Intamin Ltd v. Magnetar Technologies Corp et al

Case Number: 8:2004cv00511
Filed: April 30, 2004
Court: California Central District Court
Nature of Suit: Patent

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 18, 2011 217 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT on Order Granting Motion for Entry of Final Judgment 216 by Judge Gary A. Feess. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED as follows: 1) The motion is GRANTED. 2) The Court's 12/28/2009 order 189 in favor of Magnetar, and against Intamin, in the amount of $819,646.03, is enforceable as entered. (csi)
December 28, 2009 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS FEES by Judge Gary A. Feess. The Court hereby GRANTSMagnetars motion for attorneys fees in the amount of $779,100.34. This amountrepresents the $804,686.28 in legal charges, less $25,585.66 in time written off. (See Confidential Ross Decl., Ex. A.) Additionally, Magnetars motion for expenses in the amount of $11,769.20, and other costs in the amount of $28,776.49 is GRANTED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (rrey)
August 26, 2009 169 Opinion or Order of the Court PARTIAL JUDGMENT by Judge Gary A. Feess. It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that: 1. Intamin take nothing by virtue of its claim that Magnetar infringed the patent infringement claims; 2. The issues of attorney's fees and costs to be resolved in proceedings in the district court and to be included in the final judgment entered at the conclusion of all proceedings in this case. (csi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intamin Ltd v. Magnetar Technologies Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?