Joshua Lynn Gilliland v. United States of America
Petitioner: Joshua Lynn Gilliland
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2024cv00061
Filed: January 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stephanie S Christensen
Referring Judge: Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Letter #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): Local Rule 83-2.5 no letters to the Judge. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es)
February 1, 2024 Filing 7 Letter from Joshua Lynn Gilliland (es)
January 12, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and referred to Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV38 Letter Re: Habeas Corpus Transfer-In) (et)
January 12, 2024 Filing 5 Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition (CV-111). Upon submission of your petition for writ of habeas corpus, it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60P) attached. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action may be dismissed. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) #1 . (Attachments: #1 CV60P Request for IFP)(et)
January 12, 2024 Filing 4 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Texas Western
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FINAL ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge David Counts. (slt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/12/2024.]
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER SUA SPONTE TRANSFERRING CAUSE TO THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA, EASTERN DIVISION. Signed by Judge David Counts. (slt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/12/2024.]
December 21, 2023 Case transferred to District of California, Eastern Division. (slt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/12/2024.]
December 18, 2023 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 DUE.), filed by Joshua Lynn Gilliland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(kg) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/19/2023) (kg). [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/12/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joshua Lynn Gilliland v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joshua Lynn Gilliland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?