Michael Burnham et al v. Ruan Logistics Corp.
Plaintiff: Michael Burnham, Fernando Castillo, Neva Crawford, Ricky Crawford, Ted Day, John Gugler, Charles Howlett, Eduardo Jimenez, Bill McMahon, Jody Paulson, Robert Rojas, Todd Shook, Tony Skirrow, Dante Steward, Salvador Bucio Suarez and Daniel Ware
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive and Ruan Transportation
Case Number: 8:2012cv00688
Filed: May 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Arthur Nakazato
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 329 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Granting Final Approval of Class Settlement and Granting Attorney Fees and Costs #326 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Final Approval Motion and Attorney Fees Motion, with modifications. The Court will ENTER the Judgment provided, with modifications. See document for further information. (lwag)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Granting Plaintiffs' MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Enhancement Awards #326 (mt)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 328 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: MODIFYING CASE NAME. On the Court's own Motion, and by request of the parties at the hearing on the Motion for Final Approval of the class action settlement, the Court ORDERS the case name in this action to be changed to Michael Burnham et al. v. Ruan Logistics Corp. (mba)
February 1, 2016 Filing 327 MINUTES OF MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL AND FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS Hearing held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: matter is argued and taken under submission. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (lb)
January 8, 2016 Filing 326 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval; and for Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. Motion set for hearing on 2/1/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai ISO Motion for Final Approval, #2 Exhibit A-B to Declaration of Desai, #3 Exhibit C-E to Declaration of Desai, #4 Declaration of Jarrod Salinas Regarding Notice and Settlement Administration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Jarrod Salinas, #6 Proposed Order) (Desai, Aashish)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 325 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: On September 26, 2015, Plaintiffs filed their "Notice and Motion for Preliminary Approval" (the "Motion"). (Dkt. Nos. 320-321.) On October 26, 2015, the Court heard argument and raised concerns about the class action settlement notice and cy pres distribution proposed in the Motion, among other things. After the hearing, Plaintiffs lodged an amended proposed order granting the Motion with an attached revised class action settlement notice. (Dkt. Nos. 323,323-1.) This amended proposed order includes Defendant's approval of the proposed order (and presumably the attached revised class action settlement notice). (Dkt. 323-1.) The Court is satisfied that the parties' revisions adequately address the Court's concerns. The Court GRANTS the Motion. (lwag)
October 29, 2015 Filing 324 MINUTES OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT [DKT 320, 321] Hearing held. Motions are GRANTED. Counsel to submit a proposed revised notice and order. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (lb)
October 26, 2015 Filing 323 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Amended Proposed Order re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action Motion for Preliminary Approval #320 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement)(Desai, Aashish)
October 12, 2015 Filing 322 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Cy Pres Designation In Settlement Agreement For Preliminary Approval / (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt In Support of Preliminary Approval of Cy Pres Designation Re Settlement, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt In Support of Preliminary Approval of Cy Pres Designation Re Settlement, #3 Declaration Decl of Ambassador Kenneth M. Quinn Regarding Cy Pres In Support of Preliminary Approval Motion)(Gitt, Cynthia)
September 26, 2015 Filing 321 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action Motion for Preliminary Approval filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. Motion set for hearing on 10/26/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D to Declaration of Desai, #2 Exhibit E to Declaration of Desai, #3 Exhibit F to Declaration of Desai, #4 Exhibit Part 1 to Exh G, #5 Exhibit Part 2 to Exh G, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Declaration Compendium of Plaintiffs' Declarations) (Desai, Aashish)
September 26, 2015 Filing 320 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action Motion for Preliminary Approval filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. Motion set for hearing on 10/26/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Desai, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Desai, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Desai, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Desai) (Desai, Aashish)
June 19, 2015 Filing 319 NOTICE of Results of Global Mediation filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Re Proposed Class Notice #316 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court previously granted Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, and the parties have now filed a "Joint Stipulation Regarding Proposed Class Notice." (Dkt. No. 316.) The presented class notice is deficient, and therefore the request to approve it is DENIED. To obtain the Court's approval of the class notice, the parties must do the following listed in this order. See document for further details. (lwag)
May 6, 2015 Filing 317 NOTICE of SCOTUS Action on Dilts v. Penske Logistics filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
April 21, 2015 Filing 316 Joint Stipulation Regarding Proposed Class Notice filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham re: Order on Motion to Certify,, Order on Motion to Certify Class Action, #314 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Class Notice)(Desai, Aashish)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 314 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ORDER CERTIFYING IMMEDIATE APPEAL; GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: denying #283 Motion to Certify; granting #296 Motion to Certify Class Action; denying approval of class #266 . (twdb)
February 4, 2015 Filing 313 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 2/2/15 re Transcript #312 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Baird, Miriam) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 4, 2015 Filing 312 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 2/2/15. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: miriam v. baird, phone number mvb11893@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/25/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2015. (Baird, Miriam)
February 2, 2015 Filing 315 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Cause is called for hearing and counsel make their appearances. Motions #283 , #296 , and #266 are argued and taken under submission. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (dro)
January 26, 2015 Filing 311 OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT re: MOTION to Certify Class #296 OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS OF DEREK WHITFIELD AND TERRY WHITFIELD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' DECEMBER 5, 2014 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
January 26, 2015 Filing 310 DECLARATION of CYNTHIA E. GITT IN SUPPORT MOTION to Certify Class #296 IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFFS' DECEMBER 5, 2014 MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
January 26, 2015 Filing 309 DECLARATION of SAM SCHOTT IN SUPPORT MOTION to Certify Class #296 FOURTH DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFFS' DECEMBER 5, 2014 MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
January 26, 2015 Filing 308 DECLARATION of ROCHELLE BORG IN SUPPORT MOTION to Certify Class #296 SECOND DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFFS' DECEMBER 5, 2014 MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gitt, Cynthia)
January 26, 2015 Filing 307 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Certify Class #296 SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFFS' DECEMBER 5, 2014 MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
January 16, 2015 Filing 306 REPLY in support of MOTION to Certify Class #296 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai in support of Reply to Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit A-B to Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai, #3 Declaration C-D to Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai, #4 Declaration Derek Whitfield in support of Reply to Motion for Class Certification, #5 Declaration of Terry Whitfield in support of Reply to Motion for Class Certification)(Desai, Aashish)
January 6, 2015 Filing 305 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Certify Class #296 CORRECTED MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED MOTION TO CERTIFY // filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
January 6, 2015 Filing 304 REPLY In Opposition To MOTION to Certify Class #296 NOTICE OF CORRECTIONS TO MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS // filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
January 5, 2015 Filing 303 DECLARATION of Sam Schott In Support Of Opposition To MOTION to Certify Class #296 THIRD DECLARATION OF SAM SCHOTT IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS // filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
January 5, 2015 Filing 302 DECLARATION of Christopher Czerwinski In Support of Opposition MOTION to Certify Class #296 DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER CZERWINSKI IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS // filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
January 5, 2015 Filing 301 DECLARATION of Rochelle Borg In Support of Opposition To MOTION to Certify Class #296 DECLARATION OF ROCHELLE BORG IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS // filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
January 5, 2015 Filing 300 DECLARATION of Eric Alexander In Opposition To MOTION to Certify Class #296 DECLARATION OF ERIC ALEXANDER IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS // filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
January 5, 2015 Filing 299 OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS re MOTION to Certify Class #296 OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS // filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
December 5, 2014 Filing 298 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class Exhibits to Declaration of Desai filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. Motion set for hearing on 2/2/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E to Declaration of Desai, #2 Exhibit F to Declaration of Desai)(Desai, Aashish)
December 5, 2014 Filing 297 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class Exhibits to Declaration of Desai filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. Motion set for hearing on 2/2/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D Part 1 to Declaration of Desai, #2 Exhibit D Part 2 to Declaration of Desai, #3 Exhibit D Part 3 to Declaration of Desai, #4 Exhibit D Part 4 to Declaration of Desai)(Desai, Aashish)
December 5, 2014 Filing 296 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. Motion set for hearing on 2/2/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai ISO Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit A-B to Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai, #3 Exhibit C to Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai, #4 Compendium of Plaintiffs' Declarations)(Desai, Aashish)
December 5, 2014 Filing 295 SCHEDULING NOTICE re: Stipulation to Continue #294 : Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporations Motion for Order Certifying for Immediate Appeal the Courts Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration and Denying Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt 283] previously scheduled for 12/8/2014 AT 10:00 am is continued by stipulation to 2/2/2015 at 10:00 am. Counsel are reminded that ALL stipulations MUST HAVE proposed orders that are attached to the filing and emailed to the judge's chambers.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 4, 2014 Filing 294 STIPULATION to Continue HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION FOR IMMEDIATE APPEAL ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT from December 8, 2014 to February 2, 2015 Re: MOTION to Certify ORDER FOR IMMEDIATE APPEAL THE COURT'S ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #283 filed by DEFENDANT Ruan Transportation.(Gitt, Cynthia)
