Robert O'Hara v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: Robert O'Hara
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company, Thomas Polito and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Michael H Leb
Case Number: 5:2023cv01862
Filed: September 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Wesley L Hsu
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2023 Filing 23 INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Plaintiff Robert O'Hara (Gilanians, Alexander)
November 9, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Michael H Leb has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #15 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: granting #15 Request to Substitute Attorney Eric Alexander Gilanians for Robert O'Hara as attorney of record instead of Attorney Kamran M Shahabi. (lom)
November 8, 2023 Filing 20 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Michael H. Leb may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Defendants BNSF Railway Company, Thomas Polito(Wooley, Koree)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STANDING ORDER FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CIVIL PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. The Scheduling Conference scheduled for October 20, 2023 is hereby VACATED. The pretrial schedule governing this case is set forth in the far right column labeled "Court Order" located on the parties' Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet, which accompanies this Order. If the parties wish to set additional or alternative dates, they must file a stipulation and proposed order setting forth the dates requested and demonstrating good cause. Setting additional or alternative dates may be especially appropriate in class actions, patent cases, or cases for benefits under the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 ("ERISA"). Please refer to the Court's Standing Order for Newly Assigned Civil Cases for requirements for specific motions, discovery, certain types of filings, courtesy copies, emailing signature items to chambers, settlement, and other matters pertaining to all civil cases. Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/22/2024 03:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 12/10/2024 09:00 AM. See order for other deadlines and information. (lom)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 09/13/2024. (hc)
October 17, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Eric Gilanians in place of attorney Kamran Shahabi #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): No [Prop] Order. See court's website - forms. There is a [prop] order that goes with this Request for Substitute Attorney (G-01). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
October 17, 2023 Filing 15 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Eric Gilanians in place of attorney Kamran Shahabi filed by Plaintiff Robert O'Hara. (Shahabi, Kamran)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym re Stipulation for Protective Order #13 . GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, the Court hereby approves this Stipulation and Protective Order. [See document for details.] (es)
October 12, 2023 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants BNSF Railway Company, Thomas Polito. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wooley, Koree)
October 12, 2023 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 6, filed by Defendants BNSF Railway Company, Thomas Polito.. (Wooley, Koree)
September 29, 2023 Filing 11 Notice OF COMPLIANCE WITH 28 U.S.C. 1446(d) filed by Defendants BNSF Railway Company, Thomas Polito. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Wooley, Koree)
September 20, 2023 CONFORMED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by defendants BNSF Railway Company, Thomas Polito. [Filed in Superior Court for the County of San Bernardino on 9/11/23] (lom)
September 20, 2023 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants BNSF Railway Company, Thomas Polito. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Conformed Copy of Answer to Complaint)(Wooley, Koree)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/20/2023 at 01:00 PM. See Attached Order for Details. (hc)
September 15, 2023 Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE WESLEY L. HSU. (hc)
September 14, 2023 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
September 14, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 14, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Wesley L. Hsu. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:23-cv-01862 WLH (SPx). (car)
September 12, 2023 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants BNSF Railway Company, Thomas Polito. Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
September 12, 2023 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants BNSF Railway Company, Does 1-20, inclusive, Thomas Polito. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Robert O'Hara. Filed in State Court on 9/12/2023 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
September 12, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants BNSF Railway Company, Thomas Polito, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on 09/12/2023. (Wooley, Koree)
September 12, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BNSF Railway Company, identifying Burlington Northern Santa Fe, LLC, Berkshire Hathaway Inc.. (Wooley, Koree)
September 12, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants BNSF Railway Company, Thomas Polito. (Wooley, Koree)
September 12, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino, case number CIVSB2315349 Receipt No: ACACDC-36022891 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Thomas Polito, BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Summons; Complaint; Civil Case Cover Sheet, Certificate of Assignment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Answer to Complaint, Proof of Service) (Attorney Koree B Wooley added to party BNSF Railway Company(pty:dft), Attorney Koree B Wooley added to party Thomas Polito(pty:dft))(Wooley, Koree)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert O'Hara v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert O'Hara
Represented By: Eric Alexander Gilanians
Represented By: Kamran M Shahabi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Koree B Wooley
Represented By: Jayce Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Polito
Represented By: Koree B Wooley
Represented By: Jayce Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Michael H Leb
Represented By: Michael H Leb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?