Bryan Pringle v. William Adams Jr et al Featured Case

Songwriter Bryan Pringle sues the Black Eyed Peas for copyright infringement, alleging that 'Boom Boom Pow' and 'I Gotta feeling' are copies of Pringle's work.

Plaintiff: Bryan Pringle
Defendant: Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson, Jaime Gomez, David Guetta, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Interscope Records, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr, Allan Pineda, Frederick Riesterer, Rister Editions, Shapiro Bernstein and Co, Square Rivoli Publishing, Tab Magnetic Publishing, UMG Recordings Inc and Will.I.Am Music LLC
Case Number: 8:2010cv01656
Filed: October 28, 2010
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Josephine Staton Tucker
Referring Judge: Ralph Zarefsky
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2012 290 Amendment to MOTION for Attorney Fees of all Defendants 280 (Amended Notice of Motion) filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
May 30, 2012 289 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiff Bryan Pringle filed by Defendants Allan Pineda(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Stacy Ferguson(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Jeepney Music Inc, Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC, Stacy Ferguson(individually), Jaime Gomez(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), EMI April Music Inc, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jaime Gomez(individually), Allan Pineda(individually), William Adams Jr(individually), Cherry River Music Co, William Adams Jr(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas). Application set for hearing on 6/15/2012 at 11:00 AM before Clerk of Court. (Attachments: # 1 Bill of Costs, # 2 Bill of Costs Details, # 3 Declaration Kara Cenar, # 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kara Cenar, # 5 Exhibit B to Declaration of Kara Cenar)(Righettini, Justin)
May 25, 2012 288 DECLARATION of Edwin F. McPherson In Support MOTION for Attorney Fees of all Defendants 280 filed by Defendants Stacy Ferguson, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McPherson, Edwin)
May 25, 2012 287 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. Appeal of Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, 136 , Order on Motion for Summary Judgment 252 , Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, 274 , Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, 126 (Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0973-10435549 paid.) (Holley, Colin)
May 25, 2012 286 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. correcting Notice (Other) 278 (Holley, Colin)
May 25, 2012 285 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees of all Defendants 280 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
May 25, 2012 284 DECLARATION of Kara Cenar in Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees of all Defendants 280 Declaration of Kara E. F. Cenar in Support of Defendants' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Full Costs Against Plaintiff and His Counsel filed by Defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson, Stacy Ferguson, Jaime Gomez, Jaime Gomez, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr, William Adams Jr, Allan Pineda, Allan Pineda, Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Righettini, Justin)
May 25, 2012 283 DECLARATION of Tal E. Dickstein in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees of all Defendants 280 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Miller, Donald)
May 25, 2012 282 DECLARATION of Barry I. Slotnick in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees of all Defendants 280 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20 (Part One), # 21 Exhibit 20 (Part Two), # 22 Exhibit 21)(Miller, Donald)
May 25, 2012 281 DECLARATION of Linda M. Burrow in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees of all Defendants 280 DECLARATION OF LINDA M. BURROW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND FULL COSTS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND HIS COUNSEL filed by Defendants Interscope Records, UMG Recordings Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A&B)(Burrow, Linda)
May 25, 2012 280 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees of all Defendants filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. Motion set for hearing on 6/25/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Josephine Staton Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Donald)
May 25, 2012 279 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiff Bryan Pringle filed by Defendants Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co, David Guetta. Application set for hearing on 6/8/2012 at 11:00 AM before Clerk of Court. (Attachments: # 1 Bill of Costs, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Attachment)(Miller, Donald)
May 22, 2012 278 NOTICE of Appeal filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Holley, Colin)
May 16, 2012 277 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (twdb)
May 15, 2012 276 JUDGMENT by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker. It is HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED,AND DECREED that Judgment be entered in favor of Defendants. Any motion by Defendants for sanctions, attorneys fees and expenses shall be filed on or before 14 days after entry of Judgment, and shall include all bases for such relief in one combined, omnibus motion. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (twdb)
May 7, 2012 275 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment 252 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Judgment))(Miller, Donald)
May 3, 2012 274 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER (1) GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF REMAINING DEFENDANTS; AND (2) DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ASMOOT (Doc. 262) by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker: Accordingly, Plaintiffs Motion for Voluntary Dismissal is DENIED AS MOOT, and the hearing set for May 14, 2012 is VACATED. Defendants are ordered to prepare a proposed Judgment consistent with the Courts rulings 262 . (twdb)
April 30, 2012 273 REPLY in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Parties Without Prejudice and Without Fees or Costs, filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kathleen E. Koppenhoefer in Further Support of Motion)(Holley, Colin)
April 23, 2012 272 JOINDER filed by Defendants Interscope Records, UMG Recordings Inc joining in Response in Opposition to Motion, 271 . (Burrow, Linda)
April 23, 2012 271 OPPOSITION to Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Parties Without Prejudice and Without Fees or Costs filed by Defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson, Jaime Gomez, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr, Allan Pineda, Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC. (Righettini, Justin)
April 16, 2012 270 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Josephine Staton Tucker, DEFENDANTS SHAPIRO, BERNSTEIN and CO. INC., FREDERIC RIESTERER AND DAVID GUETTA'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND HIS COUNSEL PURUSANT TO F.R.Civ.P. 11; JOINDER BY ADAMS DEFENDANTS: Defendant addresses Court regarding possible multiple attorney fee motions. Defendants WITHDRAW their Rule 11 motion (doc. 237) currently before the Court. Defendants are given leave to file one omnibus motion for attorneys fees. Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (rla)
April 16, 2012 269 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker, CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN PARTIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT FEES OR COSTS, re Stipulation 263 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of the remaining defendants without prejudice and without fees or costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Doc. 262) is continued to May 14, 2012, at 10:00 a.m.; 2. Remaining defendants' papers in opposition to the motion shall be filed on or before April 23, 2012; and 3. Plaintiff's reply papers in further support of the motion, if any, shall be filed on or before April 30, 2012. 4. In light of the issues raised in the parties Joint Status Report (Doc. 264), the Court will consider the appropriateness of granting summary judgment sua sponte in favor of remaining defendants, under Rule 56(f). The parties should use their Opposition and Reply briefs to address this issue. (rla)
April 15, 2012 268 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings March 5, 2012, 10:00 a.m. (Parker, Deborah)
April 15, 2012 267 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 03/05/12, 10:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Deborah D. Parker, phone number (714) 542-8409. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through pdeborah157@gmail.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/14/2012. (Parker, Deborah)
April 13, 2012 266 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Notice of Telephonic Appearance 265 , for the following reasons: Court approval not received; also see Judges' Procedures and Schedules web page, No. 2. (rla)
April 12, 2012 265 NOTICE of telephonic appearance by Ira Gould and Ryan Greely filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Hampton, George)
April 10, 2012 264 STATUS REPORT , JOINT, filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Holley, Colin)
April 10, 2012 263 STIPULATION to Continue hearing on Plaintiff's motion for voluntary dismissal of certain parties without prejudice and without fees or costs from May 7, 2012 to May 14, 2012 filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Holley, Colin)
