Southern California Emergency Medicine, Inc. v. Daniel Werfel et al
Plaintiff: Southern California Emergency Medicine, Inc.
Defendant: Daniel Werfel, The United States Internal Revenue Service, Janet Yellen, The United States of America and The United States Department of Treasury
Case Number: 5:2023cv02450
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David T Bristow
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Southern California Emergency Medicine, Inc.. correcting Amended Complaint/Petition,, #17 -8 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Corrected Redlined Version of FAC (replacing Dkt. 17-8))(Arhangelsky, Peter)
December 27, 2023 Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by plaintiff Southern California Emergency Medicine, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Notice 2021-20), #2 Exhibit B (Moratorium Press Release), #3 Exhibit C (ERC Denial Letter), #4 Exhibit D (IRS Denial Redirect), #5 Exhibit E (CA EO N-33-20), #6 Exhibit F (GLAM Memo), #7 Exhibit G (Treausry Dept. Policy Statement), #8 Appendix Redlined Version)(Arhangelsky, Peter)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. No later than 1/3/2024, plaintiff shall file a First Amended Complaint setting forth sufficient allegations to establish venue. (vdr)
December 21, 2023 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Southern California Emergency Medicine, Inc., upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (Arhangelsky, Peter)
December 18, 2023 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 12, 2023 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant The United States Internal Revenue Service, The United States of America, Daniel Werfel, Janet Yellen, Civil Process Clerk, Merrick Garland. (iv)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:23-cv-02450 FMO(DTBx). (rn)
December 11, 2023 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Clerical Error (G-11),, #10 filed by plaintiff Southern California Emergency Medicine, Inc.. (Arhangelsky, Peter)
December 11, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Summons Request #9 : The following scanned document docket entry have/has been corrected as indicated below. The Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on 12/5/2023, dkt 9 re Request for Clerk to Issue Summons, needs to be filed correctly. Re request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached. Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the document. (shb)
December 5, 2023 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #8 filed by plaintiff Southern California Emergency Medicine, Inc.. (Arhangelsky, Peter)
December 5, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
December 5, 2023 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
December 5, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 5, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (lh)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Southern California Emergency Medicine, Inc.. (Arhangelsky, Peter)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Southern California Emergency Medicine, Inc. identifying n/a as Corporate Parent. (Arhangelsky, Peter)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Southern California Emergency Medicine, Inc.. (Arhangelsky, Peter)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36502292 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Southern California Emergency Medicine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Attorney Peter A Arhangelsky added to party Southern California Emergency Medicine, Inc.(pty:pla))(Arhangelsky, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern California Emergency Medicine, Inc. v. Daniel Werfel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern California Emergency Medicine, Inc.
Represented By: Peter A Arhangelsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Werfel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Yellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Department of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?