November 21, 2014 Filing 293 DECLARATION of Cynthia E. Gitt In Support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action #266 Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Conditional Settlement With Amended and Supplemental Documents // filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Conditional Settlement With Amended and Supplemental Documents //, #2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Conditional Settlement With Amended and Supplemental Documents //)(Gitt, Cynthia)
November 21, 2014 Filing 292 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation re Stipulation for Settlement #290 (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for: (1) Preliminarily Approving Class Action Settlement; (2) Provisionally Certifying and Consolidating Settlement Classes; (3) Approving Class Notice; and (4) Setting Hearing For Final Approval Of The Settlement //, #2 Exhibit One)(Gitt, Cynthia)
November 18, 2014 Filing 291 Amended STIPULATION to AMENDED JOINT STIPULATION AND SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT OF CLASS ACTION CLAIMS // filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation.(Gitt, Cynthia)
November 17, 2014 Filing 290 Joint STIPULATION for Settlement Joint Stipulation to Conditional Settlement Class // filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation.(Gitt, Cynthia)
October 27, 2014 Filing 289 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cynthia E Gitt counsel for Defendant Ruan Transportation. Ani M. Akopyan is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION erroneously named as RUAN TRANSPORTATION. (Gitt, Cynthia)
October 23, 2014 Filing 288 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Certify ORDER FOR IMMEDIATE APPEAL THE COURT'S ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #283 , MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #172 in Light of Dilts v. Penske #277 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
October 21, 2014 Filing 287 OPPOSITION in opposition re: MOTION to Certify ORDER FOR IMMEDIATE APPEAL THE COURT'S ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #283 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
October 20, 2014 Filing 286 [PROPOSED] ORDER CERTIFYING THE COURT'S ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR IMMEDIATE APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1292(b) filed by Defendants Does, Ruan Transportation re: Declaration (Motion related),, #285 , MOTION to Certify ORDER FOR IMMEDIATE APPEAL THE COURT'S ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #283 , Memorandum in Support of Motion, #284 , MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #172 in Light of Dilts v. Penske #277 (Gitt, Cynthia)
October 20, 2014 Filing 285 DECLARATION of CYNTHIA E. GITT IN SUPPORT MOTION to Certify ORDER FOR IMMEDIATE APPEAL THE COURT'S ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #283 , MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #172 in Light of Dilts v. Penske #277 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gitt, Cynthia)
October 20, 2014 Filing 284 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Certify ORDER FOR IMMEDIATE APPEAL THE COURT'S ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #283 , MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #172 in Light of Dilts v. Penske #277 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
October 20, 2014 Filing 283 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify ORDER FOR IMMEDIATE APPEAL THE COURT'S ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by DEFENDANT Ruan Transportation. Motion set for hearing on 12/8/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Gitt, Cynthia)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford granting #277 Motion for Reconsideration and Denying Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Motion for Reconsideration is GRANTED and, upon reconsideration, Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. (see document for details). (dro)
September 29, 2014 Filing 281 MINUTES OF Status and Motion Hearing held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: taking under advisement #277 Motion for Reconsideration ; Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (twdb)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 280 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. ( Status Conference set for 9/29/2014 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford.) (twdb)
September 12, 2014 Filing 279 REPLY in support of MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #172 in Light of Dilts v. Penske #277 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai ISO Plaintiffs' Reply, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai)(Desai, Aashish)
September 8, 2014 Filing 278 DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIGHT OF DILTS v. PENSKE // OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #172 in Light of Dilts v. Penske #277 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. to Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Light of Dilts v. Penske //, #2 Exhibit A. to Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Light of Dilts v. Penske //)(Gitt, Cynthia)
August 25, 2014 Filing 277 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #172 in Light of Dilts v. Penske filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. Motion set for hearing on 9/29/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration)(Desai, Aashish)
August 13, 2014 Filing 276 REPORT of Pursuant to Court's August 5, 2014 Order filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
August 4, 2014 Filing 275 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Cause is called for hearing and counsel make their appearances. Court and parties discuss potential impact on this case of Dilts v. Penske Logistics, LLC, No. 12-55705 (9th Cir. July 9, 2014). Court and parties discuss Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Dkt. No. 266), which is currently under submission, and Proposed Amended Order filed July 8, 2014 (Dkt. No. 271.) The parties are ordered to meet, discuss how they would like to proceed, and file papers stating how the Court should proceed. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (dro)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, granting Stipulation continuing status conference on Motion for Preliminary Approval and Case Status in light of Dilts V. Penske #273 . ( Status Conference reset for 8/4/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford.) (twdb)
July 22, 2014 Filing 273 Joint STIPULATION for Hearing re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #272 , Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from 07/28/2014 to 08/04/14 Re: MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action #266 filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Continuing Status Conference)(Desai, Aashish)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 272 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Order Setting Scheduling Conference. The Court has received the Proposed Amended Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement #271 . The Court is concerned about continuing deficiencies in documents concerning settlement. The Court sets a Status Conference set for 7/28/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (nbo)
July 8, 2014 Filing 271 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Amended Order re Order on Motion for Settlement, Motion Hearing #268 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Amended Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement)(Desai, Aashish)
June 26, 2014 Filing 270 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6/2/14 10:00 a.m. re Transcript #269 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Baird, Miriam) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 26, 2014 Filing 269 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 6/2/14 10:00 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: miriam v. baird, phone number mvb11893@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2014. (Baird, Miriam)
June 2, 2014 Filing 268 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting #266 Motion for Settlement; Counsel shall submit an amended proposed order.Court Reporter: Denise Paddock. (twdb)
June 2, 2014 Filing 267 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff Michael Burnham Court Reporter. Court will contact Sonia Nava at sonia@desai-law.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Opinion of the Court on 06/02/2014. Pre-Trial Proceeding: 06/02/2014. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Desai, Aashish)
May 5, 2014 Filing 266 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. Motion set for hearing on 6/2/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval, #2 Exhibit A-D to Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai, #3 Exhibit E-F to Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai)(Desai, Aashish)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 265 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT AND REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD. re: Notice of Settlement #264 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb)
April 7, 2014 Filing 264 NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
April 4, 2014 Filing 263 NOTICE of Decision: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF RECENT DECISION BY THE NINTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS REGARDING ITEMIZED WAGE STATEMENTS filed by DEFENDANT Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gitt, Cynthia)
April 4, 2014 Filing 262 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Supplement SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA E. GITT IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION RE CONTEMPT AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS re Response in Opposition to Motion, #231 filed by DEFENDANT Ruan Transportation.(Gitt, Cynthia)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 261 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: ORDER CONCERNING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION #246 . (twdb)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER Granting Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Application to File and Maintain Certain Exhibits Under Seal #256 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court has reviewed the Application of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation ("RLC") to file and maintain certain documents under seal. The Court finds that RLC, in its Application, has demonstrated that "compelling reasons" exist to file and maintain the requested documents under seal. Accordingly, the documents shall be filed and maintained under seal. See document for further details. (lwag)
April 2, 2014 Filing 255 NOTICE of Decision: APRIL 2, 2014 DECISION BY UNITED STATES SUPREME COURT REGARDING PREEMPTION UNDER THE FEDERAL AIRLINE DEREGULATION ACT OF 1978 filed by DEFENDANT Ruan Transportation. (Yang, Lawrence)
March 31, 2014 Filing 254 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by DEFENDANT Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
March 31, 2014 Filing 253 AMENDED JOINT Exhibit List filed by DEFENDANT Ruan Transportation.. (Gitt, Cynthia)
March 31, 2014 Filing 252 JOINT Exhibit List filed by DEFENDANT Ruan Transportation.. (Gitt, Cynthia)
March 31, 2014 Filing 251 Witness List filed by DEFENDANT Ruan Transportation.. (Gitt, Cynthia)
March 31, 2014 Filing 250 Witness List filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham.. (Desai, Aashish)
March 31, 2014 Filing 249 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
March 31, 2014 Filing 248 REPLY in support MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Assess PAGA Penalties #225 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai In Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Brief to Assess PAGA Penalties)(Desai, Aashish)
March 28, 2014 Filing 247 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Supplement Plaintiffs' re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Contempt against Ruan and its Counsel of Record #228 and Issue Terminating Sanctions filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham.(Desai, Aashish)
