Alexandria Young v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Alexandria Young
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2023cv02378
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV23-2378 SK on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
January 9, 2024 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Geralyn A Gulseth added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Gulseth, Geralyn)
January 5, 2024 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Alexandria Young. (Attorney Geralyn A Gulseth added to party Alexandria Young(pty:pla))(rn)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE) by Judge Percy Anderson. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: The Request is GRANTED.; granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (aco)
November 30, 2023 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alexandria Young, upon Defendant Commissioner of Social Security served on 11/30/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (hr)
November 30, 2023 Filing 8 DENIAL LETTER from Plaintiff Alexandria Young (hr)
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE RE: PRO SE CLINIC INFORMATION by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim: The Court advises Plaintiff of the existence of the Federal Pro Se Clinics, which offer on-site information and guidance to individuals who are representing themselves (proceeding pro se) in federal civil actions. (See document for further details). (et)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim: This case is governed by the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), effective December 1, 2022. (See Order for details). (Attachments: #1 CV11 Statement of Consent) (et)
November 24, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (sh)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Alexandria Young. (sh)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Alexandria Young, (sh)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Case assigned to Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim., filed by Plaintiff Alexandria Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexandria Young v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandria Young
Represented By: Geralyn A Gulseth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Geralyn A Gulseth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?