Liz-Anne Rodrigo v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.
Plaintiff: Liz-Anne Rodrigo
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. and DOES 1-50, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2023cv02042
Filed: October 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: kenly kiya kato
Referring Judge: Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1640 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TOINITIAL COMPLAINT BY MORE THAN 30 DAYS (Doc.) #13 , by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: The court, having considered the Parties Stipulation and finding good cause, hereby GRANTS the request in the Stipulation and ORDERS as follows:SLS shall have up to and including January 10, 2024 to respond to Plaintiffsinitial Complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
December 8, 2023 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to December 11, 2023 filed by defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Givental, Alisa)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY MORE THAN 30 DAYS (Doc. #11 ), by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: The court, having considered the Parties' Stipulation and finding good cause, hereby GRANTS the request in the Stipulation and ORDERS as follows: 1. SLS shall have up to and including December 11, 2023 to respond to Plaintiff's initial Complaint. (iva)
November 9, 2023 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to December 11, 2023 filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Givental, Alisa)
October 18, 2023 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC., re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #6 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 served on October 18, 2023. (Givental, Alisa)
October 18, 2023 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 served on October 18, 2023. (Givental, Alisa)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
October 13, 2023 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. answer now due 11/10/2023, filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC..(Givental, Alisa)
October 11, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
October 11, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 11, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (jtil)
October 6, 2023 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. in Riverside Superior Court on 8/30/2023, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
October 6, 2023 Filing 3 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 10/6/2023. (Givental, Alisa)
October 6, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC., identifying Specialized Loan Servicing Holdings, LLC. (Givental, Alisa)
October 6, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number CVRI2304585 Receipt No: ACACDC-36178561 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Alisa A Givental added to party Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.(pty:dft))(Givental, Alisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liz-Anne Rodrigo v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liz-Anne Rodrigo
Represented By: Jessica Diane Adair
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.
Represented By: Alisa A Givental
Represented By: Mary Kate Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?