April 6, 2012 262 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Stacy Ferguson(individually), Jaime Gomez(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Jaime Gomez(individually), Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Interscope Records, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr(individually), William Adams Jr(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Allan Pineda(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Allan Pineda(individually), Square Rivoli Publishing, Tab Magnetic Publishing, UMG Recordings Inc, Will.I.Am Music LLC filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle. Motion set for hearing on 5/7/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Josephine Staton Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Kathleen E. Koppenhoefer)(Holley, Colin)
April 5, 2012 261 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Rister Editions. (Holley, Colin)
April 2, 2012 256 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker: Order for Case Status Report. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint report no later than April 10, 2012, as to the status of the case, specifically as to the remaining defendants. (mt)
April 2, 2012 255 JOINDER filed by Defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson, Jaime Gomez, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr, Allan Pineda, Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC joining in Reply (Motion related) 253 . (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Justin Righettini, # 2 Exhibit 1-5 to Righettini Decl)(Righettini, Justin)
April 2, 2012 254 DECLARATION of TAL E. DICKSTEIN In Further Support of MOTION for Sanctions Rule 11 237 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 23, # 2 Exhibit 24, # 3 Exhibit 25)(Miller, Donald)
April 2, 2012 253 REPLY In Further Support of MOTION for Sanctions Rule 11 237 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
March 30, 2012 252 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker: granting defendants' 159 Motion for Summary Judgment. (twdb)
March 27, 2012 260 SEALED DOCUMENT RE: EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS to the Declaration of Patrick in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 5,410,326 and 6,130,726 Based on Equitable Estoppel, Implied Waiver and Laches.(lwag)
March 27, 2012 259 SEALED DOCUMENT RE: STATEMENT of Genuine Disputes of Facts and Conclusions of Law. (lwag)
March 27, 2012 258 SEALED DOCUMENT RE: OPPOSITION to Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 5,410,326 and 6,130,726 Based on Equitable Estoppel, Implied Waiver and Laches. (lwag)
March 27, 2012 257 SEALED DOCUMENT RE: EXHIBITS 2 and 5 to Declaration of Justin Re: Joinder to Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiff and His Counsel Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 11. (lwag)
March 27, 2012 251 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker: granting 250 Application to Seal file documents under seal re notice of joinder of Adams defendants to motion for sanctions against plaintiff and his counsel. (twdb)
March 27, 2012 250 Notice of APPLICATION to file under Seal RE: Notice of joinder of Adams Defendants to motion for sanctions against plaintiff and his counsel pursuant to FED.R.Civ.P 11 filed by defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Jaime Gomez(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, William Adams Jr(individually), Allan Pineda (collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/16/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Josephine Staton Tucker. (twdb)
March 26, 2012 249 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Sanctions Rule 11 237 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dean A. Dickie, # 2 Declaration of Kathleen E. Koppenhoefer, # 3 Declaration of George L. Hampton IV, # 4 Declaration of Colin C. Holley, # 5 Declaration of Ira Gould, # 6 Declaration of Ryan Greely, # 7 Declaration of Barbara Frederiksen-Cross, # 8 Declaration of Michael Scott Brown)(Holley, Colin)
March 16, 2012 248 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker: granting 247 Application to Continue. The hearings originally scheduled have been rescheduled. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/24/2012 01:30 PM before Judge Josephine Staton Tucker. Trial set for 8/7/2012 09:00 AM before Judge Josephine Staton Tucker. Exhibit conference shall be continued to 8/3/12 at 3:00 p.m. (twdb)
March 12, 2012 247 APPLICATION to Continue Pretrial Conference Dates and Trial Date filed by Defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Jaime Gomez(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr(individually), Allan Pineda(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pink, Jonathan)
March 8, 2012 246 OPPOSITION to APPLICATION to Strike Supplement(Motion related) 244 245 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Holley, Colin)
March 7, 2012 245 APPLICATION to Strike Supplement(Motion related) 244 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Miller, Donald)
March 6, 2012 244 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 , Plaintiff's Supplemental Response to Motion for Summary Judgment to Correct Misstatements Made by Defense Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Holley, Colin)
March 5, 2012 243 MINUTES OF Defendants Shapiro, Bernstein & Co. Inc., Frederic Riesterer and David Guetta's Motion for Summary Judgment. Cause called. Hearing held. Counsel argue. Court takes matter under submission 159 . Motion Hearing held before Judge Josephine Staton Tucker.Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (nca)
March 2, 2012 242 Amendment to MOTION for Sanctions Rule 11 237 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
March 1, 2012 241 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson, Jaime Gomez, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr, Allan Pineda, Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC of Exhibits 2 and 5 to the Declaration of Justin Righettini Re Adams Defendants' Joinder to Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiff and his Counsel. (Righettini, Justin)
March 1, 2012 240 JOINDER in MOTION for Sanctions Rule 11 237 filed by Defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson, Jaime Gomez, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr, Allan Pineda, Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Justin Righettini, # 2 Exhibit 1-5)(Righettini, Justin)
March 1, 2012 239 DECLARATION of Tal E. Dickstein in support of MOTION for Sanctions Rule 11 237 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22)(Miller, Donald)
March 1, 2012 238 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Sanctions Rule 11 237 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
March 1, 2012 237 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Rule 11 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. Motion set for hearing on 4/16/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Josephine Staton Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Service)(Miller, Donald)
February 10, 2012 236 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings 1/31/2011 to 1/31/2011 as to plaintiff Bryan Pringle Court Reporter Deborah Parker. Court will contact George L. Hampton IV at ghampton@hamptonholley.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Preliminary Injunction hearing - 1/31/2011. Category: Daily. (Hampton, George)
January 27, 2012 235 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 1/23/12 9:48 a.m. (mo)
January 27, 2012 234 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 1/23/12 9:48 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc., phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/17/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2012. (mo)
January 24, 2012 232 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker: Granting APPLICATION Continuing Hearing Date for Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, Pretrial Conference Date and Trial Date 230 . MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 continued from 1/30/2012 to 3/5/2012 at 10:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference continued from 3/12/2012 to 4/23/2012 at 1:30 PM. Exhibit Conference continued from 3/23/2012 to 5/4/2012 at 3:00 PM. Jury Trial continued from 3/27/2012 to 5/8/2012 at 9:00 AM. (mt)
January 23, 2012 233 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Ralph Zarefsky granting in part and denying in part 156 Defendants' Motion to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories and for sanctions. Amended responses to be served within 10 days. Requests for sanctions are denied. (ib)
January 23, 2012 231 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings January 23, 2012 to January 23, 2012 as to Defendants EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Jaime Gomez(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr(individually), Allan Pineda(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Elaine Hellwig at elaine.hellwig@bryancave.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Discovery Proceedings. Category: Daily. (Pink, Jonathan)
January 20, 2012 230 APPLICATION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment and Trial and Pre-Trial Dates Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 , Order, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines 183 , Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, 179 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Barry I. Slotnick, # 2 Proposed Order)(Miller, Donald)
January 17, 2012 228 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Colin C Holley counsel for Plaintiff Bryan Pringle.KATHARINE N. DUNN is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by plainitff BRYAN PRINGLE (Holley, Colin)
January 13, 2012 229 SEALED DOCUMENT EXHIBITS B,C,D,G AND H as to Declaration of Dean A. Dickie 197 filed under seal pursuant to the court's 1/12/12 order 225 . (Attachments: # 1 part 2, # 2 part 3)(twdb)
January 13, 2012 226 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle of Exhibits to Dickie Declaration (ECF No. 197). (Hampton, George)
January 11, 2012 227 VOLUMINOUS DOCUMENT RE: EXHIBIT (CD Attached) D to Declaration of Paul Geluso in Further Support of Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer and Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (lwag)
