Marco Almanza v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Plaintiff: Marco Almanza
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC a Delaware limited liability company DBA Mr. Cooper, Nationstar Mortgage LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Mr. Cooper and Does 1-20, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2023cv02404
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444 Notice of Removal - Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to #12 by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. The document is stricken. (See Order for further details). (aco)
December 27, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Withdraw REMAND #11 by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. The document is stricken. (See Order for further details). (aco)
December 27, 2023 Filing 15 Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to #12 filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Jared D. Bissell in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jared D. BisselI in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Jared D. BisselI in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Jared D. BisselI in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Bissell, Jared)
December 26, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or untimely. Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
December 26, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Withdraw REMAND #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Motions and Related Filings > Remand Case to State Court. Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or untimely. Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
December 22, 2023 Filing 12 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 12/27/2023, SEE DOC NO. 17] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to filed by plaintiff Marco Almanza. (Nowrouzi, Safora) Modified on 12/27/2023 (aco).
December 21, 2023 Filing 11 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 12/27/2023, SEE DOC NO. 16] First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Withdraw REMAND filed by plaintiff Marco Almanza. (Nowrouzi, Safora) Modified on 12/27/2023 (aco).
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2024 at 10:00 AM. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (npo)
December 4, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC.(Bissell, Jared)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges.by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 5:23-cv-02404 KK(MARx). (rn)
November 28, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC, identifying Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Mr. Cooper Group Inc., Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Nationstar Holdings Inc., Blackrock, Inc., and Vanguard Group, Inc.. (Bissell, Jared)
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment # 2 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No.1 Each document should have been filed separately. (et)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi for discovery. Pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Christina A. Snyder. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:23-cv-02404-CAS (MARx). (et)
November 27, 2023 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Does 1-20, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Marco Almanza. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/20/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside, case number CVRI2305635 Receipt No: ACACDC-36469203 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC a Delaware limited liability company DBA Mr. Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Jared D Bissell added to party Nationstar Mortgage LLC a Delaware limited liability company DBA Mr. Cooper (pty:dft))(Bissell, Jared)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marco Almanza v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Almanza
Represented By: Safora Nowrouzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC a Delaware limited liability company DBA Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Jared D Bissell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Jared D Bissell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?