Josue Gutierrez v. Ericsson Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Josue Gutierrez
Defendant: Ericsson Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2023cv01665
Filed: August 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by defendant Ericsson Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/20/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Norimoto, Nathan)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE, EXTEND DEADLINE FOR ERICSSON TO RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON ERICSSON'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge George H. Wu. The Court enters the following order: Ericsson's deadline to respond to the FAC is September 28, 2023. Rule 26(f) Status Conference shall be continued to December 11, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. (See document for additional deadlines and details). RE: Stipulation to Continue, #18 . (aco)
September 18, 2023 Filing 18 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Rule 26(f) Status Conference, from September 25, 2023 to December 11, 2023 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only, #14 filed by defendant Ericsson Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Norimoto, Nathan)
September 7, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Josue Gutierrez, (Wand, Aubry)
September 7, 2023 Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Does, Ericsson Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Josue Gutierrez(Wand, Aubry)
August 21, 2023 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ericsson Inc. answer now due 9/8/2023, filed by Defendant Ericsson Inc..(Norimoto, Nathan)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for September 25, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than September 18, 2023. See Local Rule 26-1. (aco)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
August 17, 2023 Filing 12 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
August 17, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 17, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge George H. Wu. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:23-cv-01665 GW (SHKx). (lh)
August 17, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Shashi H. Kewalramani. New Case Number 5:23-cv-01665 SSS (SHKx). (lh)
August 16, 2023 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Ericsson Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Josue Gutierrez. (FILED IN RIVERSIDE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/22/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
August 16, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Ericsson Inc.. correcting Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Declaration #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Declaration of Marissa Johnson (Corrected Format))(Norimoto, Nathan)
August 16, 2023 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 and Civil Local Rule 7.1-1 filed by Defendant Ericsson Inc. (Norimoto, Nathan)
August 16, 2023 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Victoria R. Carradero re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,, #1 filed by Defendant Ericsson Inc.. (Norimoto, Nathan)
August 16, 2023 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Marissa Johnson re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,, #1 filed by Defendant Ericsson Inc.. (Norimoto, Nathan)
August 16, 2023 Filing 4 Notice Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Ericsson's Notice of Removal filed by Defendant Ericsson Inc.. (Norimoto, Nathan)
August 16, 2023 Filing 3 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ericsson Inc.. (Norimoto, Nathan)
August 16, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ericsson Inc.. (Norimoto, Nathan)
August 16, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number CVRI2303202 Receipt No: ACACDC-35868932 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Ericsson Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex.. 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex.. 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit Ex.. 3 - State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Ex.. 4 - Certificate of Counsel, #5 Exhibit Ex.. 5 - Notice of CMC, #6 Exhibit Ex..6 - Notice of Assignment, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 - ADR Package, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 - Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9 - Notice of Reassignment, #10 Exhibit Ex. 10 - Certificate of Mailing, #11 Exhibit Ex. 11 - Case Management Order, #12 Exhibit Ex. 12 - Minute Order, #13 Exhibit Ex. 13 - Filed NAR, #14 Exhibit Ex. 14 - Jury Fee Deposit Notice, #15 Exhibit Ex. 15 - Filed Case Management Statement, #16 Exhibit Ex. 16 - Superior Court Docket, #17 Exhibit Ex. 17 - EUS Inc. Statement of Information, #18 Exhibit Ex. 18 - Ericsson Inc. Notice of Name Change, #19 Exhibit Ex. 19 - Google Maps Directions, #20 Exhibit Ex. 20 - IRS Mileage Report, #21 Exhibit Ex. 21 - CA DIR Minimum Wage FAQ, #22 Exhibit Ex. 22 - NWS Weather Data, #23 Exhibit Ex. 23 - Wand Fee Decl., #24 Exhibit Ex. 24 - US BLS Mobile Phone Report) (Attorney Nathan Norimoto added to party Ericsson Inc.(pty:dft))(Norimoto, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Josue Gutierrez v. Ericsson Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josue Gutierrez
Represented By: Aubry Wand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson Inc.
Represented By: Tatyana Shmygol
Represented By: Victoria Rose Carradero
Represented By: Nathan Norimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?