January 9, 2012 225 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker, RE MOTION TO WITHDRAW TRANSCRIPTS AND RE-FILE PORTIONS OF PREVIOUSLY FILED TRANSCRIPTS UNDER SEAL: re 202 Motion to Withdraw: COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: 1. The full transcripts of the depositions of William Adams, Stacy Ferguson, Jaime Gomez, Allan Pineda, David Guetta and Frederic Riesterer, which were filed in support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Exhibits B, C, D, G and H to the Declaration of Dean A. Dickie filed as ECF Docket No. 197), are withdrawn from the record; 2. On or before January 13, 2012, plaintiff shall file, under seal, those portions of the transcripts of the depositions of William Adams, Stacy Ferguson, Jaime Gomez, Allan Pineda, David Guetta and Frederic Riesterer that plaintiff wishes the Court to consider in connection with plaintiff's opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment. The hearing on plaintiff's motion is therefore removed from the Court's January 23, 2012 calendar. (rla)
January 9, 2012 223 REPLY in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
January 9, 2012 222 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Genuine Disputes in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
January 9, 2012 221 DECLARATION of Tal E. Dickstein in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 Declaration of Tal E. Dickstein in Further Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBIT R, # 2 EXHIBIT S, # 3 EXHIBIT T, # 4 EXHIBIT U, # 5 EXHIBIT V, # 6 EXHIBIT W, # 7 EXHIBIT X, # 8 EXHIBIT Y, # 9 EXHIBIT Z, # 10 EXHIBIT AA, # 11 EXHIBIT BB, # 12 EXHIBIT CC, # 13 EXHIBIT DD)(Miller, Donald)
January 9, 2012 220 DECLARATION of Kara E. F. Cenar in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
January 9, 2012 219 DECLARATION of Barry I. Slotnick in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
January 9, 2012 218 DECLARATION of Frederic Riesterer in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 Statement of Frederic Riesterer in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
January 9, 2012 217 DECLARATION of Paul Geluso in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 Declaration of Paul Geluso in Further Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
January 9, 2012 216 Objection in support re: MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of David Gallant filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
January 9, 2012 215 Objection in support re: MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Barbara Frederiksen-Cross filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
January 9, 2012 214 Objection in support re: MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Jeffrey Pringle filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
January 9, 2012 213 Objection in support re: MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Bryan Pringle filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
January 9, 2012 212 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories and for Monetary Sanctions 156 , PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL, filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Holley, Colin)
January 9, 2012 211 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories and for Monetary Sanctions 156 filed by Defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson, Jaime Gomez, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr, Allan Pineda, Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan S. Pink, # 2 Exhibit 1-3 to Pink Decl)(Pink, Jonathan)
January 9, 2012 210 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Exhibit D to the Declaration of Paul Geluso in Further Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment - re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 209 (Miller, Donald)
January 9, 2012 209 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co of EXHIBIT D TO DECLARATION OF PAUL GELUSO IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Miller, Donald)
January 2, 2012 208 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Donald A Miller on behalf of Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co (Miller, Donald)
December 30, 2011 207 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in Response in Opposition to Motion 205 to Re-File Transcripts Under Seal; Request to Continue Hearing Date filed by Defendants Cherry River Music Co, Stacy Ferguson(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Jaime Gomez(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr(individually), Allan Pineda(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/23/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Josephine Staton Tucker. (Pink, Jonathan)
December 30, 2011 206 DECLARATION of Tal E. Dickstein in response to MOTION to Withdraw Transcripts and Re-File Portions of Previously Filed Transcripts Under Seal 202 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Miller, Donald)
December 30, 2011 205 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Withdraw Transcripts and Re-File Portions of Previously Filed Transcripts Under Seal 202 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
December 28, 2011 204 DECLARATION of Bryan Pringle in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 , SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION, filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Holley, Colin)
December 27, 2011 203 NOTICE OF ERRATA RE PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF DOC. NO. 195) re MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Holley, Colin)
December 22, 2011 202 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Withdraw Transcripts and Re-File Portions of Previously Filed Transcripts Under Seal filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle. Motion set for hearing on 1/23/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Josephine Staton Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dean A. Dickie)(Holley, Colin)
December 20, 2011 201 EXHIBITS 15,18,21,24,26, 28, 29,30,31,40 and 43 to Declaration of Bryan Pringle in Opposition to Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (twdb)
December 20, 2011 200 EXHIBITS 1,2,3 and 4 to Declaration of Alex Norris in Opposition to Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (twdb)
December 20, 2011 199 EXHIBIT A and B to Declaration of Dr. Alexander Stewart in opposition to Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (twdb)
December 19, 2011 198 DECLARATION of Bryan Pringle in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 16, # 16 Exhibit 17, # 17 Exhibit 19, # 18 Exhibit 20, # 19 Exhibit 22, # 20 Exhibit 23, # 21 Exhibit 25, # 22 Exhibit 27, # 23 Exhibit 32, # 24 Exhibit 33, # 25 Exhibit 34, # 26 Exhibit 35, # 27 Exhibit 36, # 28 Exhibit 37, # 29 Exhibit 38, # 30 Exhibit 39, # 31 Exhibit 41, # 32 Exhibit 42, # 33 Exhibit 44, # 34 Exhibit 45, # 35 Exhibit 46, # 36 Exhibit 47)(Holley, Colin)
December 19, 2011 197 DECLARATION of Dean A. Dickie in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit N)(Holley, Colin)
December 19, 2011 196 STATEMENT of Genuine Disputes in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Holley, Colin)
December 19, 2011 195 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Holley, Colin)
December 19, 2011 194 DECLARATION of Dr. Alexander Stewart in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Holley, Colin)
December 19, 2011 193 DECLARATION of David T. Gallant in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Holley, Colin)
December 19, 2011 192 DECLARATION of Alex Norris in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Holley, Colin)
December 19, 2011 191 DECLARATION of Kathleen E. Koppenhoefer in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Holley, Colin)
December 19, 2011 190 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Pringle in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Holley, Colin)
December 19, 2011 189 DECLARATION of Barbara Frederiksen-Cross in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Holley, Colin)
December 19, 2011 188 OBJECTIONS to Evidence Defendants Filed in Connection with their Motion for Summary Judgment re: MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Holley, Colin)
December 19, 2011 187 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle of Exhibits 15, 18, 21, 24, 26, 28, 29, 30, 31, 40 and 43 to Declaration of Bryan Pringle in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Holley, Colin)
December 19, 2011 186 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle of Exhibit M to Declaration of Dean A. Dickie in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Holley, Colin)
December 19, 2011 185 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle of Exhibits A and B to Declaration of Dr. Alexander Stewart in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Holley, Colin)
December 19, 2011 184 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle of Exhibits 1, 2, 3 and 4 to Declaration of Alex Norris in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Holley, Colin)
December 13, 2011 183 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker, granting Stipulation to Continue, 182 . The hearings re Motion originally scheduled have been rescheduled. ( Motion set for hearing on 1/30/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Josephine Staton Tucker.) (twdb)
December 8, 2011 182 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment from January 23, 2012 to January 30, 2012 Re: Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, 179 David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Donald)
November 29, 2011 181 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney George Leo Hampton, IV counsel for Plaintiff Bryan Pringle.RYAN L. GREELY is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle (Hampton, George)
November 29, 2011 180 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney George Leo Hampton, IV counsel for Plaintiff Bryan Pringle.IRA GOULD is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plainitff Bryan Pringle (Hampton, George)
November 22, 2011 179 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PARTIES' Stipulation to Continue 177 : Final Pretrial Conference reset for 3/12/2012 01:30 PM. Jury Trial reset for 3/27/2012 09:00 AM. Exhibit Conference reset for 3/23/12 at 3:00 PM. (See document for further details.) (rla)
