Don Saulic v. Symantec Corporation et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Don Saulic
Defendant: Symantec Corporation, Digital River Inc and DOES 1 through 500
Case Number: 8:2007cv00610
Filed: May 25, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Southern Division - Santa Ana Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Paul L. Abrams
Presiding Judge: James V. Selna
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Injunctive/Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER OF DIMISSAL OF THE COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case 87 . The Complaint is dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear its own fees and costs. (db)
February 19, 2009 Filing 89 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation to Dismiss Case 87 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Geibelson, Michael)
February 19, 2009 Filing 88 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Digital River Inc, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case 87 served on February 18, 2009. (Geibelson, Michael)
February 18, 2009 Filing 87 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Digital River Inc.(Geibelson, Michael)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler, DENYING Request for Judicial Notice 45 , and DENYING MOTION to Certify Class 43 . (ade)
December 23, 2008 Filing 85 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Digital River Inc, re Notice of Decision by other Court 84 served on December 23, 2008. (Geibelson, Michael)
December 23, 2008 Filing 84 NOTICE of Decision: Later-Decided, Supplemental Authorities in Support of its Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Digital River Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Geibelson, Michael)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler, GRANTING Stipulation to Reschedule 82 , Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings:( Discovery cut-off 4/20/2009. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2009 02:00 PM before Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler. Jury Trial set for 11/17/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler.) (ade)
November 18, 2008 Filing 82 STIPULATION to Reschedule Case Deadlines filed by Defendant Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert)
October 20, 2008 Filing 81 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Robert B Hawk counsel for Defendant Symantec Corporation. Changing adress and firm name to Hogan & Hartson LLP. Changing email and fax number to rbhawk@hhlaw.com. Adding Robert B. Hawk as attorney as counsel of record for Symantec Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Symantec Corporation (Hawk, Robert)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER EXTENDING CASE DEADLINES by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler granting Stipulation to Reschedule 79 . The deadline for completing fact depositions is 01/02/09; Final Pretrial Conference is set for 07/06/09 at 2:00 p.m.; Jury Trial is set for 08/04/09 at 9:00 a.m. (See Order for details) (Note: Changes Made by Court) (db)
September 11, 2008 Filing 79 Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule Case Deadlines filed by defendant Digital River Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Weiss, Benjamin)
May 29, 2008 Filing 78 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Certify Class 43 filed by Defendant Symantec Corporation. (Hawk, Robert)
May 22, 2008 Filing 77 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Don Saulic, re Motion Related Document 76 Re Notice of Issuance of Court of Appeal Opinion, etc. served on May 22, 2008. (Joens, Timothy)
May 22, 2008 Filing 76 NOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF COURT OF APPEAL OPINION (TJX VS. SUPERIOR COURT) re MOTION to Certify Class 43 filed by Plaintiff Don Saulic. (Joens, Timothy)
May 19, 2008 Filing 75 MINUTES OF Motion to Certify Class, Request for Judicial Notice, Hearing held before Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler : Cause called. Counsel argue. Plaintiff to file decision referred to during hearing. Matter is submitted.Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (twdb)
May 13, 2008 Filing 74 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Don Saulic, re Reply (Motion related) 73 Of Plaintiff to Defendant's Objections And Motion to Strike, etc. served on May 13, 2008. (Joens, Timothy)
May 13, 2008 Filing 73 REPLY MOTION to Certify Class 43 In Reply to Defendants' Objections & Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff Don Saulic. (Joens, Timothy)
May 12, 2008 Filing 72 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Digital River Inc, re Miscellaneous Document, 71 served on May 12, 2008. (Geibelson, Michael)
May 12, 2008 Filing 71 Defendant Digital River, Inc.'s Objections and Motion to Strike Evidence and Argument Submitted by Plaintiff in His Reply to the Motion for Class Certification, or in the Alternative, For Leave to File A Sur Reply filed by Defendant Digital River Inc re: Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) 68 (Geibelson, Michael)