March 28, 2014 Filing 246 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Supplement DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO HOLD DEFENDANT AND ITS COUNSEL IN CONTEMPT AND ISSUE TERMINATING SANCTIONS re Response in Opposition to Motion, #231 filed by DEFENDANT Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration CYNTHIA E. GITT, #2 Exhibit A-DECL. C. E. GITT)(Akopyan, Ani)
March 26, 2014 Filing 245 Joint STIPULATION to Clarify Proposed Class Notice, Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #230 , filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Approving Class Notice)(Desai, Aashish)
March 24, 2014 Filing 259 SEALED DOCUMENT RE: EXHIBITS D through H to the Declaration of Luther Philpott-Manually Filed with Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Application for File and Maintain Certain Exhibits Under Seal in Support of its Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Assess Paga Penalties. (lwag)
March 24, 2014 Filing 258 SEALED DOCUMENT RE: EXHIBIT E to the Declaration of Steve Wood-Manually Filed with Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Application to File and Maintain Certain Exhibits Under Seal in Support of its Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Assess Paga Penalties. (lwag)
March 24, 2014 Filing 257 SEALED DOCUMENT RE: EXHIBITS A through D to the Declaration of Steve Wood-Manually Filed With Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Application to File and Maintain Certain Exhibits Under Seal in Support of its Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Assess Paga Penalties. (lwag)
March 24, 2014 Filing 256 APPLICATION to File and Maintain Certain Exhibits Under Seal in Support of its Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Assess Paga Penalties filed by Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation. (lwag)
March 24, 2014 Filing 244 DECLARATION of STEVE HUGI IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Assess PAGA Penalties #225 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-DECL. S. HUGI)(Akopyan, Ani)
March 24, 2014 Filing 243 DECLARATION of NATHAN PRINCE IN SUPPORT OFOPPOSITION MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Assess PAGA Penalties #225 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-DECL. N. PRINCE)(Akopyan, Ani)
March 24, 2014 Filing 242 DECLARATION of CHRISTOPHER CZERWINSKI IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Assess PAGA Penalties #225 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration A-DECL. C. CZERWINSKI)(Akopyan, Ani)
March 24, 2014 Filing 241 DECLARATION of LUTHER PHILPOT IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Assess PAGA Penalties #225 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-DECL. L. PHILPOTT, #2 Exhibit B-DECL. L. PHILPOTT, #3 Exhibit C-DECL. L. PHILPOTT, #4 Exhibit D-DECL. L. PHILPOTT, #5 Exhibit E-DECL. L. PHILPOTT, #6 Exhibit F-DECL. L. PHILPOTT, #7 Exhibit G-DECL. L. PHILPOTT, #8 Exhibit H-DECL. L. PHILPOTT)(Akopyan, Ani)
March 24, 2014 Filing 240 DECLARATION of SAM SCHOTT IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Assess PAGA Penalties #225 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Akopyan, Ani)
March 24, 2014 Filing 239 DECLARATION of STEVEN WOOD IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Assess PAGA Penalties #225 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-DECL. S. WOOD, #2 Exhibit B-DECL. S. WOOD, #3 Exhibit C-DECL. S. WOOD, #4 Exhibit D-DECL. S. WOOD, #5 Exhibit E-DECL. S. WOOD)(Akopyan, Ani)
March 24, 2014 Filing 238 DECLARATION of ANI M. AKOPYAN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Assess PAGA Penalties #225 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-DECL. A. AKOPYAN, #2 Exhibit B-DECL. A. AKOPYAN, #3 Exhibit C-DECL. A. AKOPYAN, #4 Exhibit D-DECL. A. AKOPYAN, #5 Exhibit E-DECL. A. AKOPYAN)(Akopyan, Ani)
March 24, 2014 Filing 237 DECLARATION of CYNTHIA E. GITT IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Assess PAGA Penalties #225 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Akopyan, Ani)
March 24, 2014 Filing 236 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Assess PAGA Penalties #225 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Akopyan, Ani)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: ORDER CONCERNING EX PARTE APPLICATION #228 . (twdb)
March 24, 2014 Filing 234 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation of APPLICATION TO FILE EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL; EXHIBITS A-E TO THE DECLARATION OF STEVE WOOD; EXHIBITS D-H TO THE DECLARATION OF LUTHER PHILPOTT; PROPOSED ORDER. (Yang, Lawrence)
March 20, 2014 Filing 233 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Contempt against Ruan and its Counsel of Record #228 OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO STRIKE IMPROPER REPLY OF PLAINTIFFS' TO THE OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO HOLD DEFENDANT AND ITS COUNSEL IN CONTEMPT AND ISSUE TERMINATING SANCTIONS filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Akopyan, Ani)
March 20, 2014 Filing 232 REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Contempt against Ruan and its Counsel of Record #228 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
March 20, 2014 Filing 231 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Contempt against Ruan and its Counsel of Record #228 AND ISSUE TERMINATING SANCTIONS; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ANI M. AKOPYAN, #2 Declaration CYNTHIA E. GITT, #3 Exhibit A-DECL. C. E. GITT, #4 Exhibit B-DECL. C. E. GITT, #5 Exhibit C-DECL. C. E. GITT)(Akopyan, Ani)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: ORDER REQUIRING REVISED CLASS NOTICE. re: Stipulation to Clarify #224 . (twdb)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: denying #226 Ex Parte Application to Continue. (twdb)
March 19, 2014 Filing 228 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Contempt against Ruan and its Counsel of Record filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai in Support of Ex Parte Application to Hold Defendant and its Counsel in Contempt and Issue Terminating Sanctions, #2 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application to Hold Counsel in Contempt and Issue Terminating Sanctions)(Desai, Aashish)
March 19, 2014 Filing 227 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ASSESS PAGA PENALTIES; AND THE BENCH TRIAL AND ALL RELATED PRE-TRIAL FILING DEADLINES from April 14, 2014 and May 6, 2014 to May 12, 2014 and June 16, 2014 Re: MOTION for Summary Judgmen #226 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
March 18, 2014 Filing 226 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ASSESS PAGA PENALTIES; AND THE BENCH TRIAL AND ALL RELATED PRE-TRIAL FILING DEADLINES from April 14, 2014 and May 6, 2014 to May 12, 2014 and June 16, 2014 Re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Assess PAGA Penalties #225 filed by DEFENDANT Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration CYNTHIA E. GITT, #2 Exhibit A-DECL. C. GITT, #3 Exhibit B-DECL. C. GITT, #4 Exhibit C-DECL. C. GITT, #5 Proposed Order)(Gitt, Cynthia)
March 14, 2014 Filing 225 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Assess PAGA Penalties filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. Motion set for hearing on 4/14/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai in Support of Plaintiffs' Brief to Assess PAGA Penalties)(Desai, Aashish)
March 14, 2014 Filing 224 Joint STIPULATION to Clarify Proposed Class Notice, Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #222 , filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Approving Class Notice)(Desai, Aashish)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting Motions to Compel. The Motions to Compel are GRANTED, with compliance required by March 13, 2014. RE #209 #210 (twdb)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' Second Amended Motion for Class Certification #218 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (see document for details). (dro)
February 10, 2014 Filing 221 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: 1. PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS RESPONSES [DKTS #207, 208] 2. PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION [DKT #218]. Motions are argued and taken under submission.Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (twdb)
January 22, 2014 Filing 220 REPLY in support MOTION to Certify Class #91 Second Amended filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply to Second Amended Motion for Class Certification, #2 Responses to Defendants Evidentiary Objections in Support of Its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Desai, Aashish)
January 17, 2014 Filing 219 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Certify Class #91 DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION)(Akopyan, Ani)
January 13, 2014 Filing 218 Amendment to MOTION to Certify Class #91 Second Amended filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Plaintiffs' Second Amended Motion for Class Certification, #2 Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai in Support of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Motion for Class Certification, #3 Declaration of Ted Day in Support of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Motion for Class Certification, #4 Declaration of John Gugler in Support of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Motion for Class Certification, #5 Declaration of Bill McMahon in Support of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Motion for Class Certification, #6 Declaration of Neva Crawford in Support of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Motion for Class Certification, #7 Declaration of Jody Paulson in Support of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Motion for Class Certification, #8 Declaration of Ricky Crawford in Support of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Motion for Class Certification, #9 Declaration of Roberto Rojas in Support of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Motion for Class Certification, #10 Declaration of Erik Senf in Support of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Motion for Class Certification)(Desai, Aashish)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Concerning Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Thus if Plaintiffs wish to file an amended motion for class certification based on the definitions in the Old Notice of Motion, they may, by February 3, 2014. Class certification for any class not described in the Old Notice of Motion is DENIED. Further, for the reasons stated in the Court's tentative, all voluminous evidentiary objections are STRICKEN. If any party wishes to make further evidentiary objections to any future filings, it may do so, keeping in mind the Court's three admonitions against voluminous objections. (See Tentative Order on this Motion; Dkt. Nos. 172, 179.) Failure to respect the Court's concerns about blanket objections will likely lead to blanket overruling of those objections. Plaintiffs may also wish to consider voluntarily dismissing the rest of this case, without prejudice to filing future requests for fees consistent with the law, and immediately seeking an appeal. (see document for details). (dro)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Continuing Hearing on Motions to Compel. These motions were noticed for a hearing on January 20, 2014, a federal holiday. Court thus CONTINUES the hearing on these motions to 2/10/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (dg)
January 6, 2014 Filing 215 NOTICE filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. Notice of Errata Attaching Corrected Supplemental Brief: (1) Request for Production No. 9; (2) Special Interrogatories Nos. 11, 13 (Desai, Aashish)
January 6, 2014 Filing 214 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Supplement TO JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO (1) SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES NOS. 11, 13 re Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion,, #208 #210 , MOTION to Supplement TO JOINT STIPULATION RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO (1) REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION NO. 9 re Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion,, #207 #209 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ani M. Akopyan in Support of Ruan Logistics Corporation's Supplemental Memorandum to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant's Responses to: (1) Special Interrogatories Nos. 11, 13)(Akopyan, Ani)