November 22, 2011 178 DECLARATION of Thibaud Fouet [CORRECTED] In Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
November 21, 2011 177 STIPULATION to Continue trial and case management dates filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Holley, Colin)
November 21, 2011 176 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Declaration (Motion related) 171 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (rrp)
November 18, 2011 175 VOLUMINOUS DOCUMENT RE: AUDIO Exhibits to Declaration of Clark Warner filed by Shapiro Bernstein and Co Inc, Frederic Riesterer and David Guetta. (lwag)
November 18, 2011 174 VOLUMINOUS DOCUMENT RE: AUDIO EXHIBITS to Declaration of Paul Geluso filed by Defendants Shapiro Bernstein and Co Inc, Frederic Riesterer and David Guetta. (lwag)
November 17, 2011 172 DECLARATION of Larry Ferrara In Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through E)(Miller, Donald)
November 17, 2011 171 DECLARATION of Thibaud Fouet In Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
November 17, 2011 170 DECLARATION of Gary Roth In Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
November 17, 2011 169 DECLARATION of Alain Etchart In Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
November 17, 2011 168 DECLARATION of Jean-Charles Carre In Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
November 17, 2011 167 DECLARATION of David Guetta In Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
November 17, 2011 166 DECLARATION of Frederic Riesterer In Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
November 17, 2011 165 DECLARATION of Joachim Garraud In Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
November 17, 2011 164 DECLARATION of Erik Laykin In Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
November 17, 2011 163 DECLARATION of Clark Warner In Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
November 17, 2011 162 DECLARATION of Paul Geluso In Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
November 17, 2011 161 DECLARATION of Tal Dickstein In Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q)(Miller, Donald)
November 17, 2011 160 STATEMENT of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law In Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 159 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
November 17, 2011 159 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. Motion set for hearing on 12/19/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Josephine Staton Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum)(Miller, Donald)
November 17, 2011 158 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants David Guetta, Frederick Riesterer, Shapiro Bernstein and Co of Audio Exhibits to Declarations of Paul Geluso and Clark Warner. (Miller, Donald)
November 16, 2011 157 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories and for Monetary Sanctions 156 filed by Defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson, Jaime Gomez, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr, Allan Pineda, Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan Pink, # 2 Exhibit 1-10 to Pink Decl, # 3 Declaration of Dean Dickie, # 4 Exhibit A-H to Dickie Decl)(Pink, Jonathan)
November 16, 2011 156 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories and for Monetary Sanctions filed by Defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson(individually), Jaime Gomez(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr(individually), Allan Pineda(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/23/2012 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ralph Zarefsky. (Pink, Jonathan)
November 15, 2011 224 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker, granting APPLICATION for attorney James W. McConkey to Appear Pro Hac Vice, designation George L. Hampton as local counsel (PHV Fee paid.) 155 (twdb) Modified on 1/10/2012 (twdb).
November 15, 2011 173 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker: granting 155 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James W. McConkey on behalf of Plaintiff Bryan Pringle, designating George L. Hampton as local counsel. (lt)
November 15, 2011 155 APPLICATION for attorney James W. McConkey to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-9516208 paid.) filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hampton, George)
October 26, 2011 154 Featured Case ORDER continuing expert discovery cutoff dates pursuant to stipulation by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker 153 . The deadlines originally scheduled have been rescheduled: See order for further deadlines. ( Expert Discovery cut-off 1/6/2012.) (twdb)
October 25, 2011 153 STIPULATION for Order modifying the dates for initial and rebuttal expert disclosures and the deadline for completion of expert discovery filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Holley, Colin)
September 6, 2011 152 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Justin Michael Righettini on behalf of Defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson, Jaime Gomez, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr, Allan Pineda, Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC (Righettini, Justin)
August 2, 2011 151 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant UMG Recordings Inc, re Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06), Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) 150 served on August 2, 2011. (Burrow, Linda)
August 2, 2011 150 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Linda M Burrow counsel for Defendant UMG Recordings Inc.Heather Pearson is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP, INC. (Burrow, Linda)
July 25, 2011 149 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Edwin F. McPherson and Tracy B. Rane on behalf of Defendants Stacy Ferguson, Stacy Ferguson, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC. Filed by Defendants Stacy Ferguson, Stacy Ferguson, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC (McPherson, Edwin)
July 7, 2011 148 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Ralph Zarefsky denying 141 Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Protective Order Postponing Depositions. (See document for details). (ib)
July 6, 2011 147 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. correcting MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion 144 exhibit mistakenly omitted from memorandum in opposition to Ex Parte Motion re Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hampton, George)
July 6, 2011 146 DECLARATION of Dean A. Dickie in opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for Postponing Depositions 141 and in support of Memorandum re Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION 144 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W)(Hampton, George)
July 6, 2011 145 DECLARATION of Katharine Dunn in opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for Postponing Depositions 141 and in support of Memorandum re Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION 144 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hampton, George)
July 6, 2011 144 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for Postponing Depositions 141 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Hampton, George)
July 6, 2011 143 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Ralph Zarefsky: Any opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Protective Order Postponing Depositions 141 shall be e-filed and a mandatory courtesy copy delivered to Magistrate Judge Ralph Zarefsky's clerk no later than 7/7/11 at 10:00AM. (ib)
July 6, 2011 142 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson, Jaime Gomez, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr, Allan Pineda, Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC. correcting EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for Postponing Depositions 141 (Pink, Jonathan)
July 5, 2011 141 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for Postponing Depositions filed by Defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Jaime Gomez(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr(individually), Allan Pineda(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan Pink, # 2 Exhibit 1-5 to Pink Decl, # 3 Proposed Order)(Pink, Jonathan)
June 24, 2011 140 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker: granting 138 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph G. Vernon on behalf of plaintiff Bryan Pringle, designating George L. Hampton IV as local counsel. (twdb)
June 23, 2011 139 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Ralph Zarefsky denying Stipulation for Protective Order 137 . (See document for details). (ib)
June 23, 2011 138 APPLICATION for attorney JOSEPH GIBSON VERNON to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-8838231 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hampton, George)
June 20, 2011 137 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hampton, George)
May 23, 2011 136 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker: Order Re: Attorneys' Fees 126 . Based on the above-referenced figures, the Court determines that a reasonable amount of attorneys fees is $6,860, which is composed of paralegal (1.3 x $200 = $260), associate (15 x$350 = $5,250), and partner (2 x $675 = $1,350) hours and billing rates. Thus, Plaintiffs counsel shall pay to Rister $6,860 in attorneys fees forthwith. (twdb)
May 18, 2011 135 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker: Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 134 . (mt)
May 10, 2011 134 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, 126 requesting reconsideration of award of sanctions pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1927, filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle. Motion set for hearing on 6/13/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Josephine Staton Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in support of Motion to Reconsider April 12, 2011 Order Awarding Sanctions, # 2 Declaration of Dean A. Dickie in support of Motion to Reconsider April 12, 2011 Order Awarding Sanctions)(Holley, Colin)
