Cedric Garnett Johnson v. Travis Pennington et al
Plaintiff: Cedric Garnett Johnson
Defendant: Travis Pennington, D. Mortimer, D. Tristan, R. Paredes, J. Caropreso, T. Billington, K. Goleco, L. Quiroz, T. Pennington and H. Moseley
Case Number: 5:2024cv00678
Filed: March 31, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2024 Filing 6 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $0.13 initial partial filing fee from plaintiff Cedric Garnett Johnson on 05/24/2024, receipt number 17610, re: Order on Request for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV60P),, #5 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (fa)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: granting #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee. Re REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Institute for Men (CIM) is DIRECTED to submit a certified #2 . It is further ORDERED that the prisoner-plaintiff owes the Court the initial filing fee of $350.00. An initial partial filing fee of $1.26 must be paid within 30 days of the date of this order. Thereafter, monthly payments shall be forwarded to the Court in accordance with this order. (rolm)
April 2, 2024 Filing 4 CDCR INMATE STATEMENT REPORT filed by Plaintiff Cedric Garnett Johnson re: REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Institute for Men (CIM) is DIRECTED to submit a certified #2 . (et)
April 2, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (sh)
March 31, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Institute for Men (CIM) is DIRECTED to submit a certified Prison Trust Account Statement for Cedric Garnett Johnson CDC G03156 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account Statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified Prison Trust Account Statement in pdf format to PrisonerFilings_CACD@cacd.uscourts.gov with the case number and inmate name in the subject line as reflected on this notification. filed by Plaintiff Cedric Garnett Johnson. (sh)
March 31, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants T. Billington, J. Caropreso, K. Goleco, D. Mortimer, H. Moseley, R. Paredes, T. Pennington, Travis Pennington, L. Quiroz, D. Tristan pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Dean D. Pregerson and referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo., filed by Plaintiff Cedric Garnett Johnson. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cedric Garnett Johnson v. Travis Pennington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Garnett Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Mortimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Tristan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Paredes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Caropreso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Goleco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Quiroz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?