January 6, 2014 Filing 213 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Supplement TO JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO (1) SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES NOS. 11, 13 re Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion,, #208 #210 , MOTION to Supplement TO JOINT STIPULATION RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO (1) REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION NO. 9 re Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion,, #207 #209 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ani M. Akopyan in Support of Ruan Logistics Corporation's Supplemental Memorandum to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant's Response to: (1) Request for Production, 9)(Akopyan, Ani)
January 6, 2014 Filing 212 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Supplement TO JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO (1) SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES NOS. 11, 13 re Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion,, #208 #210 , MOTION to Supplement TO JOINT STIPULATION RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO (1) REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION NO. 9 re Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion,, #207 #209 Supplemental Brief filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai in Support of Supplemental Brief: (1) Request for Production No. 9; (2) Special Interrogatories Nos. 11, 13.)(Desai, Aashish)
January 6, 2014 Filing 211 MINUTES OF Defendant's Amended Motion for Class Certification Hearing held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Matter is argued and taken under submission. Court Reporter: Maria Dellaneve. (nbo)
December 23, 2013 Filing 210 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Supplement TO JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO (1) SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES NOS. 11, 13 re Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion,, #208 filed by DEFENDANT Ruan Transportation. Motion set for hearing on 1/20/2014 at 10:00 PM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ANI M. AKOPYAN)(Akopyan, Ani)
December 23, 2013 Filing 209 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Supplement TO JOINT STIPULATION RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO (1) REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION NO. 9 re Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion,, #207 filed by DEFENDANT Ruan Transportation. Motion set for hearing on 1/20/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ANI M. AKOPYAN)(Akopyan, Ani)
December 20, 2013 Filing 208 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Special Interrogatories 1-2, 4-13, 15-8; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #62 ; Special Interrogatories Nos. 11, 13 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai in Support of Plaintiffs' Joint Stipulation for Motion to Compel Defendant's Responses to Requests for Production, Set One, No. 9 and Special Interrogatories, Set One, Nos. 11, 13, #2 Declaration of Ani M. Akopyan in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel)(Desai, Aashish)
December 20, 2013 Filing 207 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Requests for Production 1-15, 17, 19-22; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #63 Requests for Production, Set One, No. 9 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai in Support of Plaintiffs' Joint Stipulation for Motion to Compel Defendant's Responses to Requests for Production, Set One, No. 9, #2 Declaration of Ani M. Akopyan in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel)(Desai, Aashish)
December 16, 2013 Filing 206 REPLY in support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply to Amended Motion for Class Certification)(Desai, Aashish)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, re Stipulation to Continue #204 . The Court resets the Bench Trial for 5/6/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford and resets the Final Pretrial Conference for 4/21/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (nbo)
December 11, 2013 Filing 204 STIPULATION to Continue PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES from December 16, 2013 and January 7, 2014 to To Be Determined January 6, 2014 filed by DEFENDANT Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Akopyan, Ani)
December 9, 2013 Filing 203 OPPOSITION OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION // filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF SAM SCHOTT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF ANI M. AKOPYAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT A TO DECLARATION OF ANI M. AKOPYAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO PLAITNIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT B TO DECLARATION OF ANI M. AKOPYAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO PLAITNIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT C TO DECLARATION OF ANI M. AKOPYAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO PLAITNIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT D TO DECLARATION OF ANI M. AKOPYAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO PLAITNIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, #7 DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF NEVA CRAWFORD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, #8 DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF RICKY CRAWFORD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, #9 DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF TED DAY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, #10 DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF JOHN GUGLER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, #11 DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF BILL MCMAHON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, #12 DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF JODY PAULSON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, #13 DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF ROBERTO ROJAS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, #14 DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS AND REQUEST TO STRILE DECLARATION OF ERIC SENF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION)(Akopyan, Ani)
December 2, 2013 Filing 202 Amendment to MOTION to Certify Class #91 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification, #2 Declaration of Ted Day in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification, #3 Declaration of John Gugler in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification, #4 Declaration of Bill McMahon in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification, #5 Declaration of Neva Crawford in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification, #6 Declaration of Jody Paulson in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification, #7 Declaration of Ricky Crawford in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification, #8 Declaration of Roberto Rojas in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification, #9 Declaration of Erik Senf in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification)(Desai, Aashish)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 13-80189. The petition for permission to appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) is denied. Order received in this district on 11/20/2013. (dmap)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order on Motion Seeking Discovery by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. In this putative class action, employees allege Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation violated California's wage-and-hour laws. Before the Court is Plaintiffs' motion seeking discovery. (Motion," Dkt. No. 190.) The Court ORDERS that discovery may be sought. (see document for details). (dro)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford denying #188 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Defendant's Motion is DENIED. (see document for details). (dro)
November 18, 2013 Filing 198 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford:Cause is called for hearing and counsel make their appearances. Matter is argued. The Court orders that the tentative rulings shall become the ruling of the Court. Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is #188 DENIED. The Court grants plaintiffs discovery. Counsel shall meet and confer and then any discovery motion shall be filed before this Court. Separate orders re these motions shall be signed and filed.Court Reporter: Denise Paddock. (twdb)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, re Stipulation Modifying Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Amended Motion for Class Certification #196 . Having reviewed the Parties' Stipulation Modifying Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Amended Motion for Class Certification, and, for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: That the hearing on the Amended Motion for Class Certification be set for January 6, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiffs are to file the Amended Motion for Class Certification by December 2, 2013; Defendant shall file the Opposition by December 9, 2013; and Plaintiffs shall file the Reply by December 16, 2013. (dro)
November 6, 2013 Filing 196 Joint STIPULATION for Hearing re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines,,,, #191 filed by DEFENDANT Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Akopyan, Ani)
November 4, 2013 Filing 195 REPLY MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #188 Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporatino's reply To Opposition To Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings, Or In The Alternative, Motion To Strike Claims For Penalties filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt In Support Of Reply To Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, or in the Alternative, To Strike Claims For Penalties, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt In Support Of Reply To Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, or in the Alternative, To Strike Claims For Penalties, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt In Support Of Reply To Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, or in the Alternative, To Strike Claims For Penalties, #4 Declaration Declaration of Ani M. Akopyan In Support Of Reply To Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, or in the Alternative, To Strike Claims For Penalties)(Akopyan, Ani)
November 4, 2013 Filing 194 REPLY filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham to Response in Opposition to Motion, #193 to Objection to Magistrate's October 22, 2013 Discovery Order (Desai, Aashish)
October 28, 2013 Filing 193 OPPOSITION AND OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE AND MOTION TO RECONSIDER MAGISTRATE'S OCTOBER 22, 2013 DISCOVERY ORDER; DECLARATION OF ANI AKOPYAN filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ani Akopyan, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Ani Akopyan, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Ani Akopyan, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Ani Akopyan)(Gitt, Cynthia)
October 28, 2013 Filing 192 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #188 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai)(Desai, Aashish)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 . The Court has received a request from Plaintiff for ruling on this Motion. (Dkt. No. 180.) The Court sets a hearing on the Motion for Class Certification for December 23, 2013. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file an amended motion for class certification, narrowed to only the claims that remain, by November 25, 2013. Defendants Opposition is due December 2, 2013. Plaintiff may reply by December 9, 2013. If the parties wish to set a different briefing schedule for the amended motion, the parties may submit a stipulationshowing the change. (twdb)
October 23, 2013 Filing 190 OBJECTIONS to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #189 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
October 22, 2013 Filing 189 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Plaintiffs motions to compel responses (Motions) filed on October 18, 2013 #184 , #185 , by Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato. The Motions are DENIED. (see document for details). : re: Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion, #184 , Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion, #185 . (dro)
October 21, 2013 Filing 188 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE CLAIMS FOR PENALTIES)(Akopyan, Ani)
October 18, 2013 Filing 187 DECLARATION of Ani M. Akopyan in opposition to MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Requests for Production 1-15, 17, 19-22; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #63 , MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Special Interrogatories 1-2, 4-13, 15-8; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #62 [Filed Concurrently with Joint Stipulations] filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
