Gary S. Hann v. Wallace P. Pitchford et al
Plaintiff: Gary S. Hann
Defendant: Wallace P. Pitchford, Estate of Hattie P. Pitchford, Janes Does, John Does, Rami Hjazi, Pamela Palmieri, Min J. Kim, Legal Services of South Center Michigan LSSCM and Ann L Routt
Case Number: 5:2023cv02381
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Proof of Service of Summons and complaint #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-3.8 title page is missing, incomplete, or incorrect. Other error(s) with document(s): Contact: Andres_Pedro@cacd.uscourts.gov. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb) Modified on 1/16/2024 (pj).
January 7, 2024 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE and summons and complaint by Swift Process Servers LLC Executed by Plaintiff Gary S. Hann, upon Defendant Wallace Pitchford on 12/28/23. Please see attached for further information. (pj)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: Granting #8 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (twdb)
December 5, 2023 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Gary S. Hann. (shb)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
November 25, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
November 25, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 25, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (et)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Gary S. Hann. (et)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendants Rami Hjazi, Janes Does 1-3, John Does 1-3, Min J. Kim, Legal Services of South Center Michigan LSSCM, Pamela Palmieri, Estate of Hattie P. Pitchford, Wallace P. Pitchford, Ann L Routt. (et)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Rami Hjazi, Janes Does 1-3, John Does 1-3, Min J. Kim, Legal Services of South Center Michigan LSSCM, Pamela Palmieri, Estate of Hattie P. Pitchford, Wallace P. Pitchford, Ann L Routt. Case assigned to Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (Filing fee $ 402 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Gary S. Hann. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gary S. Hann v. Wallace P. Pitchford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary S. Hann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace P. Pitchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Hattie P. Pitchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janes Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rami Hjazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Palmieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Min J. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legal Services of South Center Michigan LSSCM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann L Routt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?