Cara R. Price v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Cara R. Price
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2023cv02384
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John D. Early: granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
January 10, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV23-2384 JDE on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
January 9, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Michael K Marriott added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Marriott, Michael)
November 28, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Cara R. Price. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 SCHEDULING NOTICE SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. Subject to any ruling by the District Judge on Plaintiffs Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, the parties are directed to comply with the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), effective 12/1/22, as well as the Local Rules of this Court and the Fed. R. Civ. P., as applicable, in presenting the matter for decision by the Court. All briefs must comply with the Local Civil Rules, including Local Civil Rules 11-6.1 and 11-6.2. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mba) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 26, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Cara R. Price, (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Cara R. Price. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Cara R. Price. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Cara R. Price. (Attorney Lawrence D Rohlfing added to party Cara R. Price(pty:pla))(Rohlfing, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cara R. Price v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cara R. Price
Represented By: Lawrence D Rohlfing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Michael K Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?