Empire Worldwide Logistics LLC v. GLIK et al
Plaintiff: Empire Worldwide Logistics LLC
Defendant: ALEX L GLIK, LA FURNITURE WAREHOUSE, LLC, a California limited liability company, LA FURNITURE WAREHOUSE, LLC, a California limited liability company doing business as GLOBAL UNITED FURNITURE, GLOBAL UNITED FURNITURE, INC., GLOBAL UNITED FURNITURE, INC. (CA BUSINESS ENTITY NO. C4841899), WARVALE TRUCKING, INC., a California Corporation, GIL CHOI, Alex L. Glik, LA Furniture Warehouse LLC, Global United Furniture Inc., LA Furniture Warehouse LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Global United Furniture and Warvale Trucking Inc.
Case Number: 5:2023cv02068
Filed: October 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: kenly kiya kato
Referring Judge: Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Scheduling Conference set for 3/1/2024 at 01:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #26 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: ALEX L. GLIK, LA FURNITURE WAREHOUSE, LLC, LA FURNITURE WAREHOUSE, LLC, a California limited liability company doing business as GLOBAL UNITED FURNITURE, GLOBAL UNITED FURNITURE, INC. (CA Business Entity No. C3911460), and GLOBAL UNITED FURNITURE, INC. (CA Business Entity No.C4841899) shall have up to and including January 5, 2024, to file and serve their response to Plaintiffs Complaint. (lc)
December 4, 2023 Filing 26 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 5, 2024 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Alex L. Glik, Global United Furniture Inc.(a California Corporation CA Business Entity No. C4841899), Global United Furniture Inc.(a California Corporation CA Business Entity No. C3911460), LA Furniture Warehouse LLC(a California limited liability company), LA Furniture Warehouse LLC(a California Corporation CA Business Entity No. C3911460). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morris, Benjamin)
December 1, 2023 Filing 25 CROSSCLAIM against Alex L. Glik, LA Furniture Warehouse, LLC and Global United Furniture. Inc. Alex L. Glik, Global United Furniture Inc.(a California Corporation CA Business Entity No. C4841899), LA Furniture Warehouse LLC(a California limited liability company), filed by Cross-Claimant Warvale Trucking Inc..(Kavaller, Miles)
December 1, 2023 Filing 24 COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Empire Worldwide Logistics LLC, filed by Counter-Claimant Warvale Trucking Inc..(Kavaller, Miles)
December 1, 2023 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Miles L. Kavaller filed by Defendant Warvale Trucking Inc..(Kavaller, Miles)
November 13, 2023 Filing 22 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #11 filed by Defendant Warvale Trucking Inc..(Attorney Miles L Kavaller added to party Warvale Trucking Inc.(pty:dft))(Kavaller, Miles)
October 27, 2023 Filing 21 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to LA Furniture Warehouse LLC(a California limited liability company) answer now due 12/6/2023; Alex L. Glik answer now due 12/6/2023; LA Furniture Warehouse LLC(a California Corporation CA Business Entity No. C3911460) answer now due 12/6/2023; Global United Furniture Inc.(a California Corporation CA Business Entity No. C4841899) answer now due 12/6/2023; Global United Furniture Inc.(a California Corporation CA Business Entity No. C3911460) answer now due 12/6/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants LA Furniture Warehouse LLC(a California limited liability company); Alex L. Glik; LA Furniture Warehouse LLC(a California Corporation CA Business Entity No. C3911460); Global United Furniture Inc.(a California Corporation CA Business Entity No. C4841899); Global United Furniture Inc.(a California Corporation CA Business Entity No. C3911460).(Attorney Benjamin James Morris added to party Alex L. Glik(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin James Morris added to party Global United Furniture Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin James Morris added to party Global United Furniture Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin James Morris added to party LA Furniture Warehouse LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin James Morris added to party LA Furniture Warehouse LLC(pty:dft))(Morris, Benjamin)
October 22, 2023 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Empire Worldwide Logistics LLC, upon Defendant Warvale Trucking Inc. served on 10/18/2023, answer due 11/8/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ahmad Dahdoul, Owner in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Sedy, Margaret)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE, #10 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: GRANTING, #10 Non-Resident Attorney Christopher J. Cassar APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, Empire Worldwide Logistics, LLC, designating Margaret A. Sedy as local counsel. (shb)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
October 17, 2023 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Empire Worldwide Logistics LLC, upon Defendant Alex L. Glik served on 10/15/2023, answer due 11/6/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant Alex Glik in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service (Sedy, Margaret)