October 18, 2013 Filing 186 DECLARATION of Aashish Y. Desai in support of MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Requests for Production 1-15, 17, 19-22; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #63 , MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Special Interrogatories 1-2, 4-13, 15-8; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #62 in support of Plaintiffs' Joint Stipulation for Motion to Compel Defendant's Responses to: (1) Requests for Production, Set One, No. 9, (2) Special Interrogatories, Set One, Nos. 11, 13 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
October 18, 2013 Filing 185 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Special Interrogatories 1-2, 4-13, 15-8; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #62 Motion to Compel Defendant's Responses to: (1) Special Interrogatories Nos. 11, 13 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
October 18, 2013 Filing 184 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Requests for Production 1-15, 17, 19-22; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #63 Motion to Compel Defendant's Responses to: (1) Request for Production No. 9 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
October 16, 2013 Filing 183 BRIEF filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. Response to Ruan's Opposition regarding REQUEST for Ruling Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification #180 . (Desai, Aashish)
October 15, 2013 Filing 182 NOTICE Ruan Transportation. NOTICE OF CORRECTION TO DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO AND/OR REQUEST TO STAY PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR RULING ON MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION PENDING RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS REGARDING PREEMPTION OF PENALTIES [DOCKET NO. 181] (Gitt, Cynthia)
October 14, 2013 Filing 181 OPPOSITION to REQUEST for Ruling Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification #180 AND/OR REQUEST TO STAY PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR RULING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, PENDING RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS REGARDING PREEMPTION OF PENALTIES filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gitt, Cynthia)
October 10, 2013 Filing 180 REQUEST for Ruling Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' #147 Motion for Summary Judgment. (twdb)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 178 IN CHAMBERS MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato denying Plaintiffs motion to compel defendants responses to special interrogatory nos. 1-2, 4-13, 15-18 #62 ; denying Plaintiffs motion to compel defendants responses to document request nos. 1-15, 17, 19-22 #63 ; and denying Plaintiffs motion to compel further deposition testimony #64 (see minute order for details). (sty)
August 26, 2013 Filing 177 Petition For Leave to Appeal Order filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham re: Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #172 (Desai, Aashish)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, Granting Stipulation to Certify Court's Ruling on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment for Interlocutory Appeal #174 (twdb)
August 21, 2013 Filing 174 Joint STIPULATION to Certify For Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Certifying The Court's Ruling on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment For Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b))(Desai, Aashish)
August 19, 2013 Filing 176 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: taking under advisement #147 Motion for Summary Judgment; taking under advisement #151 Motion to Stay Case ; Court Reporter: Denise Paddock. (twdb)
August 19, 2013 Filing 173 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff Michael Burnham Court Reporter. Court will contact Sonia Nava at sonia@desai-law.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Opinion of the Court on 8/19/13. Pre-Trial Proceeding: 8/19/13. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Desai, Aashish)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: granting #18 Motion for Summary Judgment. (twdb)
August 15, 2013 Filing 171 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Ruan Transportationto Notice (Other) #168 TO PLAINTIFFS' JULY 25, 2013 "NOTICE OF STATUS REGARDING GONZALEZ V. DOWNTOWN LA MOTORS" (Gitt, Cynthia)
August 15, 2013 Filing 170 NOTICE of Decision: UNITED SUPREME COURT'S DECISION IN AMERICAN TRUCKING ASSOCIATIONS, INC. V. CITY OF LOS ANGELES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by DEFENDANT Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: re: Hearing on Plaintiffs' MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Compensation and Paystub Claims #148 , #147 , Defendant's MOTION to Stay Case pending SUPREME COURT DECISION #151 . (twdb)
July 25, 2013 Filing 168 NOTICE of Status Regarding Gonzales v. Downtown LA Motors filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
July 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER Re: Stipulation to Continue Hearing Motion for Summary Judgment #147 and Motion to Stay the Case #151 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Having reviewed the Parties' Stipulation #166 to Continue the Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendant's Motion to Stay the Case, and, for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: That the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendant's Motion to Stay the Proceedings, both now set for August 5, 2013 at 10:00 a.m., and shall be continued to August 19, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. (dro)
July 3, 2013 Filing 166 Joint STIPULATION to Continue HEARING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION TO STAY THE CASE from August 5, 2013 to August 19, 2013 filed by DEFENDANT Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gitt, Cynthia)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: ORDER CONTINUING HEARING RE MOTION for Summary Judgment #147 , MOTION to Stay Case #151 . ( Motion hearings continued to 8/5/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford.) (twdb)
June 20, 2013 Filing 163 REPLY MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Compensation and Paystub Claims #147 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
June 17, 2013 Filing 164 MINUTES OF Hearing held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: STATUS CONFERENCE; and PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION [DKT #91]: Cause is called for hearing and counsel make their appearances. Court and counsel confer re the status of this matter. Matter is taken under submission. Court Reporter: Denise Paddock. (rla)
June 17, 2013 Filing 162 Objection In Opposition To re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Compensation and Paystub Claims #147 Defendant's Objections to Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
June 17, 2013 Filing 161 DECLARATION of Andrew McCuan In Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Compensation and Paystub Claims #147 Declaration of Andrew McCuan in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Andew McCuan in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Gitt, Cynthia)
June 17, 2013 Filing 160 DECLARATION of Cynthia E. Gitt Opposition To MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Compensation and Paystub Claims #147 Declaration of Cynthia E. Gtt in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
June 17, 2013 Filing 159 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Compensation and Paystub Claims #147 Defendant's Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Facts and Conclusions of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
June 17, 2013 Filing 158 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Compensation and Paystub Claims #147 Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
June 14, 2013 Filing 157 DECLARATION of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of MOTION to Stay Case pending SUPREME COURT DECISION #151 Supplemental Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
June 14, 2013 Filing 156 OPPOSITION in opposition re: MOTION to Stay Case pending SUPREME COURT DECISION #151 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: RE HEARING ON MOTION FORCLASS CERTIFICATION: (See document for details.) At the upcoming hearing on June 17, 2013, the Court will discuss the status of this case and whether it is appropriate to stay the case. The parties need not come prepared to discuss class certification. (rla)
June 10, 2013 Filing 154 DECLARATION of Lawrence L. Yang IN SUPPORT MOTION to Stay Case pending SUPREME COURT DECISION #151 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Gitt, Cynthia)
June 10, 2013 Filing 153 DECLARATION of Cynthia E. Gitt IN SUPPORT MOTION to Stay Case pending SUPREME COURT DECISION #151 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gitt, Cynthia)
June 10, 2013 Filing 152 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Stay Case pending SUPREME COURT DECISION #151 DEFENDANT'S SECOND NOTICE OF RECENT DECISIONS REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION, PREEMPTION AND MOTION TO STAY ISSUES SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by DEFENDANT Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
June 10, 2013 Filing 151 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending SUPREME COURT DECISION filed by DEFENDANT Ruan Transportation. Motion set for hearing on 7/8/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Gitt, Cynthia)
June 7, 2013 Filing 150 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Compensation and Paystub Claims #147 filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
June 7, 2013 Filing 149 STATEMENT of Uncontroverted Facts And Conclusions of Law In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Compensation and Paystub Claims #147 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
June 7, 2013 Filing 148 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Compensation and Paystub Claims filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. Motion set for hearing on 7/8/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Desai, Aashish)
June 7, 2013 Filing 147 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Compensation and Paystub Claims filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. Motion set for hearing on 7/8/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)(Desai, Aashish)
June 7, 2013 Filing 146 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Supplement SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA E. GITT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE OUT OF TIME re Response in Opposition to M #130 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification)(Desai, Aashish)
June 5, 2013 Filing 145 DECLARATION of Cynthia E. Gitt in support of MOTION to Certify Class #91 Correction to Third Supplemental Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, Paragraph 21 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
June 3, 2013 Filing 144 DECLARATION of LAWRENCE YANG IN SUPPORT MOTION to Supplement SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA E. GITT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE OUT OF TIME re Response in Opposition to M #130 DEFFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gitt, Cynthia)
June 3, 2013 Filing 143 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Supplement SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA E. GITT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE OUT OF TIME re Response in Opposition to M #130 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ELLEN BRONCHETTI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Gitt, Cynthia)
June 3, 2013 Filing 142 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Supplement SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA E. GITT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE OUT OF TIME re Response in Opposition to M #130 THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA E. GITT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Gitt, Cynthia)
June 3, 2013 Filing 141 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Supplement SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA E. GITT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE OUT OF TIME re Response in Opposition to M #130 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
