Sophia Reyes v. Covenant Transport, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sophia Reyes
Defendant: Covenant Transport, Inc., Covenant Transportation Group, Inc., Glenford A. Sampson and Does 1 to 20, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2023cv02440
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
2 Judge: Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT COVENANT TRANSPORTATION GROUP, INC. #16 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Defendant Covenant Transportation Group, Inc. is dismissed without prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
January 19, 2024 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Dismiss Covenant Transportation Group, Inc. Covenant Transportation Group, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Sophia Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendant Covenant Transportation Group, Inc.)(Attorney Michael Daurio added to party Sophia Reyes(pty:pla))(Daurio, Michael)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. In the present case, it appears that Plaintiff has not served the summons and complaint on one or more Defendants. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before January 22, 2024, why this action should not be dismissed, with respect to Defendant Glenford A. Sampson, who has not been served, for lack of prosecution. (lom)
January 3, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE OF LODGING filed AMENDED Notice of Lodging of Conformed Copy of State Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 (Kienle, Jenifer)
January 3, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 (Kienle, Jenifer)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Scheduling Conference set for 2/16/2024 at 01:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: This action has been reassigned to the Honorable Sunshine S. Sykes, United States District Judge. Judge Sykes is located in Courtroom 2, on the 2nd Floor of the George E. Brown, Jr. Federal Building and United States Courthouse at 3470 Twelfth Street, Riverside, California 92501. Additional information regarding Judge Sykes' procedures and schedules is available on the Court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 15, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
December 15, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym to Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:23-cv-02440-SSS (SHKx). (et)
December 1, 2023 Filing 7 STATEMENT Proof of Service of Consent to Magistrate Judge filed by Defendants Covenant Transport, Inc., Covenant Transportation Group, Inc. re: Statement #6 . (Kienle, Jenifer)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 STATEMENT Statement of Consent to Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Defendants Covenant Transport, Inc., Covenant Transportation Group, Inc. (Kienle, Jenifer)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 9 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh)
November 30, 2023 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Covenant Transport, Inc., Covenant Transportation Group, Inc., Does, Glenford A. Sampson, filed by Plaintiff Sophia Reyes. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/20/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
November 30, 2023 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Sophia Reyes, upon Defendant Covenant Transportation Group, Inc. served on 11/2/2023, answer due 11/24/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mike Dowies, Authorized Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/17/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
November 30, 2023 NON-CONFORMED ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Covenant Transport, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Covenant Transport, Inc., Covenant Transportation Group, Inc., (Kienle, Jenifer)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Covenant Transport, Inc., Covenant Transportation Group, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 served on November 30, 2023. (Kienle, Jenifer)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino, case number CIVSB2309164 Receipt No: ACACDC-36495206 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Covenant Transport, Inc., Covenant Transportation Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Declaration Declaration of Jenifer L. Kienle ISO Notice of Removal, #8 Declaration Declaration of Sean Rusaw ISO Notice of Remova, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Jenifer L Kienle added to party Covenant Transport, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jenifer L Kienle added to party Covenant Transportation Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kienle, Jenifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sophia Reyes v. Covenant Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Reyes
Represented By: Owili King Eison
Represented By: Michael Daurio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covenant Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Jenifer L Kienle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covenant Transportation Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jenifer L Kienle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenford A. Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?