May 7, 2008 Filing 70 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Should be Service of Subsequent Documents. RE: Motion Related Document 69 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (ade)
May 5, 2008 Filing 69 PROOF OF SERVICE RE REPLY re MOTION to Certify Class 43 filed by Plaintiff Don Saulic. (Joens, Timothy)
May 5, 2008 Filing 68 REPLY In Support MOTION to Certify Class 43 filed by Plaintiff Don Saulic. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ex. 19 - Declaration of Timothy L. Joens# 2 Exhibit Ex. 20 - Deposition of Andrew Barker# 3 Declaration Ex. 21 - Declaration of Paul Turgeon# 4 Exhibit Ex. 22 - Deposition of Don Saulic# 5 Exhibit Ex. 23 - March 7, 2008 Letter From Mr. Beckman# 6 Exhibit Ex. 24 - March 28, 2007 Email From Mr. Joens# 7 Exhibit Ex. 25 - September 11, 2007 Letter From Mr. Joens# 8 Exhibit March 23, 2007 Letter From Mr. Hawk)(Joens, Timothy)
April 23, 2008 Filing 67 JOINDER in MOTION to Certify Class 43 joining in Defendant Digital River's Opposition to Motion to Certify Class Action filed by Defendant Symantec Corporation. (Fuller, Chad)
April 21, 2008 Filing 66 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Digital River Inc, re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion 60 , Request for Judicial Notice,, Request for Relief, 64 , Declaration (Motion related) 63 , Declaration (Motion related) 61 , Declaration (Motion related) 62 , Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 58 , Joinder (non-motion) 65 (on Sarah Ryan Houghland, Esq.) served on April 21, 2008. (Geibelson, Michael)
April 21, 2008 Filing 65 JOINDER filed by Defendant Digital River Inc joining in MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,, 59 . (Geibelson, Michael)
April 21, 2008 Filing 64 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Certify Class 43 Action filed by Defendant Digital River Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1 pgs. 3-26# 2 Attachment 1 pgs 27-51# 3 Attachment 1 pgs 52-76# 4 Attachment 1 pgs 77-101# 5 Attachment 1, pgs 102-118; Attachments 2-4 pgs 119-123# 6 Attachments 5-7 pgs 124-138)(Geibelson, Michael)
April 21, 2008 Filing 63 DECLARATION of Benjamin M. Weiss in opposition to MOTION to Certify Class 43 Action, Exhibit A filed by Defendant Digital River Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B through G)(Geibelson, Michael)
April 21, 2008 Filing 62 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Edwardy in opposition to MOTION to Certify Class 43 Action filed by Defendant Digital River Inc. (Geibelson, Michael)
April 21, 2008 Filing 61 DECLARATION of Richard Bump in opposition to MOTION to Certify Class 43 Action filed by Defendant Digital River Inc. (Geibelson, Michael)
April 21, 2008 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Certify Class 43 Action filed by Defendant Digital River Inc. (Geibelson, Michael)
April 21, 2008 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Certify Class 43 filed by Defendant Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rossini Zumwalt in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification# 2 Declaration of Evelyn Martin in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification# 3 Declaration of Robert Ford in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification# 4 Declaration of Michael I. Shamos in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification# 5 Exhibit 1 - Resume of Michael I. Shamos# 6 Declaration of Robert B. Hawk in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification# 7 Exhibit 1 - Pages from Plaintiff's Production# 8 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts from Plaintiff's 3/18/08 Deposition# 9 Exhibit 3 - Online PACER Registration Form# 10 Exhibit 4 - Screenshot from Renewal Center Purchase# 11 Exhibit 5 - Printouts of the Purchase-Process Flow from budgettrucks.com Website# 12 Exhibit 6 - Printouts of the Donation-Process Flow from the giving.depaul.edu Website# 13 Exhibit 7 - Printouts of the Donation-Process Flow from marinerschurch.org Website# 14 Exhibit 8 - Printouts of the Purchase-Process Flow from quickbooks.intuit.com Website# 15 Exhibit 9 - Printouts of the Purchase-Process Flow from creditcard.westlaw.com Website# 16 Exhibit 10 - Printouts of the Registration-Process Flow from web.lexis.com Website# 17 Exhibit 11 - Complaint in Saulic v. Tweeter# 18 Exhibit 12 - Don Saulic's 12/14/06 Notice of Status Conference Ruling from Saulic v. Tweeter# 19 Exhibit 13 - Symantec's 2/26/08 Notice of Deposition of Don Saulic# 20 Exhibit 14 - 2/29/08 Email from Tim Joens to Chad Fuller# 21 Exhibit 15 - Symantec's 3/5/08 Notice of Deposition of Don Saulic# 22 Exhibit 16 - Printout from tamvia.com Webpage# 23 Exhibit 17 - Skinner v. Best Buy Co., No. 2:06-cv-03749-FMC-Ex# 24 Exhibit 18 - Symantec's Form 10-Q for Period Ending 12/28/07# 25 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Fuller, Chad)
April 21, 2008 Filing 58 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Digital River Inc of Declaration of Andrew Barker in Support of Digital River, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. (Geibelson, Michael)