May 22, 2013 Filing 140 DECLARATION of Lawrence L. Yang in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Second Supplemental Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #18 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Lawrence L. Yang Regarding Recent Case Developments in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Second Supplemental Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Lawrence L. Yang Regarding Recent Case Developments in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Second Supplemental Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit C to Declaration of Lawrence L. Yang Regarding Recent Case Developments in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Second Supplemental Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit D to Declaration of Lawrence L. Yang Regarding Recent Case Developments in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Second Supplemental Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit E to Declaration of Lawrence L. Yang Regarding Recent Case Developments in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Second Supplemental Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #6 Exhibit F to Declaration of Lawrence L. Yang Regarding Recent Case Developments in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Second Supplemental Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #7 Exhibit G to Declaration of Lawrence L. Yang Regarding Recent Case Developments in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Second Supplemental Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #8 Exhibit H to Declaration of Lawrence L. Yang Regarding Recent Case Developments in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Second Supplemental Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #9 Exhibit I to Declaration of Lawrence L. Yang Regarding Recent Case Developments in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Second Supplemental Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Gitt, Cynthia)
May 22, 2013 Filing 139 DECLARATION of Cynthia E. Gitt In Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Reply to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #18 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Reply to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Reply to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit C to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Reply to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit D to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Reply to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit E to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Reply to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Gitt, Cynthia)
May 22, 2013 Filing 138 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #18 Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Second Supplemental Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
May 21, 2013 Filing 137 SUPPLEMENT to Notice (Other) #17 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. ( Motion hearing continued to 6/17/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford.) (twdb)
May 13, 2013 Filing 135 NOTICE of Decision: Recent SCOTUS Decision In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
May 6, 2013 Filing 134 NOTICE of Decision: In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
April 18, 2013 Filing 133 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings re Transcript #132 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(Paddock, Denise)TO ORDER TRANSCRIPT: WWW.OFFICIALCOURTTRANSCRIPTS.COM TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 18, 2013 Filing 132 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 020413 DCCD GUILFORD 10D BURNHAM CT. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: DENISE PADDOCK, phone number WWW.OCRECORD.COM. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/9/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2013. TO ORDER TRANSCRIPT: WWW.OFFICIALCOURTTRANSCRIPTS.COM(Paddock, Denise)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Continuing Hearing on MOTION to Certify Class #91 . ( Motion hearing continued on 6/3/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford.) (twdb)
April 16, 2013 Filing 130 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Supplement SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA E. GITT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE OUT OF TIME re Response in Opposition to Motion #93 filed by DEFENDANT Ruan Transportation. Motion set for hearing on 4/22/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R, #2 Exhibit S, #3 Exhibit T, #4 Exhibit U, #5 Exhibit V, #6 Exhibit W)(Gitt, Cynthia)
April 16, 2013 Filing 129 NOTICE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS' NON-COOPERATION RE DEPOSITIONS; REQUEST FOR DENIAL OF CLASS CERTIFICATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE HEARING AND DECISION ON MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION PENDING COMPLETION OF PLAINTIFF DEPOSITIONS AND FURTHER BRIEFING BY DEFENDANT filed by DEFENDANT Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
April 10, 2013 Filing 128 NOTICE DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION'S SECOND NOTICE OF RECENT DECISION IN SUPPORT OF REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by DEFENDANT Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gitt, Cynthia)
April 8, 2013 Filing 127 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #19 DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED NOTICE OF RECENT DECISION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
April 8, 2013 Filing 126 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Certify Class #91 DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF RECENT DECISIONS SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFFS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
April 8, 2013 Filing 125 NOTICE of Decision: Recent Decision in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. Amended Notice (Desai, Aashish)
April 5, 2013 Filing 124 SUPPLEMENT Response to Recent Decision filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
April 5, 2013 Filing 123 NOTICE of Decision: Recent Decisions by United States Supreme Court filed by Defendant, Ruan Transportation Ruan Transportation. Defendant's Notice of Recent Decisions by United States Supreme Court Regarding Class Certification, Submitted in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Gitt, Cynthia)
April 5, 2013 Filing 122 NOTICE Courtesy Notice of Recent Decisions in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
April 5, 2013 Filing 121 REPLY in support of MOTION to Certify Class #91 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
April 3, 2013 Filing 120 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Certify Class #91 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA E. GITT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE OUT OF TIME filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R)(Gitt, Cynthia)
April 1, 2013 Filing 119 Opposition Defendant's Objections to Declaration of Bill McMahon in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 Defendant's Objections to Declaration of Bill McMahon in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 118 Opposition Defendant's Objections to Declaration of John Gugler in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 Defendant's Objections to Declaration of John Gugler in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 117 Opposition Defendant's Objections to Declaration of Jody Paulson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 Defendant's Objections to Declaration of Jody Paulson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 116 Opposition Defendant's Objections to Declaration of Neva Crawford in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 Defendant's Objections to Declaration of Neva Crawford in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 115 Opposition Defendant's Objections to Declaration of Ricky Crawford in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 Defendant's Objections to Declaration of Ricky Crawford in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 114 Opposition Defendant's Objections to Declaration of Roberto Rojas in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 Defendant's Objection to Declaration of Roberto Rojas in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 113 Opposition Declaration of Melinda Larsen in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 Declaration of Melinda Larsen in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 112 Opposition Defendant's Objections to Declartion of Ted Day in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 Defendant's Opposition to Declaration of Ted Day in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 111 Opposition Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A. to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 110 Opposition Supplemental Declaration of Andrew McCuan in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 Supplemental Declaration of Andrew McCuan in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 109 Opposition Declaration of Sam Schott in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 Declaration of Sam Schott in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 108 Opposition Supplemental Declaration of James Pfeifer in Support of Defendant Ruan logistics Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 Supplemental Declaration of Jim Pfeifer in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 107 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 Declaration of Andrew McCuan in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration of Billy Ingram in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit Exhibit F to Declaration of Billy Ingram in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #3 Exhibit Exhibit G to Declaration of Billy Ingram in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #4 Exhibit Exhibit H to Declaration of Billy Ingram in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #5 Exhibit Exhibit I to Declaration of Billy Ingram in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #6 Exhibit Exhibit J to Declaration of Billy Ingram in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification)(Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 106 Declaration of Andrew McCuan in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Opposition re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 Declaration of Andrew McCuan in Support of Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Andrew McCuan in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Billy Ingram in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of Billy Ingram in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration of Billy Ingram in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification)(Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 105 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Opposition re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 Declaration of Billy Ingram in Support of Defendant Ruuan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Billy Ingram in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Billy Ingram in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification)(Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 104 Opposition to Motion for Class Certification Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Defendant Ruan Logisitcs Corporation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 Declaration of Cunthia E. Gitt in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit M to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit Exhibit N to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #3 Exhibit Exhibit O to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #4 Exhibit Exhibit P to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #5 Exhibit Exhibit Q to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification)(Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 103 Opposition to Motion for Class Certification Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit H to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit Exhibit I to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #3 Exhibit Exhibit J to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #4 Exhibit Exhibit K to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #5 Exhibit Exhibit L to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification)(Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 102 Opposition Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #3 Exhibit Exhibit F to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #4 Exhibit Exhibit G