Conner Saitman v. Toufayan Bakeries, Inc.
Plaintiff: CONNER SAITMAN
Defendant: TOUFAYAN BAKERIES, INC and Toufayan Bakeries, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2023cv02439
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 30 Second REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response to the Complaint filed by Plaintiff Conner Saitman. (Braun, Michael)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING #28 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey I Carton APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Conner Saitman, designating Michael D Braun as local counsel. (jp)
January 8, 2024 Filing 28 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey I Carton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Conner Saitman (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 12/7/2023, Receipt No. 36529720) filed by Plaintiff Conner Saitman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Braun, Michael)
December 23, 2023 Filing 26 Request for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint re: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #19 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 (Braun, Michael)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING #25 Non-Resident Attorney James R Denlea APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Conner Saitman, designating Michael D Braun as local counsel. (jp)
December 20, 2023 Filing 25 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James R. Denlea to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Conner Saitman (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 12/7/2023, Receipt No. 36529735) filed by Plaintiff Conner Saitman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit) (Braun, Michael)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING #23 Non-Resident Attorney Stanislav Sharovskiy APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Conner Saitman, designating Michael D Braun as local counsel. (jp)
December 19, 2023 Filing 23 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stanislav Sharovskiy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Conner Saitman (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 12/7/2023, Receipt No. 36529742) filed by Plaintiff Conner Saitman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Braun, Michael)
December 15, 2023 Filing 22 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stanislav Sharovskiy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Conner Saitman (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36529742) #15 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The document is stricken. (pk)
December 15, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James R. Denlea to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Conner Saitman (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36529735) #14 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The document is stricken. (pk)
December 15, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey I Carton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Conner Saitman (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36529720) #13 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The document is stricken. (pk)
December 12, 2023 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Conner Saitman, upon Defendant Toufayan Bakeries, Inc. served on 12/5/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon KAREN NARGIZIAN, Person authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Braun, Michael)
December 7, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stanislav Sharovskiy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Conner Saitman (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36529742) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Order has not been flattened and is causing a corruption with the filing. (lt)
December 7, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James R. Denlea to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Conner Saitman (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36529735) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Proposed Order has not been flattened and is causing a corruption with the filing. Other error(s) with document(s): GSC from CT missing. Unable to locate attorney in CT. (lt)
December 7, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey I Carton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Conner Saitman (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36529720) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Proposed Order has not been flattened and is causing a corruption with the filing. Other error(s) with document(s): GSC from CT missing. (lt)
December 6, 2023 Filing 15 [STRICKEN PER DOCKET 22] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stanislav Sharovskiy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Conner Saitman (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36529742) filed by Plaintiff Conner Saitman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Braun, Michael) Modified on 12/15/2023 (pk).
December 6, 2023 Filing 14 [STRICKEN PER DOCKET 21] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James R. Denlea to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Conner Saitman (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36529735) filed by Plaintiff Conner Saitman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Braun, Michael) Modified on 12/15/2023 (pk).
December 6, 2023 Filing 13 [STRICKEN PER DOCKET 20] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey I Carton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Conner Saitman (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36529720) filed by Plaintiff Conner Saitman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Braun, Michael) Modified on 12/15/2023 (pk).
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (pk)
December 1, 2023 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Toufayan Bakeries, Inc. (lh)
December 1, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Stan Sharovskiy. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
December 1, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey I. Carton. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
December 1, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney James R. Denlea. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
December 1, 2023 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (lh)
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff CONNER SAITMAN. (Braun, Michael)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff CONNER SAITMAN, identifying Conner Saitman, Michael Braun, James Denlea, Jeffrey Carton, Stan Sharovskiy. (Braun, Michael)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff CONNER SAITMAN. (Braun, Michael)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36495088 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff CONNER SAITMAN. (Attorney Michael D Braun added to party CONNER SAITMAN(pty:pla))(Braun, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conner Saitman v. Toufayan Bakeries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONNER SAITMAN
Represented By: Michael D Braun
Represented By: Michael D. Braun
Represented By: James R Denlea
Represented By: Jeffrey I. Carton
Represented By: Stanislav Sharovskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOUFAYAN BAKERIES, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toufayan Bakeries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?