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler, GRANTING DEFENDANT DIGITAL RIVER'S Ex Parte Application 50 , and Continuing the Hearing date from 4/28/08 to 5/19/08 at 10:00 AM: (NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT) It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify a Class shall be due no later than April 21, 2008; 2. Plaintiff's Reply in Support of the Motion to Certify a Class shall be due no later than May 5, 2008; 3. The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Certify a Class shall be continued to May 19, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rla)
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler, GRANTING DEFENDANT SYMANTEC Corporation's Joinder in Digital River's Ex Parte Application and Continuing Hearing Date from 4/28/08 to 5/19/08 at 10:00 AM: (NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT) it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiff's Motion to Certify a Class 43 shall be due no later than April 21, 2008; 2. Plaintiff's Reply in Support of the Motion to Certify a Class 43 shall be due no later than May 5, 2008; 3. The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Certify a Class 43 shall be continued to May 19, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rla)
April 10, 2008 Filing 55 NOTICE OF LODGING filed (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Certifying Class)(Joens, Timothy)
April 10, 2008 Filing 54 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Incorrect event used: RE Motion Related Document 47 (db)
April 8, 2008 Filing 53 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Local Rule 11-8 Memorandum/brief exceeding 10 pages shall contain table of contents and table of authorities. (db)
April 8, 2008 Filing 52 OPPOSITION to Ex Parte Application of Defendants filed by Plaintiff Don Saulic. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Timothy L. Joens# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Letter of March 14, 2007# 3 Exhibit Exibit B - march 28, 2007 E-mail# 4 Exhibit Ex. C - September 11, 2007 Letter# 5 Exhibit Ex. D - January 11, 2008 Letter)(Joens, Timothy)
April 8, 2008 Filing 51 NOTICE of Joinder in Defendant Digital River's Ex Parte Application for One-Week Extension of Time to Oppose Motion for Class Certification, To Expand Page Limits, and to Continue Hearing filed by Defendant Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fuller, Chad)
April 8, 2008 Filing 50 NOTICE of Ex Parte Application and Ex Parte Application for One-Week Extension of Time to Oppose Motion for Class Certification, to Expand Page Limits, and to Continue Hearing; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Michael A. Geibelson in Support Thereof filed by defendant Digital River Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Geibelson, Michael)
April 8, 2008 Filing 49 Amendment to MOTION to Certify Class 43 filed by Plaintiff Don Saulic. (Joens, Timothy)
April 7, 2008 Filing 48 Amendment to MOTION to Certify Class 43 filed by Plaintiff Don Saulic. (Joens, Timothy)
April 7, 2008 Filing 47 [Proposed] Order Certifying Class re MOTION to Certify Class 43 filed by Plaintiff Don Saulic. (Joens, Timothy)
April 7, 2008 Filing 46 Proof of Service Re Motion to Certify Class re MOTION to Certify Class 43 filed by Plaintiff Don Saulic. (Joens, Timothy)
April 7, 2008 Filing 45 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Certify Class re MOTION to Certify Class 43 filed by Plaintiff Don Saulic. (Joens, Timothy)
April 7, 2008 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Certify Class 43 filed by Plaintiff Don Saulic. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Timothy L. Joens# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Complaint# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Digital River Answer to Complaint# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Answer to Complaint of Symantec Corporation# 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Plaintiff - Symantec Stipulation# 6 Declaration Exhibit 6 - Declaration Glenn Taylor# 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Digital River's Responses to 1st Set of Interrogatories# 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Symantec's Responses to 1st Set of Interrogatories# 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Excerpts from Deposition of Andrew Barker# 10 Declaration Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Malinda Pengelly# 11 Declaration Exhibit 11 - Declaration of J. Douglas Kirk# 12 Declaration Exhibit 12 - Declaration of Douglas Del Tondo# 13 Declaration Exhibit 13 - Declaration of Bryan M. Thomas# 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - 2004 Legal Notice# 15 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - 2005 Legal Notice# 16 Exhibit Exhibit 16 - Part 1.1 - Symantec 10-Q# 17 Exhibit Exhibit 16 - Part 1.2 - Symantec 10-Q# 18 Exhibit Exhibit 16 - Part 1.3 - Symantec 10-Q# 19 Exhibit Exhibit 16 - Part 1.4 - Symantec 10-Q# 20 Declaration Exhibit 17 - Declaration of Don Saulic# 21 Declaration Exhibit 18 - Declaration of Timothy L. Joens (#2))(Joens, Timothy)
April 7, 2008 Filing 43 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiff Don Saulic.Motion set for hearing on 4/28/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler. (Joens, Timothy)