May 2, 2011 133 DECLARATION of Barry I. Slotnick In Support of MOTION to Dismiss Rister Editions Based on Improper Service; 121 ; and Application to Recover Its Expenses, Costs, and Attorneys' Fees Incurred on Its Motion to Dismiss; filed by Defendant Rister Editions. (Miller, Donald)
April 28, 2011 132 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Declaration (non-motion) 129 and Declaration (non-motion) 130 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Declaration (motion related). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ln)
April 27, 2011 131 DECLARATION of Ira Gould re MOTION to Dismiss Rister Editions Based on Improper Service; 121 , Declaration (Motion related) 125 , Memorandum in Support of Motion 122 , Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, 126 , Reply (Motion related) 124 , Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion) 129 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 123 , Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion) 128 , Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion) 130 Objecting to Barry Slotnick's Declaration in Support of Defendant's Application for Fees filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Hampton, George)
April 26, 2011 130 DECLARATION of George L. Hampton IV re MOTION to Dismiss Rister Editions Based on Improper Service; 121 , Declaration (Motion related) 125 , Memorandum in Support of Motion 122 , Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, 126 , Reply (Motion related) 124 , Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion) 129 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 123 , Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion) 128 Objecting to Barry Slotnick's Declaration in Support of Defendant's Application For Fees filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Hampton, George)
April 26, 2011 129 DECLARATION of Dean A. Dickie re MOTION to Dismiss Rister Editions Based on Improper Service; 121 , Declaration (Motion related) 125 , Memorandum in Support of Motion 122 , Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, 126 , Reply (Motion related) 124 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 123 , Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion) 128 Objecting to Barry Slotnick's Declaration in Support of Defendant's Application For Fees filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Hampton, George)
April 22, 2011 128 DECLARATION of BARRY I. SLOTNICK re Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, 126 [IN SUPPORT OF NONPARTY RISTER EDITIONS' APPLICATION TO RECOVER ITS EXPENSES, COSTS, AND ATTORNEY'S FEES INCURRED ON ITS MOTION TO DISMISS BASED ON IMPROPER SERVICE] filed by Defendant Rister Editions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Miller, Donald)
April 15, 2011 127 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,, 9 filed by Defendant Frederick Riesterer.(Miller, Donald)
April 12, 2011 126 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker: denying 121 Motion to Dismiss and Quashing Service on Defendant Rister Editions and Granting Rister's Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Accordingly, the hearing scheduled for 4/25/11 at 10:00 a.m. is vacated. (twdb)
April 11, 2011 125 DECLARATION of Michael Brettler In Support Of MOTION to Dismiss Rister Editions Based on Improper Service; 121 filed by Defendant Rister Editions. (Miller, Donald)
April 11, 2011 124 REPLY In Support Of MOTION to Dismiss Rister Editions Based on Improper Service; 121 filed by Defendant Rister Editions. (Miller, Donald)
April 4, 2011 123 Opposition re: MOTION to Dismiss Rister Editions Based on Improper Service; 121 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeremy Katz)(Hampton, George)
March 28, 2011 122 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Rister Editions Based on Improper Service; 121 filed by Defendant Rister Editions. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Donald)
March 28, 2011 121 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Rister Editions Based on Improper Service; Rister Editions. Motion set for hearing on 4/25/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Josephine Staton Tucker. (Miller, Donald)
March 24, 2011 120 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) 118 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents) 117 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Service of Summons and Complaint. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (db)
March 23, 2011 119 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney George Leo Hampton, IV on behalf of Plaintiff Bryan Pringle (Hampton, George)
March 23, 2011 118 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle, re Amended Complaint,,, 9 to Square Rivoli Publishing served on 3/16/2011. (Hampton, George)
March 23, 2011 117 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle, re Amended Complaint,,, 9 to Rister Editions served on 3/16/2011. (Hampton, George)
February 24, 2011 116 Featured Case ORDER ON JURY TRIAL by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker: Final Pretrial Conference:February 13, 2012 at 1:30 p.m.; Exhibit Conference February 24, 2012 at 3:00 p.m.; Trial: February 28, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. (See document for details.) (rla)
February 24, 2011 115 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker, VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DATES: Scheduling Conference set for hearing on March 7, 2011, is VACATED and taken off calendar, and the following dates are set. Discovery cut-off 11/14/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2012 01:30 PM before Judge Josephine Staton Tucker. Jury Trial set for 2/28/2012 09:00 AM before Judge Josephine Staton Tucker. (See document for further details.) (rla)
February 24, 2011 114 Featured Case ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT PROCEDURESELECTION: REQUEST AND NOTICE by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker: APPROVING the NOTICE AND REQUEST of Settlement Procedure Selection (Sp3) requiring the parties to appear before a retired judicial officer or other private or non-profit dispute resolution body. (rla)
February 23, 2011 113 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibit (non-trial) 111 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (db)
February 23, 2011 112 NOTICE AND REQUEST of Settlement Procedure Selection (Sp3); parties request to appear before a retired judicial officer or other dispute resolution body for mediation type settlement proceedings. Filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle(Hampton, George)
February 22, 2011 111 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. Exhibit "A" as to Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan 110 . (Hampton, George)
February 18, 2011 110 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10 days, filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle.. (Hampton, George)
February 14, 2011 109 Featured Case ORDER granting First Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) 107 by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the UMG Defendants may file their Answer to the Complaint on or before February 14, 2011. (rla)
February 14, 2011 108 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,, 9 , Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 DEFENDANTS UMG RECORDINGS, INC. AND INTERSCOPE RECORDS ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT filed by Defendant Interscope Records, UMG Recordings Inc.(Burrow, Linda)
February 11, 2011 107 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Interscope Records answer now due 2/14/2011; UMG Recordings Inc answer now due 2/14/2011, filed by Defendants Interscope Records; UMG Recordings Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time for UMG Recordings, Inc. and Interscope Records to Answer Complaint)(Burrow, Linda)
February 10, 2011 106 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,, 9 for Copyright Infringement filed by Defendants David Guetta, Shapiro Bernstein and Co.(Miller, Donald)
February 10, 2011 105 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,, 9 filed by Defendants Jeepney Music Inc, Allan Pineda(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas).(Pink, Jonathan)
February 10, 2011 104 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,, 9 filed by Defendants Jaime Gomez(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Tab Magnetic Publishing.(Pink, Jonathan)
February 10, 2011 103 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,, 9 filed by Defendants Stacy Ferguson(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC.(Pink, Jonathan)
February 10, 2011 102 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,, 9 filed by Defendant EMI April Music Inc.(Pink, Jonathan)
February 10, 2011 101 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,, 9 filed by Defendants Cherry River Music Co.(Pink, Jonathan)
February 10, 2011 100 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,, 9 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants William Adams Jr(individually), Will.I.Am Music LLC.(Pink, Jonathan)
February 7, 2011 99 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker: denying 73 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (twdb)
February 1, 2011 98 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Karen R Thorland counsel for Defendants David Guetta, Rister Editions, Shapiro Bernstein and Co.Karen R. Thorland is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants Shapiro, Bernstein & Co., Inc.; Rister Editions; David Guetta (Thorland, Karen)
January 31, 2011 97 MINUTES OF Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Motion Hearing held before Judge Josephine Staton Tucker re Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 73 . Counsel argue the motion. Court takes matter under submission.Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (db) Modified on 3/2/2011 (db).
