In Re Specific Media Flash Cookie Litig. Featured Case

Plaintiffs alleged that Defendant Specific Media, Inc., in concert with websites, and its counter and statistics tracking services affiliated individually with Specific Media, set "Flash cookies on their users' computers to sue the Flash Media Player local storage Flash on those computers to back up browser cookies for the purposes of restoring them later." Plaintiffs alleged that Defendant's action violated the Federal Computer Fraud and Abuse Act as well as California's Computer Crime Law, Invasion of Privacy Act, Consumer Legal Remedies Act, Unfair Competition Law, and constituted tress pass to personal property/chattels and unjust enrichment.

Resources:

Plaintiff: Bill Lathrop, Cahill Hooker, Genevive La Court, Deirde Harris, Judy Stough and EH
Defendant: Specific Media Inc
Consolidated Plaintiff: Stefen Kaufman
In Re: Specific Media Flash LSO Litigation
Case Number: 8:2010cv01256
Filed: August 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jay C Gandhi
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, The above-captioned matter is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Plaintiff STEFEN KAUFMAN and DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to all other putative class members. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (pj)
August 19, 2011 Filing 52 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Stefen Kaufman. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Stampley, David)
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR AND HEARING ONSPECIFIC MEDIA, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED, CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H Wu: The Court, having reviewed the stipulation of the parties, and good causeappearing, approves the stipulation and ORDERS: 1. Specific Medias Motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended, Consolidated Class Action Complaint shall be filed no later than August 19, 2011. 2. Plaintiffs Opposition to the Motion shall be filed no later than September 16, 2011. 3. Specific Medias Reply in support of its Motion shall be filed no later than September 29, 2011.4. The hearing on Specific Medias Motion and the status conference are hereby continued from October 6, 2011, at 8:30 a.m., to October 20, 2011, at 8:30 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. #50 (yl)
August 5, 2011 Filing 50 STIPULATION to Continue Briefing Schedule for and Hearing on Specific Media, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended, Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Status Conference from 10/6/2011 to 10/20/2011 filed by Defendant Specific Media Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jessen, Joshua)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Continue, #48 Specific Medias Motion to dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended, Consolidated Class Action Complaint shall be filed no later than August 5, 2011. Plaintiffs Opposition to the Motion shall be filed no later than September 2, 2011. Specific Medias Reply in support of its Motion shall be filed no laterthan September 15, 2011. The hearing on Specific Medias Motion and the status conference arehereby continued from September 19, 2011, at 8:30 a.m., to October 6,2011, at 8:30 a.m. (pj)
July 21, 2011 Filing 48 STIPULATION to Continue Briefing Schedule for and Hearing on Specific Media, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended, Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Status Conference from September 19, 2011 at 8:30 a.m. to October 6, 2011 at 8:30 a.m. filed by Defendant Specific Media Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jessen, Joshua)
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR AND HEARING ON SPECIFIC MEDIA, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED, CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Continue, #46 The Court, having reviewed the stipulation of the parties, and good cause appearing, approves the stipulation and ORDERS: 1. Specific Medias Motion to dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended, Consolidated Class Action Complaint shall be filed no later than July 21, 2011. 2. Plaintiffs Opposition to the Motion shall be filed no later than August 18, 2011. 3. Specific Medias Reply in support of its Motion shall be filed no later than August 31, 2011. 4. The hearing on Specific Medias Motion and the status conference are hereby continued from August 11, 2011 to September 19, 2011, at 8:30 a.m. (rp)
June 22, 2011 Filing 46 STIPULATION to Continue Briefing Schedule for and Hearing on Specific Media, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended, Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Status Conference from June 23, 2011 to July 21, 2011 Re: Order,, #45 filed by Defendant Specific Media Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jessen, Joshua)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Continue, #44 . Specific Medias motion to dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended, Consolidated Class Action Complaint shall be filed no later than June 23, 2011. 2. Plaintiffs opposition to the motion shall be filed no later than July 19,2011. 3. Specific Medias reply in support of its motion shall be filed no later thanAugust 1, 2011. 4. The hearing on Specific Medias motion shall be held on August 11,2011, at 8:30 a.m., and the June 20, 2011 status conference shall becontinued to August 11, 2011, at 8:30 a.m., as well. (pj)
May 31, 2011 Filing 44 STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from June 20, 2011 to August 11, 2011 Re: Order on Motion to Dismiss Case, Motion Hearing, Scheduling Conference, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,, #39 filed by Defendant Specific Media Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jessen, Joshua)
May 17, 2011 Filing 43 SECOND AMENDED, CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendant Specific Media, Inc.; amending First Amended, Consolidated Class Action Complaint #19 ; with Jury Demand filed by Plaintiff Stefen Kaufman. (gk) (pj).