January 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Paul L. Abrams. The Court is in receipt of defendant Symantec Corporation's "Notice of Motion Re Joint Stipulation Re: Protective Order 39 ," filed on 1/23/08. The Motion is DENIED AS MOOT as the Court, based on the parties' previous filing, issued a Protective Order in this matter on 1/23/08. (ch)
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ch)
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Paul L. Abrams. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Stipulation re: Protective Order 38 , filed herein on 1/16/08. The Court finds good cause exists for the entry of a Protective Order in this action and, concurrently with this Minute Order, has issued the proposed Protective Order submitted by the parties, with modifications (in italics). (ch)
January 23, 2008 Filing 39 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for Joint Stipulation filed by Defendant Symantec Corporation.Motion set for hearing on 2/26/2008 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (Attachments: # 1 ?Errata - Joint Stipulation Re: Protective Order# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit A Supplement)(Fuller, Chad)
January 16, 2008 Filing 38 Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Digital River Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Supplement Exhibit A)(Geibelson, Michael)
January 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler: SETTING DATES FOR: Discovery Cutoff: October 10, 2008; Final Pretrial Conference: April 6, 2009at 2:00 p.m.; Trial: May 5, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. II. ORDER FOR PREPARATIONFOR JURY TRIAL AND JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND SETTING EXHIBIT CONFERENCEFRIDAY BEFORE TRIAL III. ORDER GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT ATTRIAL. (See document for further details.) IT IS SO ORDERED. (rla)
January 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTES OF (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ISSUING SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler: Having received, read, and considered the parties Report an Supplement, the Court hereby schedules case management dates as set forth below. Motion to Certify Class Cutoff April 7, 2008; Fact Discovery Cutoff October 10, 2008; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures November 7, 2008; Defendant's Expert Disclosures December 5, 2008; Plaintiff's Expert Rebuttal December 19, 2008; Expert Discovery Cutoff January 2, 2009; Final Pretrial Conference April 6, 2009, at 2:00 p.m. Jury Trial May 5, 2009, at 9:00 a.m.Trial Time Estimate (by Parties) 10-12 days. (rla)
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler, DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION to Remand Case to State Court 19 : (See document for details.) IT IS SO ORDERED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the clerk shall serve a copy of this Order on counsel for all parties in this action. (rla)
November 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler, re Date for Hearing on Motion for Class Certification: The deadline by which plaintiff's motion for class certification should be heard should be extended, in the court's discretion, to at least 4/30/08. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rla)
August 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTES OF (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler: TAKING UNDER SUBMISSION Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand Case to State Court 19 . These matters are, therefore, removed from the Court's 9/10/07 calendar. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on counsel for all parties in this action.(rla)
August 23, 2007 Filing 33 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f); estimated length of trial 10 to 12 days, filed by Plaintiff Don Saulic. (klg)
August 14, 2007 Filing 31 SUPPLEMENT to joint report pursuant to Rule 26[f] filed by Plaintiff Don Saulic. (dmjr)
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTES OF (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler: CONTINUING HEARING ON Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to State Court 19 and if Appropriate to Grant Jurisdictional Discovery Pending a Ruling. Motion reset for hearing on 9/10/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this minute order on all counsel.(rla)
July 30, 2007 Filing 30 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Remand Case to State Court 19 ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Plaintiff Don Saulic. (esa)
July 27, 2007 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Dania Zamora filed by Defendant Symantec Corporation. (esa)
July 25, 2007 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Dania Zamora filed by Defendant Symantec Corporation. (esa)
July 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler: the documents listed below were improperly filed for the following reasons: LR 11-3.1.1 - font too small;1) Declaration of Dania Zamora. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the document(s) shall not be returned to the filing party; however, the Clerk shall note on the case docket that the documents are stricken from the record.(rla)