January 28, 2011 96 DECLARATION of Ike Youssef (Supplemental Declaration) in opposition to MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re: copyright infringement 73 filed by Defendants Interscope Records, UMG Recordings Inc. (Pearson, Heather)
January 27, 2011 95 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker Denying Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(6), 8(a)(2), and 12(b)(5), Motion for a More Definite Statement Under Rule 12(3), and Motion to Strike Under Rule 12(f) 52 53 . (See Order for details) (db)
January 21, 2011 94 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker: taking under advisement 52 Motion to Dismiss ; taking under advisement 52 Motion to Strike 53 , 53 Motion to Dismiss Case. Accordingly, the hearing set for 1/24/11 at 10:00 a.m. is removed from the calendar. (twdb)
January 20, 2011 93 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint MOTION for More Definite Statement 52 filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Holley, Colin)
January 20, 2011 92 APPLICATION for attorney Katharine N. Dunn to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-8092626 paid.) filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order re Dunn pro hac vice application)(Hampton, George)
January 14, 2011 91 REPLY in support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re: copyright infringement 73 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Holley, Colin)
January 12, 2011 90 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker Denying Defendants' Ex Parte Application 82 . On January 10, 2011, Defendants Shapiro, Bernstein & Co., Rister Editions, and David Guetta filed an ex parte application requesting to continue the hearing on the Rule 12 Motions currently scheduled for hearing on January 24, 2011. (Doc. 82). Plaintiff filed an opposition the next day. (Doc. 87). Defendants have failed to show good cause that would require ex parte relief. See generally Mission Power Engg Co. v. Contl Cas. Co., 883 F. Supp. 488 (C.D. Cal. 1995). The Court therefore DENIES Defendants ex parte application. (db)
January 11, 2011 89 JOINDER filed by Defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson, Jaime Gomez, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr, Allan Pineda, Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC joining in Reply (Motion related) 80 . (Pink, Jonathan)
January 11, 2011 88 JOINDER filed by Defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson, Jaime Gomez, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr, Allan Pineda, Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC joining in MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion 81 . (Pink, Jonathan)
January 11, 2011 87 OPPOSITION to Joint EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue The Hearing Date on Defendants' Rule 12 Motions from January 24, 2011 to January 31, 2011 IN ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE WITH HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 82 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Holley, Colin)
January 10, 2011 86 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint MOTION for More Definite Statement 52 filed by Defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson, Jaime Gomez, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr, Allan Pineda, Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC. (Pink, Jonathan)
January 10, 2011 85 REPLY support MOTION to Dismiss Case 53 , MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint MOTION for More Definite Statement 52 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint MOTION for More Definite Statement 52 56 , MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case 53 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case 53 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case 53 55 , MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint MOTION for More Definite Statement 52 filed by Defendants Interscope Records, UMG Recordings Inc. (Pearson, Heather)
January 10, 2011 84 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re: copyright infringement 73 and Joinder in Other Defendants' Oppositions filed by Defendants Interscope Records, UMG Recordings Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Rowland, # 2 Declaration Youssef, # 3 Declaration Burrow, # 4 Exhibit A)(Pearson, Heather)
January 10, 2011 83 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re: copyright infringement 73 filed by Defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson, Jaime Gomez, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr, Allan Pineda, Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kara Cenar, # 2 Declaration of Jonathan S. Pink)(Pink, Jonathan)
January 10, 2011 82 Joint EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue The Hearing Date on Defendants' Rule 12 Motions from January 24, 2011 to January 31, 2011 IN ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE WITH HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Defendants Rister Editions, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Donald)
January 10, 2011 81 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re: copyright infringement 73 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Rister Editions, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Paul Geluso)(Miller, Donald)
January 10, 2011 80 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Dismiss Case 53 filed by Defendants David Guetta, Rister Editions, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Miller, Donald)
January 10, 2011 79 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Donald A Miller counsel for Defendants David Guetta, Rister Editions, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. Filed by Defendants SHAPIRO, BERNSTEIN & CO., INC.; RISTER EDITIONS and DAVID GUETTA (Miller, Donald)
January 3, 2011 78 VOLUMINOUS DOCUMENT RE: DECLARATION of Mark Rubel in Support of Plaintiff's MOtion for Preliminary Injunction 73 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (lwag)
January 3, 2011 77 VOLUMINOUS DOCUMENT RE: DECLARATION of Alexander Stewart in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminiary Injunction 73 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (lwag)
January 3, 2011 76 VOLUMINOUS DOCUMENT RE: DECLARATION of Bryan Pringle in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 73 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (lwag)
January 3, 2011 75 VOLUMINOUS DOCUMENT RE: DECLARATION of Kevin Byrnes in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 73 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (lwag)
January 3, 2011 74 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint MOTION for More Definite Statement 52 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Holley, Colin)
January 3, 2011 73 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re: copyright infringement filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle. Motion set for hearing on 1/31/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Josephine Staton Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 2 [Proposed] Preliminary Injunction)(Holley, Colin)
January 3, 2011 72 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Case 53 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Hampton, George)
January 3, 2011 71 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle of Declarations of Bryan Pringle, Kevin Byrnes, Mark Rubel, and Alexander Stewart in support of motion for preliminary injunction. (Holley, Colin)
December 21, 2010 70 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker: granting 66 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Barry I Slotnick on behalf of Defendant Shapiro, Bernstein & Co., David Guetta and Rister Editions, designating Karen R Thorland as local counsel. (vh)
December 21, 2010 69 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker: granting 65 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Tal E. Dickstein on behalf of Defendants Shapiro, Bernstein & Co., David Guetta and Rister Editions, designating Karen R. Thorland as local counsel. (lt)
December 17, 2010 66 APPLICATION for attorney BARRY I. SLOTNICK to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-7957224 paid.) filed by DEFENDANTS David Guetta, Rister Editions, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Thorland, Karen)
December 17, 2010 65 APPLICATION for attorney TAL E. DICKSTEIN to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-7957174 paid.) filed by DEFENDANTS David Guetta, Rister Editions, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Thorland, Karen)
December 16, 2010 64 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case 53 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case 53 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case 53 55 , MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint MOTION for More Definite Statement 52 MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint MOTION for More Definite Statement 52 56 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Joinder (Motion Related). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (rrp)
December 15, 2010 63 Featured Case ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker. Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2011 at 01:30 p.m. before Judge Josephine Staton Tucker. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (dro)
December 14, 2010 62 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT David Guetta, identifying DAVID GUETTA. (Thorland, Karen)
December 14, 2010 61 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Rister Editions, identifying RISTER EDITIONS. (Thorland, Karen)
December 13, 2010 58 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants David Guetta, Rister Editions, Shapiro Bernstein and Co. correcting MOTION to Dismiss Case 53 (Thorland, Karen)
December 13, 2010 57 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Interscope Records, UMG Recordings Inc, identifying Vivendi, SA. (Burrow, Linda)
December 13, 2010 56 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint MOTION for More Definite Statement 52 filed by Defendants Interscope Records, UMG Recordings Inc. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Josephine Staton Tucker. (Pearson, Heather)
December 13, 2010 55 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in MOTION to Dismiss Case 53 filed by Defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Jaime Gomez(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr(individually), Allan Pineda(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Josephine Staton Tucker. (Pink, Jonathan)
December 13, 2010 54 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Jaime Gomez(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr(individually), Allan Pineda(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC, (Pink, Jonathan)
December 13, 2010 53 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by DEFENDANT Shapiro Bernstein and Co. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Josephine Staton Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Karen R. Thorland, # 3 Proposed Order)(Thorland, Karen)
December 13, 2010 52 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint, MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Jaime Gomez(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr(individually), Allan Pineda(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Josephine Staton Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Jonathan Pink, # 3 Proposed Order)(Pink, Jonathan)
December 10, 2010 60 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker: granting 49 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mariangela M Seale on behalf of Defendant The Black Eyed Peas and individuals, William Adams, Jr., Stacy Ferguson, Allan Pineda, Jaime Gomez, and Will.I.Am. Music, LLC, EMI April Music, Inc., Headphone Junkie Publishing, Jeepney Music, Inc., Tab Magnetic Publishing and Cherry River Music Co., designating Jonathan S Pink as local counsel. (vh) Modified on 1/4/2011 (vh).