October 14, 2023 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Empire Worldwide Logistics LLC, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon JANE DOE (Occupant) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy (Sedy, Margaret)
October 14, 2023 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Empire Worldwide Logistics LLC, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon JANE DOE (Occupant) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy (Sedy, Margaret)
October 14, 2023 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Empire Worldwide Logistics LLC, upon Defendant LA Furniture Warehouse LLC(a California limited liability company) served on 10/14/2023, answer due 11/6/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon JANE DOE (Occupant) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy (Sedy, Margaret)
October 14, 2023 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Empire Worldwide Logistics LLC, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon JANE DOE (Occupant) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy (Sedy, Margaret)
October 14, 2023 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Empire Worldwide Logistics LLC, upon Defendant Global United Furniture Inc.(a California Corporation CA Business Entity No. C3911460) served on 10/14/2023, answer due 11/6/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon JANE DOE (Occupant) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy (Sedy, Margaret)
October 12, 2023 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Gil Choi, Alex L. Glik, Global United Furniture Inc.(a California Corporation CA Business Entity No. C4841899), Global United Furniture Inc.(a California Corporation CA Business Entity No. C3911460), LA Furniture Warehouse LLC(a California limited liability company), LA Furniture Warehouse LLC(a California Corporation CA Business Entity No. C3911460), Warvale Trucking Inc.. (sh)
October 12, 2023 Filing 10 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher J. Cassar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Empire Worldwide Logistics LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/10/2023, Receipt No. 36196346) filed by PLAINTIFF Empire Worldwide Logistics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Sedy, Margaret)
October 12, 2023 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
October 12, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
October 12, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (sh)
October 11, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher J. Cassar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Empire Worldwide Logistics LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36196346) #5 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Signature must be real. Signature cannot be a computer or Adobe generated signature. (lt)
October 10, 2023 Filing 5 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher J. Cassar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Empire Worldwide Logistics LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36196346) filed by PLAINTIFF Empire Worldwide Logistics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Sedy, Margaret)
October 10, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF Empire Worldwide Logistics LLC, identifying KENNETH QUARTAROLO. (Sedy, Margaret)
October 10, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Empire Worldwide Logistics LLC. (Sedy, Margaret)
October 10, 2023 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF Empire Worldwide Logistics LLC. (Sedy, Margaret)
October 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36195930 - Fee: $402, filed by PLAINTIFF Empire Worldwide Logistics LLC. (Attorney Margaret Ann Sedy added to party Empire Worldwide Logistics LLC(pty:pla))(Sedy, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Empire Worldwide Logistics LLC v. GLIK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Empire Worldwide Logistics LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Cassar
Represented By: Margaret Ann Sedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX L GLIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA FURNITURE WAREHOUSE, LLC, a California limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA FURNITURE WAREHOUSE, LLC, a California limited liability company doing business as GLOBAL UNITED FURNITURE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLOBAL UNITED FURNITURE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLOBAL UNITED FURNITURE, INC. (CA BUSINESS ENTITY NO. C4841899)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARVALE TRUCKING, INC., a California Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIL CHOI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex L. Glik
Represented By: Benjamin James Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA Furniture Warehouse LLC
Represented By: Benjamin James Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global United Furniture Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin James Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA Furniture Warehouse LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Global United Furniture
Represented By: Benjamin James Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warvale Trucking Inc.
Represented By: Miles L Kavaller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?