May 17, 2011 Filing 42 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Consol Plaintiff Stefen Kaufman of SECOND AMENDED, CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. (Stampley, David)
May 16, 2011 Filing 41 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on Thursday, April 28, 2011, 9:38 A.M. Court Reporter: Wil S. Wilcox, phone number 213-290-2849. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/6/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2011. (Wilcox, Wil)
May 2, 2011 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Susan Ashlie Beringer on behalf of Defendant Specific Media Inc (Beringer, Susan)
April 28, 2011 Filing 39 MINUTES OF DEFENDANT SPECIFIC MEDIA, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (filed 02/17/11); STATUS CONFERENCE #21 held before Judge George H Wu: The tentative circulated is attached and adopted as the Court's final ruling. Defendant Specific Media, Inc. 's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint is granted with leave to amend. Plaintiffs will have until May 17,2011 to manually file the Second Amended Complaint.The status conference is continued to June 20, 2011 at 8:30 a.m. Defendants may use June 20,2011 as a dispositive motion hearing date. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
April 27, 2011 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case #21 Letter and Supplemental Authority filed by Consol Plaintiff Stefen Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Valentine v. NebuAd, 2011 WL 1296111 (Apr. 4, 2011 N.D.Cal.))(Stampley, David)
April 14, 2011 Filing 37 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10 days, filed by Consol Plaintiff Stefen Kaufman.. (Stampley, David)
April 14, 2011 Filing 36 REPLY In Support Of MOTION to Dismiss Case #21 filed by Defendant Specific Media Inc. (Reeves, Jeffrey)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER APPROVING REVISED STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT AND FOR SPECIFIC MEDIA, INC. TO FILE ITS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS; AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE APRIL 7, 2011 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON DEFENDANT SPECIFIC MEDIA, INC'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge George H Wu. The April 7, 2011 scheduling conference and hearing on Specific Media's Motion to Dismiss is continued to April 28, 2011, at 8:30 a.m. (rs)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER APPROVING PARTIES STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT AND FOR DEFENDANT SPECIFIC MEDIA, INC. TO FILE ITS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File, #33 , ( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/29/2011.). Specific Media shall file its reply in support of its Motion no later than March 29, 2011. (pj)
March 28, 2011 Filing 33 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Joint Rule 26(F) Report and for Specific Media, Inc. to file its Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss; and Stipulation to Continue April 7, 2011 Scheduling Conference and Hearing on Defendant Specific Media, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Specific Media Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jessen, Joshua)
March 24, 2011 Filing 32 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Specific Media Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jessen, Joshua)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge George H Wu,, The Court, having reviewed the stipulation of the parties, and good cause appearing, approves the stipulation and ORDERS: The hearing on Specific Media's Motion to Dismiss is continued to April 7, 2011, at 8:30 a.m. Specific Media shall file its reply in support of its Motion no later than March 24, 2011. (bp)
March 14, 2011 Filing 30 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Specific Media, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended, Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Reply Deadline from March 31, 2011 to April 7, 2011 Re: MOTION to Dismiss Case #21 filed by Defendant Specific Media Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jessen, Joshua)
March 10, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Errata #28 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (pj)
March 9, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Consol Plaintiff Stefen Kaufman. correcting Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #27 Table of Authorities (Kreitenberg, Avi)
March 9, 2011 Filing 27 to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Opposition re: MOTION to Dismiss Case #21 filed by Consol Plaintiff Stefen Kaufman. (Stampley, David)
March 9, 2011 Filing 26 DECLARATION of David A. Stampley in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case #21 filed by Consol Plaintiff Stefen Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Joint Flash Overview, #2 Exhibit B: Settlement Agreement)(Stampley, David)
March 3, 2011 Filing 25 MINUTES: PROCEEDINGS: STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge George H Wu: A Scheduling Conference is set for 4/7/2011 at 8:30 AM. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report will be filed with the Court not later than 34/24/2011. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (jp)
February 28, 2011 Filing 24 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H Wu. The Status Conference is continued to March 3, 2011 at 8:30 a.m. Parties may appear telephonically provided that notice is given to the clerk by March 1, 2011. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (rs)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER APPROVING PARTIES STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANT SPECIFIC MEDIA, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED, CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge George H Wu #22 . 1. The hearing on Specific Medias Motion to Dismiss is continued to March 31, 2011, at 8:30 a.m. 2. Plaintiffs shall file their response to Specific Medias Motion no later than March 8, 2011. 3. Specific Media shall file its reply in support of its Motion no later than March 17, 2011. (im)
February 25, 2011 Filing 22 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Specific Media, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended, Consolidated Class Action Complaint and for Briefing Schedule from March 17, 2011 at 8:30 a.m. to March 31, 2011 at 8:30 a.m. Re: MOTION to Dismiss Case #21 filed by Defendant Specific Media Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jessen, Joshua)
February 17, 2011 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Specific Media Inc. Motion set for hearing on 3/17/2011 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reeves, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2011 Filing 20 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George H Wu: The Court, on its own motion, sets a Status Conference for 2/28/2011 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (mg)
January 18, 2011 Filing 19 FIRST AMENDED, CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against SpecificMedia, Inc. related to: Complaint #2 ; with Jury Demand filed by Plaintiffs Genevive La Court, Deirde Harris, Cahill Hooker, Bill Lathrop, Judy Stough, E.H. a minor by and through parent Jeff Hall and Stefen Kaufman. (gk) (pj).
