Julie Ziegler v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Julie Ziegler
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2023cv02399
Filed: November 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Referring Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2024 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Julie Ziegler. (McCabe, Patricia)
January 8, 2024 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Geralyn A Gulseth added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Gulseth, Geralyn)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and referred to Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (lh)
November 26, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Julie Ziegler, (McCabe, Patricia)
November 25, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Julie Ziegler. (McCabe, Patricia)
November 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36462827 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Julie Ziegler. (Attorney Patricia L McCabe added to party Julie Ziegler(pty:pla))(McCabe, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Julie Ziegler v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Ziegler
Represented By: Patricia L McCabe
Represented By: Kristin Elizabeth Berk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Geralyn A Gulseth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?