The Fair Housing Council of Orange County et al v Gary Luke et al
Plaintiff: Maria Castaneda, Rafaela Alonzo, N C, Maria Del Carmen Maldonado, Javier Castaneda, Sr, Norberto Barranco, D A, C C, Jr, Laura Castaneda, E C, Graciela Barrera, D M, M P, Anna Franklin, Javier Castaneda, Jr, M F, R I S, Sara G Castaneda, Carlos Castaneda, Sr, S A, G B, C C and The Fair Housing Council of Orange County
Defendant: Gary Luke and Mary Ngo
Case Number: 8:2007cv00262
Filed: March 9, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Southern Division - Santa Ana Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Marc L Goldman
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2008. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, re CONSENT DECREE: (NUNC PRO TUNC TO MARCH 5, 2008) VI. PROVISIONS REGARDING COMPENSATION FOR AGGRIEVED PERSONS OTHER THAN PRIVATE PLAINTIFFS 17) within 45 days after this Decree, defendants shall make a monetary payment of $7,500 in the form a a check made payable to Ricardo Garcia to counsel for the U.S. for the purpose of paying monetary damages to Mr. Garcia. Mr Garcia shall not be paid until he has executed and delivered to counsel for the U.S. the release printed in English and Spanish at Exhibit E. VII. PROVISIONS REGARDING PRIVATE PLAINTIFFS: 19) Defendants shall make a total monetary payment of $233,344.00. The first payment of $188,344.00 shall be made within 45 days of entry of the Consent Decree in the form of a check made payable to the Attorney Client Trust Account of Brancart & Brancart. Defendants shall then pay $45,000.00 for attornys fees and litigation costs and expenses in equal monthly installments for a period of six months subsequent to the initial payment also in the form of checks made payable to the attorney Client Trust Account of Brancart & Brancart. This settlement sum reflects the payment of $20,000 to plaintiff Fair Housing Council of Orange County, Inc., the payment of $59,344.00 in attorneys fees and litigation costs and expenses, and damages payments to the private plaintffs as follows: (See document for further details.) (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (rla) Modified on 9/29/2008 (rla).
January 22, 2008 Filing 32 SUPPLEMENT to Brief in Support of Approval of Settlement of Claims of Minor G.B. [doc.67] filed by Plaintiff Rafaela Alonzo. (Brancart, Christopher)
January 22, 2008 Filing 31 SUPPLEMENT to Brief in Support of Approval of Settlement of Claims of Minors N.C. and N.C. [doc.66] filed by Plaintiff Maria Castaneda. (Brancart, Christopher)
January 22, 2008 Filing 30 SUPPLEMENT to Brief in Support of Approval of Settlement of Claims of Minors M.P. and R.S. [doc.65] filed by Plaintiff Graciela Barrera. (Brancart, Christopher)
January 22, 2008 Filing 29 SUPPLEMENT to Brief in Support of Approval of Settlement of Claims of Minors M.F. and N.C. [doc.64] filed by Plaintiff Norberto Barranco. (Brancart, Christopher)
January 22, 2008 Filing 28 SUPPLEMENT to Brief in Support of Approval of Settlement of Claims of Minors C.C., C.C.,Jr., S.A. and D.A. [doc.63] filed by Plaintiff Laura Castaneda. (Brancart, Christopher)
January 22, 2008 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Christopher Brancart in Support of Motions for Approval of Compromise of the Claims of Minor Plaintiffs in Case No. 07-0262 Joint APPLICATION for Order for Setting Telephonic Hearing on Motions' for Approval of Minors' Compromises for January 28, 2008, at 4:30 pm #25 (Supplemental) filed by Plaintiffs G B, Norberto Barranco, M F, N C, Anna Franklin, Graciela Barrera, The Fair Housing Council of Orange County, M P, R I S, Laura Castaneda, Carlos Castaneda, Sr, E C, C C, Jr, C C, D A, S A, Maria Castaneda, Rafaela Alonzo, Javier Castaneda, Sr, Javier Castaneda, Jr, Sara G Castaneda, N C, N C, Maria Del Carmen Maldonado, D M. (Brancart, Christopher)
January 18, 2008 Filing 26 proposed consent decree filed by Plaintiff The United States of America(jal)
January 14, 2008 Filing 25 Joint APPLICATION for Order for Setting Telephonic Hearing on Motions' for Approval of Minors' Compromises for January 28, 2008, at 4:30 pm filed by Plaintiff The Fair Housing Council of Orange County.Application set for hearing on 1/28/2008 at 04:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Setting Telephonic Hearing on Motions for Approval of Minors' Compromises for January 28, 2008)(Brancart, Elizabeth)
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JOINT APPLICATION AND STIPULATION re CONTINUING DISCOVERY CUTOFF DATE; and ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: For purposes of conducting depositons and propounding written discovery the discovery cut-off date is continued. Discovery cut-off 12/3/2007.(rla)
September 11, 2007 Filing 23 MINUTES OF (In Chambers) Settlement Conference held before Judge Marc L. Goldman: Pursuant to LR 16-14, the parties met this date and on 8/2/07 for a mandatory settlement conference. The parties were unable to reach an agreement on disposition of the case through settlement.Court Reporter: n/a.(rla)
August 9, 2007 Filing 22 JOINT STATUS REPORT (dmjr)
April 19, 2007 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by defendants Gary Luke, Mary Ngo.(esa, )
April 19, 2007 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Gary Luke, Mary Ngo. (esa, )
April 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge James V. Selna :, Cases associated with Lead Case SACV06-1109 JVS. All future documents shall be filed with the lead case(dmjr, )
April 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 224 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV06-1109JVS(MLGx). Case transfered from Judge Cormac J. Carney and Arthur Nakazato to Judge James V. Selna and Marc L. Goldman for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV07-262JVS(MLGx).Signed by Judge James V. Selna (csb, )