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge George H Wu to Consolidate and Create Organizational Structure for Counsel. Pursuant to the Stipulation #17 , the Court consolidates Genevive La Court, et al. v. Specific Media, Inc., Case No. 8:10-cv-01256-GW (JCGx) and Kaufman v. SpecificMedia, Inc., Case No. 8:10-cv-01891-JVS (RNBx). Each document filed by a party to this litigation shall bear the following caption: In Re Specific Media Flash Cookie Litig. No. 8:10-cv-01256-GW (JCGx). Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(g)(2), inter alia, Interim Class Counsel shall be Scott A. Kamber of KamberLaw, LLC and David C. Parisi of Parisi & Havens LLP. Interim Class Counsel, acting on behalf of Plaintiffs. (mg) Modified on 12/29/2010 (mg).
December 20, 2010 Filing 17 STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases as to 8:10-cv-01891-JVS (RNBx) filed by Defendant Specific Media Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reeves, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2010 Filing 16 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Specific Media Inc. Related Case(s): 8:10-cv-01891-JVS (RNBx) (Reeves, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu BY Judge George H Wu, (pj)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV10-05484 GW (JCGx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton and Judge James V. Selna to Judge George H Wu and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV10-01256 GW (JCGx). Signed by Judge George H Wu. (rrp)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER CONTINUING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge James V. Selna, pursuant to Stipulation to Continue #11 . The Court, having reviewed the stipulation of the parties, and good cause appearing, ORDERS: 1. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than December 23, 2010. 2. The parties shall conduct their Rule 26(f) conference no later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference. 3. The parties' Rule 26(f) report shall be filed no later than 14 days after the parties' Rule 26(f) conference. 4. The December 13, 2010 scheduling conference set forth in the Order is hereby continued to January 3, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro)
November 18, 2010 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Specific Media Incto Notice of Related Case(s) #9 (Reeves, Jeffrey)
November 18, 2010 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Continue Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference from December 13, 2010 to January 3, 2011 Re: Order, Set/Reset Hearing #7 filed by defendant Specific Media Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reeves, Jeffrey)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph H. Malley on behalf of plaintiffs, designating David C. Parisi as local counsel. (dro)
November 16, 2010 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiffs EH, Deirde Harris, Cahill Hooker, Genevive La Court, Bill Lathrop, Judy Stough. Related Case(s): 2:10-cv-05494-GW-JCGx; 2:10-cv-05948-GW-JCGx; 2:10-cv-07112-GW-JCGx (Moradmand, Azita)
November 16, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for attorney Joseph H. Malley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-7814160 paid.) filed by plaintiffs EH, Deirde Harris, Cahill Hooker, Genevive La Court, Bill Lathrop, Judy Stough. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on application of non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case)(Moradmand, Azita)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2010 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (db)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian:Order Directing Clerk to Re-Serve Plaintiff with Order Granting Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (SEE MINUTES FOR DETAILS). (kca)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER by Judge James V. Selna Following Filing of Complaint Assigned to Judge Selna. (See Order for details) (db)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting Petition for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem For E.H. #1 by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, the Petition for an order appointing Jeff Hall as guardian ad litem for petitioner E.H. is GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lwag)
August 19, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs EH, Deirde Harris, Cahill Hooker, Genevive La Court, Bill Lathrop and Judy Stough. (lwag)
August 19, 2010 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) #2 as to Defendant Specific Media Inc. (lwag)
August 19, 2010 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Defendant Specific Media Inc. Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton.(Filing fee $ 350 Paid). Jury Demanded. Filed by Plaintiffs Genevive La Court, Deirde Harris, Cahill Hooker, Judy Stough, Bill Lathrop and EH.(lwag)
August 18, 2010 Filing 1 PETITION for Appointment of Guardian ad Litem for E.H. filed by Plaintiffs EH, Deirde Harris, Cahill Hooker, Genevive La Court, Bill Lathrop and Judy Stough. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lwag)
August 18, 2010 Filing 1 PETITION for Appointment of Guardian ad Litem for E.H. filed by Plaintiffs EH, Deirde Harris, Cahill Hooker, Genevive La Court, Bill Lathrop and Judy Stough. (Attachments: # 1 Lodged Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lwag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Specific Media Flash Cookie Litig.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Lathrop
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cahill Hooker
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genevive La Court
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deirde Harris
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Stough
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EH
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: David C Parisi
Represented By: Azita Moradmand
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Stefen Kaufman
Represented By: Avi Melech Kreitenberg
Represented By: David A Stampley
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specific Media Inc
Represented By: S Ashlie Beringer
Represented By: Jeffrey H Reeves
Represented By: Joshua A Jessen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Specific Media Flash LSO Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?