 5/10/2023, answer due 5/31/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marlon Alexander Abarca, Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service (Meuers, Lawrence)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Gabriel Gomez. (et)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Elvira Mata. (et)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Rose Mata. (et)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Fresh Life Co. (et)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (Attachments: #1 CV11C Statement of Consent) (et)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Rio Vista Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Rose Mata, #2 Summons-Elvira Mata, #3 Summons-Gabriel Gomez)(Meuers, Lawrence)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Certification and (Local Rule 7.1-1) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rio Vista Ventures, LLC, (Meuers, Lawrence)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Rio Vista Ventures, LLC (Meuers, Lawrence)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Rio Vista Ventures, LLC. (Meuers, Lawrence)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35246696 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Rio Vista Ventures, LLC. (Attorney Lawrence H. Meuers added to party Rio Vista Ventures, LLC(pty:pla))(Meuers, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rio Vista Ventures, LLC v. Fresh Life Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rio Vista Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence H. Meuers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresh Life Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Mata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elvira Mata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?