In Re Jason Scott Harper
Plaintiff: Sequoyah Deserthawk Kidwell
Defendant: Kathleen Allison, Rob Bonta, David Holbrook, Peter Aldana, Sharon Love Cole, Genevieve Salinas and California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Not Yet Classified: Jason Scott Harper
Case Number: 5:2024cv01027
Filed: May 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David T Bristow
Referring Judge: Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2024 Filing 8 Bill in Equity filed by plaintiff Sequoyah Deserthawk Kidwell. (rolm)
June 25, 2024 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
June 25, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
June 25, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (sh)
May 20, 2024 Filing 4 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Sequoyah Deserthawk Kidwell. (gk)
May 15, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE RE: DISCREPANCIES WITH FILING OF PRISONER COMPLAINT mailed to Plaintiff Sequoyah Deserthawk Kidwell. Upon filing of your complaint it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60P) attached. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date above, your action will be dismissed and the file closed. If you submit the CV-60P form or pay the filing fee within THIRTY DAYS, judges will be assigned. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. Re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 (sh)
May 6, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INTENT TO PROCEED ON CIVIL COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Sequoyah Deserthawk Kidwell. (sh)
May 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Peter Aldana, Kathleen Allison, Rob Bonta, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Jason Scott Harper, David Holbrook, Sharon Love Cole, Genevieve Salinas. filed by Plaintiff Sequoyah Deserthawk Kidwell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Jason Scott Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Jason Scott Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sequoyah Deserthawk Kidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Aldana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Love Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genevieve Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?