December 10, 2010 59 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker: granting 48 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kara E F Cenar on behalf of Defendant The Black Eyed Peas and individuals, William Adams, Jr., Stacy Ferguson, Allan Pineda, Jaime Gomez, Will.I.Am. Music, LLC, EMI April Music, Inc., Headphone Junkie Publishing, Jeepeny Music, Inc., Tab Magnetic Publishing and Cherry River Music Co., designating Jonathan S Pink as local counsel. (vh)
December 9, 2010 68 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker: granting 17 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ryan Greely on behalf of Plaintiff Bryan Pringle, designating George L. Hampton as local counsel. (lt)
December 9, 2010 67 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker: granting 16 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ira Gould on behalf of Plaintiff Bryan Pringle, designating George L. Hampton as local counsel. (lt)
December 9, 2010 51 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle, re Amended Complaint,,, 9 to Square Rivoli Publishing served on 12/1/2010. (Hampton, George)
December 9, 2010 50 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle, re Amended Complaint,,, 9 served on 12/1/2010. (Hampton, George)
December 8, 2010 49 APPLICATION for attorney Mariangela M. Seale to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Jaime Gomez(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr(individually), Allan Pineda(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pink, Jonathan)
December 8, 2010 48 APPLICATION for attorney Kara E. F. Cenar to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Jaime Gomez(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr(individually), Allan Pineda(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pink, Jonathan)
December 1, 2010 47 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle, upon Defendant Stacy Ferguson(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas) served on 11/21/2010, answer due 12/12/2010; Stacy Ferguson(individually) served on 11/21/2010, answer due 12/12/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe, defendant's co-occupant and boyfriend in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (Hampton, George)
November 29, 2010 46 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle, re Amended Complaint,,, 9 served on 11/24/2010. (Hampton, George)
November 29, 2010 45 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle, upon Defendant Will.I.Am Music LLC served on 11/5/2010, answer due 11/26/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Travis Pananides, agent for service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (Hampton, George)
November 29, 2010 44 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle, upon Defendant UMG Recordings Inc served on 11/5/2010, answer due 11/26/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, agent for service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Hampton, George)
November 29, 2010 43 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle, upon Defendant Square Rivoli Publishing served on 11/5/2010, answer due 11/26/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Hoffman, authorized person to accept service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Hampton, George)
November 29, 2010 42 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle, upon Defendant Tab Magnetic Publishing served on 11/5/2010, answer due 11/26/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lear Schwarze, employee of Helen Yu, agent for service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (Hampton, George)
November 29, 2010 41 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle, upon Defendant Shapiro Bernstein and Co served on 11/5/2010, answer due 11/26/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Hoffman, authorized person to accept service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Hampton, George)
November 29, 2010 40 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle, upon Defendant Rister Editions served on 11/5/2010, answer due 11/26/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Hoffman, authorized person to accept service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Hampton, George)
November 29, 2010 39 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle, upon Defendant Allan Pineda(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas) served on 11/10/2010, answer due 12/1/2010; Allan Pineda(individually) served on 11/10/2010, answer due 12/1/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Chris Sarajina, co-occupant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (Hampton, George)
November 29, 2010 38 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle, upon Defendant Jeepney Music Inc served on 11/5/2010, answer due 11/26/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sean Michael Larkin, agent for service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (Hampton, George)
November 29, 2010 37 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle, upon Defendant Interscope Records served on 11/5/2010, answer due 11/26/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, agent for service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Hampton, George)
November 29, 2010 36 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle, upon Defendant Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC served on 11/17/2010, answer due 12/8/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael Markarian, agent for service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (Hampton, George)
November 29, 2010 35 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle, upon Defendant Jaime Gomez(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas) served on 11/8/2010, answer due 11/29/2010; Jaime Gomez(individually) served on 11/8/2010, answer due 11/29/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jayme Gomez, spouse and co-occupant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (Hampton, George)
November 29, 2010 34 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle, upon Defendant EMI April Music Inc served on 11/5/2010, answer due 11/26/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company, agent for service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Hampton, George)
November 29, 2010 33 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle, upon Defendant Cherry River Music Co served on 11/5/2010, answer due 11/26/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Frank Murray, Esq., Agent for service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Hampton, George)
November 29, 2010 32 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle, upon Defendant William Adams Jr(individually) served on 11/7/2010, answer due 11/28/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Debra Cain, mother and co-occupant of Defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (Hampton, George)
November 29, 2010 31 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle, upon Defendant David Guetta served on 11/21/2010, answer due 12/12/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Guetta, defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Hampton, George)
November 24, 2010 30 Featured Case MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker: DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 15 . (rla)
November 23, 2010 28 JOINDER and OPPOSITION in opposition to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Copyright Infringement and OSC re Preliminary Injunction 15 filed by Defendants Interscope Records, UMG Recordings Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Linda M. Burrow, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Declaration Declaration of Ike Youssef)(Burrow, Linda)
November 23, 2010 27 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson, Jaime Gomez, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr, Allan Pineda, Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC. correcting Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 22 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum)(Pink, Jonathan)
November 23, 2010 26 JOINDER IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF'S FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Copyright Infringement and OSC re Preliminary Injunction 15 [JOINING DOCKET NUMBER 22] filed by Defendant Shapiro Bernstein and Co. (Thorland, Karen)
November 23, 2010 25 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jonathan S Pink on behalf of Defendant EMI April Music Inc (Pink, Jonathan)
November 23, 2010 24 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Linda M Burrow on behalf of Defendant UMG Recordings Inc (Burrow, Linda)
November 23, 2010 23 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Shapiro Bernstein and Co, identifying SHAPIRO, BERNSTEIN & CO., INC.. (Thorland, Karen)
November 23, 2010 22 opposition opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Copyright Infringement and OSC re Preliminary Injunction 15 filed by Defendants Cherry River Music Co, Stacy Ferguson, Jaime Gomez, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr, Allan Pineda, Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of K. Cenar, # 2 Declaration of Laykin, # 3 Declaration of Riesterer)(Pink, Jonathan)
November 23, 2010 21 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karen R Thorland on behalf of Defendant Shapiro Bernstein and Co (Thorland, Karen)
November 23, 2010 20 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jonathan S Pink on behalf of Defendants Cherry River Music Co, Stacy Ferguson, Jaime Gomez, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr, Allan Pineda, Tab Magnetic Publishing, Will.I.Am Music LLC (Pink, Jonathan)