July 24, 2007 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Glenn Taylor in opposition to MOTION to Remand Case to State Court 19 filed by Defendant Symantec Corporation. (esa)
July 24, 2007 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Aaron S Jacobs in opposition to MOTION to Remand Case to State Court 19 filed by Defendant Symantec Corporation. (esa)
July 23, 2007 Filing 24 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Remand Case to State Court 19 filed by Defendant Symantec Corporation. (esa)
July 23, 2007 Filing 23 JOINDER in opposition to plaintiff's MOTION to Remand Case to State Court 19 filed by Defendant Digital River Inc. (esa)
July 9, 2007 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Chad R Fuller, Robert B Hawk on behalf of Defendant Symantec Corporation (esa)
July 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler : plaintiff has to 12/1/07 to fiel a motion for class certification(dmjr)
June 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler : The Motion to Remand is continued from 7/16/07 to 8/6/07 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10A; the time to file opposition papers is extended to 7/23/07; and the time for filing the reply papers is extended to 7/30/07.(esa)
June 26, 2007 Filing 20 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael A Geibelson attorney for Defendant Digital River Inc, changing address to 2049 Century Park East, Suite 3400, Los Angeles, CA 90067-3208. Filed by defendant Digital River Inc (esa)
June 22, 2007 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to State Court; Grant Discovery pending ruling; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by plaintiff Don Saulic.Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler. Lodged Proposed Order. (esa)
June 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler striking stipulation re extension of time to file motion for class certification,lodged 6/20/07 for the reason the font too small(dmjr)
June 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler: ORDER TO PARTIES Requiring Rule 26(f) Report to be filed. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/13/2007. (See document for further details.) IT IS SO ORDERED. (rla)
June 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to Section 3.2 of General Order 224 by Judge James V. Selna. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as SACV 07-610 AHS(PLAx).(esa)
June 5, 2007 Filing 14 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Don Saulic. (esa)
June 5, 2007 Filing 13 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by plaintiff Don Saulic. (esa)
June 4, 2007 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint 1 filed by defendant Symantec Corporation.(esa)
June 1, 2007 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Symantec Corporation. Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge for Discovery served on 5/30/07. (esa)
June 1, 2007 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Digital River Inc identifying NONE as Corporate Parent. (esa)
June 1, 2007 Filing 9 Consent to Removal filed by defendant Digital River Inc. (esa)
June 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case by Joseph P Beckman as counsel for Defendant Digital River Inc, designating Michael A Geibelson as local counsel. Fee PAID. Approved by Judge James V. Selna.(esa)
June 1, 2007 Filing 6 APPLICATION of Joseph P Beckman for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID. filed by defendant Digital River Inc. Lodged Order. (esa)
May 25, 2007 FAX number for Attorney Timothy L Joens is 949-851-1250. (esa)
May 25, 2007 FAX number for Attorney J Douglas Kirk is 949-851-1250. (esa)
May 25, 2007 FAX number for Attorney Bryan Melvil Thomas is 949-266-9621. (esa)
May 25, 2007 FAX number for Attorney Chad R Fuller is 858-450-8499. (esa)
May 25, 2007 FAX number for Attorneys Robert B Hawk, Sarah Houghland, Aaron S. Jacobs is 650-324-0638. (esa)
May 25, 2007 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Glenn Taylor filed by Defendant Symantec Corporation. (esa)
May 25, 2007 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant Symantec Corporation. Related Case(s): NONE (esa)
May 25, 2007 Filing 3 APPENDIX of State Court File filed by Defendant Symantec Corporation. (esa)
May 25, 2007 Filing 2 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Symantec Corporation. (esa)
May 25, 2007 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California State Court Orange County, case number 07CC01246 with copy of summons and complaint; Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Paul L Abrams; (Filing fee $ 350 paid); filed by defendant Symantec Corporation.(esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Don Saulic v. Symantec Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Saulic
Represented By: Bryan Melvil Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symantec Corporation
Represented By: Aaron S. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital River Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 500
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?