to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification)(Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 101 Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Suppoprt of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification Opposition re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification)(Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 100 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Opposition re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 Declaration of Kendra Fries in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 99 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Opposition re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit M to Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit Exhibit N to Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #3 Exhibit Exhibit O to Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #4 Exhibit Exhibit P to Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #5 Exhibit Exhibit Q to Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #6 Exhibit Exhibit R to Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #7 Exhibit Exhibit S to Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #8 Exhibit Exhibit T to Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #9 Exhibit Exhibit U to Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification)(Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 98 Opoposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit G to Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit Exhibit H to Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #3 Exhibit Exhibit I to Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #4 Exhibit Exhibit J to Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #5 Exhibit Exhibit K to Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #6 Exhibit Exhibit L to Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification)(Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 97 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Certify Class #91 Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F to Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Ruan Transportation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification)(Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 96 Opposition Declaration of Ellen Bronchetti in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 Declaration of Ellen Bronchetti in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Ellen Bronchetti in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Ellen Bronchetti in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification)(Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 95 Defendant's Objections to Declaration of Aasish Desai in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Defendan'ts Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification re: MOTION to Certify Class #91 Defendant's Objections to Ceclaration of Aashish Desai in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 94 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Certify Class #91 Defendant's Objections and Request to Strike Declaration of Erik Senf in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Akopyan, Ani)
April 1, 2013 Filing 93 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Certify Class #91 Deendant's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Akopyan, Ani)
March 22, 2013 Filing 92 NOTICE OF MOTION re MOTION to Certify Class #91 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. Motion set for hearing on 4/22/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Desai, Aashish)
March 22, 2013 Filing 91 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. Motion set for hearing on 4/22/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification, #2 Declaration of Erik Senf in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #3 Declaration of Bill McMahon in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #4 Declaration of John Gugler in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #5 Declaration of Jody Paulson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #6 Declaration of Neva Crawford in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #7 Declaration of Ricky Crawford in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #8 Declaration of Roberto Rojas in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #9 Declaration of Ted Day in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Desai, Aashish)
March 13, 2013 Filing 90 NOTICE of Decision: in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
March 12, 2013 Filing 89 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [PROPOSED] ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE re Request to Strike, Request for Relief,,,,,, #83 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gitt, Cynthia)
March 12, 2013 Filing 88 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [PROPOSED] ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL re MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Requests for Production 1-15, 17, 19-22; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #63 , MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony Under FRCP 30(b)(6); Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #64 , MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Special Interrogatories 1-2, 4-13, 15-8; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #62 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gitt, Cynthia)
March 12, 2013 Filing 87 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Request to Strike, Request for Relief,,,,,, #83 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Striking Untimely Submissions Under Local Rule 37-2.3)(Desai, Aashish)
March 8, 2013 Filing 86 OBJECTION SUPPORT re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #19 AND RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' IMPROPER "RESPONSE" BRIEF TO THE NOTICE OF A RECENT CASE filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
March 8, 2013 Filing 85 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #18 Response to Recent Decision filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
March 7, 2013 Filing 84 NOTICE OF RECENT DECISION IN SUPPORT OF REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by DEFENDANT Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
March 5, 2013 Filing 83 REQUEST to Strike Untimely Submissions Under Local Rule 37-2.3 Supplement(Motion related),, #82 , Declaration (Motion related),,, #80 , Declaration (Motion related),,,, #81 filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. Request set for hearing on 3/14/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato. (Desai, Aashish)
March 4, 2013 Filing 82 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony Under FRCP 30(b)(6); Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #64 Defendant's Supplemental Brief to Joint Stipulation Regarding Plaintffs' Motion to Compel Defendant's Responses To, and Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Re: (1) Deposition Testimony Under FRCP 30(B)(6); (2) Special Interrogatories 1-2, 4-13, 15-18; and (3) Requests for Production, 1-15, 17, 19-22 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Akopyan, Ani)
March 4, 2013 Filing 81 DECLARATION of Ani M. Akopyan in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony Under FRCP 30(b)(6); Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #64 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit L to Declaration of Ani M. Akopyan in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel and in Support of Defendant's Request for Sanctions, #2 Exhibit Exhibit M to Declaration of Ani M. Akopyan in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel and in Support of Defendant's Request for Sanctions, #3 Exhibit Exhibit N to Declaration of Ani M. Akopyan in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel and in Support of Defendant's Request for Sanctions, #4 Exhibit Exhibit O to Declaration of Ani M. Akopyan in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel and in Support of Defendant's Request for Sanctions, #5 Exhibit Exhibit P to Declaration of Ani M. Akopyan in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel and in Support of Defendant's Request for Sanctions)(Akopyan, Ani)
March 4, 2013 Filing 80 DECLARATION of Cynthia E. Gitt in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony Under FRCP 30(b)(6); Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #64 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit I to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel and in Support of Defendant's Request for Sanctions, #2 Exhibit Exhibit J to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel and in Support of Defendant's Request for Sanctions, #3 Exhibit Exhibit K to Declaration of Cynthia E. Gitt in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel and in Support of Defendant's Request for Sanctions)(Akopyan, Ani)
March 1, 2013 Filing 79 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION to Supplement Motion to Compel re MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Special Interrogatories 1-2, 4-13, 15-8; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #62 #78 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (db)
February 28, 2013 Filing 78 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Supplement Motion to Compel re MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Special Interrogatories 1-2, 4-13, 15-8; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #62 filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. Motion set for hearing on 3/14/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai In Support of Supplemental Brief)(Desai, Aashish)
February 28, 2013 Filing 77 DECLARATION of CYNTHIA E. GITT IN SUPPORT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #19 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit I)(Gitt, Cynthia)
February 28, 2013 Filing 76 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #21 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
February 28, 2013 Filing 75 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #19 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
February 28, 2013 Filing 74 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Requests for Production 1-15, 17, 19-22; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #63 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW TO JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO, AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
February 28, 2013 Filing 73 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Special Interrogatories 1-2, 4-13, 15-8; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #62 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW TO JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO, AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
February 28, 2013 Filing 72 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony Under FRCP 30(b)(6); Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #64 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW TO JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO, AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
February 21, 2013 Filing 71 DECLARATION of Sam Schott in opposition to MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Requests for Production 1-15, 17, 19-22; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #63 , MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony Under FRCP 30(b)(6); Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #64 , MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Special Interrogatories 1-2, 4-13, 15-8; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #62 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
February 21, 2013 Filing 70 DECLARATION of Randy Joaquin in opposition to MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Requests for Production 1-15, 17, 19-22; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #63 , MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony Under FRCP 30(b)(6); Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #64 , MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Special Interrogatories 1-2, 4-13, 15-8; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #62 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
February 21, 2013 Filing 69 DECLARATION of Cynthia E. Gitt in opposition to MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Requests for Production 1-15, 17, 19-22; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #63 , MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony Under FRCP 30(b)(6); Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #64 , MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Special Interrogatories 1-2, 4-13, 15-8; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #62 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