November 23, 2010 19 [PROPOSED] ORDER PRO HAC VICE - GREELY re APPLICATION for attorney Ryan Greely to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-7850861 paid.) 17 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Hampton, George)
November 23, 2010 18 [PROPOSED] ORDER PRO HAC VICE - GOULD re APPLICATION for attorney Ira Gould to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-7850721 paid.) 16 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Hampton, George)
November 23, 2010 17 APPLICATION for attorney Ryan Greely to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-7850861 paid.) filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Hampton, George)
November 23, 2010 16 APPLICATION for attorney Ira Gould to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-7850721 paid.) filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Hampton, George)
November 22, 2010 29 VOLUMINOUS DOCUMENT RE: DECLARATION of Bryan Pringle in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order 15 filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (lwag)
November 22, 2010 15 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Copyright Infringement and OSC re Preliminary Injunction filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Ex Parte Application, # 2 Declaration of Mark Rubel, # 3 Declaration of Alexander Stewart, # 4 Declaration of Kevin Byrnes, # 5 Declaration of David Gallant, # 6 Declaration of George L. Hampton IV, # 7 Proposed TRO, # 8 Proposed OSC re Preliminary Injunction)(Holley, Colin)
November 22, 2010 10 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle of Declaration of Bryan Pringle in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction. (Holley, Colin)
November 19, 2010 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Stacy Ferguson(individually), Jaime Gomez(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Jaime Gomez(individually), David Guetta, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Interscope Records, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr(individually), William Adams Jr(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Allan Pineda(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Allan Pineda(individually), Frederick Riesterer, Rister Editions, Shapiro Bernstein and Co, Square Rivoli Publishing, Tab Magnetic Publishing, UMG Recordings Inc, Will.I.Am Music LLC. (twdb)
November 19, 2010 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Stacy Ferguson(individually), Jaime Gomez(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Jaime Gomez(individually), David Guetta, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Interscope Records, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr(individually), William Adams Jr(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Allan Pineda(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Allan Pineda(individually), Frederick Riesterer, Rister Editions, Shapiro Bernstein and Co, Square Rivoli Publishing, Tab Magnetic Publishing, UMG Recordings Inc and Will.I.Am Music LLC amending Complaint. Filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (lwag) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2010: # 1 summons) (twdb). Modified on 3/2/2012 (twdb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2012: # 2 amended complaint) (twdb).
November 18, 2010 14 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker granting 8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kathleen E. Koppenhoefer on behalf of Plaintiff Bryan Pringle, designating George L. Hampton IV as local counsel. (dro)
November 18, 2010 13 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker granting 5 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dean A. Dickie on behalf of Plaintiff Bryan Pringle, designating George L. Hampton IV as local counsel. (dro)
November 18, 2010 12 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker granting 7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert C. Levels on behalf of Plaintiff Bryan Pringle, designating George L. Hampton IV as local counsel. (dro)
November 18, 2010 11 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker granting 6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ryan C. Williams on behalf of Plaintiff Bryan Pringle, designating George L. Hampton IV as local counsel. (dro)
November 17, 2010 8 APPLICATION for attorney Kathleen E. Koppenhoefer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-7824394 paid.) filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Hampton, George)
November 17, 2010 7 APPLICATION for attorney Robert C. Levels to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-7824324 paid.) filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Hampton, George)
November 17, 2010 6 APPLICATION for attorney Ryan C. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-7823920 paid.) filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Hampton, George)
November 10, 2010 5 APPLICATION for attorney Dean A. Dickie to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-7793619 paid.) filed by plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (Hampton, George)
October 29, 2010 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), 1 as to defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Stacy Ferguson(individually), Jaime Gomez(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Jaime Gomez(individually), David Guetta, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Interscope Records, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr(individually), William Adams Jr(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Frederick Riesterer, Rister Editions, Shapiro Bernstein and Co, Square Rivoli Publishing, Tab Magnetic Publishing, UMG Recordings Inc, Will.I.Am Music LLC. (twdb)
October 29, 2010 4 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE STATON TUCKER. (rrp)
October 28, 2010 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Bryan Pringle. (lwag)
October 28, 2010 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle. (lwag) (lwag).
October 28, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Cherry River Music Co, EMI April Music Inc, Stacy Ferguson(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Stacy Ferguson(individually), Jaime Gomez(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Jaime Gomez(individually), David Guetta, Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC, Interscope Records, Jeepney Music Inc, William Adams Jr(individually), William Adams Jr(collectively as the music group the Black Eyed Peas), Frederick Riesterer, Rister Editions, Shapiro Bernstein and Co, Square Rivoli Publishing, Tab Magnetic Publishing, UMG Recordings Inc and Will.I.Am Music LLC. Case assigned to Judge Josephine Staton Tucker for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Ralph Zarefsky.(Filing fee $ 350 Paid). Jury Demanded. Filed by Plaintiff Bryan Pringle.(lwag) (lwag). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2010: # 1 summons) (twdb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryan Pringle v. William Adams Jr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherry River Music Co
Represented By: Kara E F Cenar
Represented By: Jonathan S Pink
Represented By: Mariangela Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMI April Music Inc
Represented By: Kara E F Cenar
Represented By: Jonathan S Pink
Represented By: Mariangela Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Ferguson
Represented By: Kara E F Cenar
Represented By: Jonathan S Pink
Represented By: Mariangela Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Gomez
Represented By: Kara E F Cenar
Represented By: Jonathan S Pink
Represented By: Mariangela Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Guetta
Represented By: Tal Efriam Dickstein
Represented By: Donald A Miller
Represented By: Barry I Slotnick
Represented By: Karen R Thorland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Headphone Junkie Publishing LLC
Represented By: Kara E F Cenar
Represented By: Jonathan S Pink
Represented By: Mariangela Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interscope Records
Represented By: Linda M Burrow
Represented By: Heather L Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeepney Music Inc
Represented By: Kara E F Cenar
Represented By: Jonathan S Pink
Represented By: Mariangela Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Adams Jr
Represented By: Kara E F Cenar
Represented By: Mariangela Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Pineda
Represented By: Kara E F Cenar
Represented By: Jonathan S Pink
Represented By: Mariangela Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Riesterer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rister Editions
Represented By: Tal Efriam Dickstein
Represented By: Donald A Miller
Represented By: Barry I Slotnick
Represented By: Karen R Thorland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shapiro Bernstein and Co
Represented By: Tal Efriam Dickstein
Represented By: Donald A Miller
Represented By: Rachel Aleeza Rappaport
Represented By: Barry I Slotnick
Represented By: Karen R Thorland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square Rivoli Publishing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tab Magnetic Publishing
Represented By: Kara E F Cenar
Represented By: Jonathan S Pink
Represented By: Mariangela Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMG Recordings Inc
Represented By: Linda M Burrow
Represented By: Heather L Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will.I.Am Music LLC
Represented By: Kara E F Cenar
Represented By: Jonathan S Pink
Represented By: Mariangela Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Pringle
Represented By: Dean A Dickie
Represented By: Ira P Gould
Represented By: Ryan L Greely
Represented By: HamptonHolley LLP
Represented By: Colin C Holley
Represented By: Kathleen E Koppenhoefer
Represented By: Robert C Levels
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?