March 28, 2007 PREPARED ORDER RE TRANSFER Pursuant to General Order 224 (Related Case) by Clerk; related to SACV 06-1109 JVS (MLGx). (rn, )
March 21, 2007 Filing 17 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Deborah Elizabeth Pierson on behalf of Plaintiff The Fair Housing Council of Orange County; Filed by plaintiff Fair Housint Council of Orange County Inc (esa, )
March 9, 2007 Twenty day summons issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Gary Luke, Mary Ngo. (esa, )
March 9, 2007 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiffs G B, Norberto Barranco, M F, N C(minor, by his guardian ad litem, Norberto Barranco), Anna Franklin, Graciela Barrera, The Fair Housing Council of Orange County, M P, R I S, Laura Castaneda, Carlos Castaneda, Sr, E C, C C, Jr, C C, D A, S A, Maria Castaneda, Rafaela Alonzo, Javier Castaneda, Sr, Javier Castaneda, Jr, Sara G Castaneda, N C(minor, by his guardian ad litem, Maria Castaneda), N C(minor, by her guardian ad litem, Maria Castaneda), Maria Del Carmen Maldonado, D M. Related Case(s): SACV06-1109 JVS (MLGx) (esa, )
March 9, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendants Gary Luke, Mary Ngo; (Filing fee $ 350 paid); Jury Demanded; filed by plaintiffs G B, Norberto Barranco, M F, N C(minor, by his guardian ad litem, Norberto Barranco), Anna Franklin, Graciela Barrera, The Fair Housing Council of Orange County, M P, R I S, Laura Castaneda, Carlos Castaneda, Sr, E C, C C, Jr, C C, D A, S A, Maria Castaneda, Rafaela Alonzo, Javier Castaneda, Sr, Javier Castaneda, Jr, Sara G Castaneda, N C(minor, by his guardian ad litem, Maria Castaneda), N C(minor, by her guardian ad litem, Maria Castaneda), Maria Del Carmen Maldonado, D M.(esa, )
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey W Johnson appointing Norberto Barranco as guardian ad litem for minor, M F. (esa, )(esa, )
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey W Johnson appointing Norberto Barranco as guardian ad litem for minor, N C. (esa, )(esa, )
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey W Johnson appointing Graciela Barrera as guardian ad litem for minor, M P. (esa, )(esa, )
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey W Johnson appointing Graciela Barrera as guardian ad litem for minor, R I S. (esa, )
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey W Johnson appointing Maria Castaneda as guardian ad litem for minor, N C. (esa, )
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey W Johnson appointing Maria Castaneda as guardian ad litem for minor, N C. (esa, )
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey W Johnson appointing Rafaela Alonso as guardian ad litem for minor, D M. (esa, )
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey W Johnson appointing Rafaela Alonso as guardian ad litem for minor, G B. (esa, )(esa, )
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey W Johnson appointing Laura Castaneda as guardian ad litem for minor, E C. (esa, )(esa, )
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey W Johnson appointing Laura Castaneda as guardian ad litem for minor, C C, Jr. (esa, )(esa, )
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey W Johnson appointing Laura Castaneda as guardian ad litem for minor, S A. (esa, )(esa, )
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey W Johnson appointing Laura Castaneda as guardian ad litem for minor, D A. (esa, )(esa, )
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey W Johnson appointing Laura Castaneda as guardian ad litem for minor, C C. (esa, )
March 5, 2007 Filing 2 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs G B, Norberto Barranco, M F, N C, Anna Franklin, Graciela Barrera, The Fair Housing Council of Orange County, M P, R I S, Laura Castaneda, Carlos Castaneda, Sr, E C, C C, Jr, C C, D A, S A, Maria Castaneda, Rafaela Alonzo, Javier Castaneda, Sr, Javier Castaneda, Jr, Sara G Castaneda, N C, N C, Maria Del Carmen Maldonado, D M. (esa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Fair Housing Council of Orange County et al v Gary Luke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Castaneda
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafaela Alonzo
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N C
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Del Carmen Maldonado
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Castaneda, Sr
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norberto Barranco
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D A
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C C, Jr
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Castaneda
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E C
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graciela Barrera
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D M
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M P
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Franklin
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Castaneda, Jr
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M F
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R I S
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara G Castaneda
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Castaneda, Sr
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S A
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G B
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C C
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fair Housing Council of Orange County
Represented By: Deborah Elizabeth Pierson
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Represented By: Elizabeth Noonan Brancart
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Luke
Represented By: James J McDonald, Jr
Represented By: Christine Baran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ngo
Represented By: James J McDonald, Jr
Represented By: Christine Baran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?