Bruce Louis Howard v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Bruce Louis Howard
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2023cv02412
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV23-2412 PD on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
December 13, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Marriott, Michael)
December 12, 2023 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael K Marriott counsel for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Adding Michael Marriott as counsel of record for Commissioner of Social Security for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANT Commissioner of Social Security. (Attorney Michael K Marriott added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Marriott, Michael)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (et)
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by PLAINTIFF Bruce Louis Howard. (Attorney Mark Ver Planck added to party Bruce Louis Howard(pty:pla))(Ver Planck, Mark)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (jtil)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Bruce Louis Howard. (Panutich, Alex)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bruce Louis Howard, (Panutich, Alex)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bruce Louis Howard. (Panutich, Alex)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Bruce Louis Howard. (Attorney Alex Panutich added to party Bruce Louis Howard(pty:pla))(Panutich, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce Louis Howard v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Louis Howard
Represented By: Alex Panutich
Represented By: Mark Ver Planck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Michael K Marriott
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?