February 21, 2013 Filing 68 DECLARATION of Aashish Y. Desai in support of MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Requests for Production 1-15, 17, 19-22; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #63 , MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony Under FRCP 30(b)(6); Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #64 , MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Special Interrogatories 1-2, 4-13, 15-8; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #62 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
February 21, 2013 Filing 67 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Special Interrogatories 1-2, 4-13, 15-8; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #62 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
February 21, 2013 Filing 66 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony Under FRCP 30(b)(6); Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #64 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
February 21, 2013 Filing 65 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Requests for Production 1-15, 17, 19-22; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai #63 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
February 21, 2013 Filing 64 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony Under FRCP 30(b)(6); Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. Motion set for hearing on 3/14/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato. (Desai, Aashish)
February 21, 2013 Filing 63 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Requests for Production 1-15, 17, 19-22; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. Motion set for hearing on 3/14/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato. (Desai, Aashish)
February 21, 2013 Filing 62 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Defendant's Responses to Special Interrogatories 1-2, 4-13, 15-8; Joint Stipulation; Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. Motion set for hearing on 3/14/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato. (Desai, Aashish)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Denying #51 Ex Parte Application for TRO. (See document for details.) In reviewing Plaintiffs Application, the Court did not consider Plaintiffs reply, filed on February 11, 2013. The reply raised issues unrelated to the letters sent by Defendant. But if the parties wish, each side may file, by February 28, 2013, a brief of up to 10 pages on how this case may be affected by the case Plaintiffs cite in their reply, Williams, et al. v. Ruan Incorporated, No. VCU231325, California Superior Court, County of Tulare. (rla)
February 12, 2013 Filing 60 DECLARATION of CYNTHIA E. GITT IN SUPPORT EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Prevent Unilateral Communications with Putative Class Members. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this #51 DEFENDANT REPLY MEMORANDUM TO PLAINTIFFS' "REPLY" RE EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H)(Gitt, Cynthia)
February 12, 2013 Filing 59 REPLY EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Prevent Unilateral Communications with Putative Class Members. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this #51 DEFENDANT REPLY MEMORANDUM TO PLAINTIFFS' FEBRUARY 11, 2013 "REPLY" RE EX PARTE filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
February 11, 2013 Filing 58 REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Prevent Unilateral Communications with Putative Class Members. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this #51 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aashish Y. Desai)(Desai, Aashish)
February 11, 2013 Filing 57 DECLARATION of THOMAS P. BROWN IV IN OPPOSITION EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Prevent Unilateral Communications with Putative Class Members. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this #51 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
February 11, 2013 Filing 56 DECLARATION of CYNTHIA E. GITT IN OPPOSITION EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Prevent Unilateral Communications with Putative Class Members. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this #51 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E)(Gitt, Cynthia)
February 11, 2013 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Prevent Unilateral Communications with Putative Class Members. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this #51 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
February 8, 2013 Filing 53 DECLARATION of Stephen Condreay in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Prevent Unilateral Communications with Putative Class Members. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this #51 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
February 8, 2013 Filing 52 DECLARATION of Aashish Y. Desai in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Prevent Unilateral Communications with Putative Class Members. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this #51 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
February 8, 2013 Filing 51 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Prevent Unilateral Communications with Putative Class Members. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and need immediate judicial review, please call 213-894-2485 to advise that a Temporary Restraining Order has been electronically filed. Failure to call the courtroom deputy, or the after hours filing contact number, may result in a delay of judicial review. Ex Parte Application filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order)(Desai, Aashish)
February 4, 2013 Filing 54 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing re Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #18 . Matter is argued and taken under submission. Court Reporter: Denise Paddock. (db)
January 24, 2013 Filing 50 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT EXHIBITS 17D-25 VOLUME II; filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 PART 2, #2 PART 3, #3 PART 4)(rla)
January 24, 2013 Filing 49 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT EXHIBITS 10-17C VOLUME 1; filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit PART 2, #2 PART 3)(rla)
January 23, 2013 Filing 48 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation of SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEENDANT RUAN LOGISTICS CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT EXHIBITS 10-25; VOLUMES I & II. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Volume I, #2 Appendix Volume II)(Akopyan, Ani)
January 23, 2013 Filing 47 RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS in opposition re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #18 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
January 20, 2013 Filing 46 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #18 (Gitt, Cynthia)
January 20, 2013 Filing 45 NOTICE SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT filed by DEFENDANT Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit H, #5 Exhibit I)(Gitt, Cynthia)
January 20, 2013 Filing 44 SUPPLEMENTAL COMPENDIUM OF AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #18 (Attachments: #1 Tab 1, #2 Tab 2, #3 Tab 3, #4 Tab 4, #5 Tab 5, #6 Tab 6, #7 Tab 7, #8 Tab 8, #9 Tab 9, #10 Tab 10, #11 Tab 11, #12 Tab 12, #13 Tab 13, #14 Tab 14, #15 Tab 15, #16 Tab 16)(Gitt, Cynthia)
January 20, 2013 Filing 43 DECLARATION of CYNTHIA E. GITT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #18 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
January 20, 2013 Filing 42 DECLARATION of ANI M. AKOPYAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #18 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
January 20, 2013 Filing 41 DECLARATION of JIM PFEIFER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #18 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
January 20, 2013 Filing 40 DECLARATION of ANTOINETTE DEVEREAUX IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #18 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
January 20, 2013 Filing 39 DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS AND REQUEST TO STRIKE DELCARATION OF ERIK SENF IN SUPPORT OF re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #18 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
January 20, 2013 Filing 38 DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO COMPENDIUM OF PLAINTIFFS' DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #18 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
January 20, 2013 Filing 37 STATEMENT of GENUINE ISSUES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #18 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
January 20, 2013 Filing 36 REPLY in support MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #27 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
January 7, 2013 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Compendium of Plaintiffs in opposition MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #18 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
January 7, 2013 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Erik Senf in opposition MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #18 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
January 7, 2013 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Aashish Y. Desai in opposition MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #18 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
January 7, 2013 Filing 32 OPPOSITION in opposition re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #18 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Desai, Aashish)
January 7, 2013 Filing 31 STATEMENT of Genuine Issues [Pursuant to Local Rule 56-2] in Support of Opposition to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #18 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
January 7, 2013 Filing 30 OPPOSITION in opposition re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims #18 filed by Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Desai, Aashish)
December 22, 2012 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] Order on Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Akopyan, Ani)
December 22, 2012 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims (Filed Without Exhibits 1-37 Which Will Be Filed With The Court Independently) filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Compendium of Authorities in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporatino's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Akopyan, Ani)
December 22, 2012 Filing 27 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Antoinette Devereaux in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Akopyan, Ani)
December 22, 2012 Filing 26 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Randy Webster in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Akopyan, Ani)
December 22, 2012 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Andrew McCuan in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.)(Akopyan, Ani)
December 22, 2012 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sam Schott in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Akopyan, Ani)
December 22, 2012 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Akopyan, Ani)
December 22, 2012 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Evidence in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistic Corporation's Motion for partial Summary Judgment)(Akopyan, Ani)
December 22, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Ruan Logists Corporation's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Akopyan, Ani)
December 22, 2012 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Uncontroverted Material Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Defendant Ruan Logistics Corporation's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Akopyan, Ani)
December 22, 2012 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Akopyan, Ani)
December 22, 2012 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Meal and Rest Breaks and Compensation Claims filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Akopyan, Ani)
December 22, 2012 Filing 17 NOTICE Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Michael Burnham. (Akopyan, Ani)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #14 . (twdb)
November 27, 2012 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Aashish Y Desai counsel for Plaintiff Michael Burnham. Changing address to 3200 Bristol Street, Costa Mesa, CA 92626. Filed by plaintiff Michael Burnham (Desai, Aashish)
November 26, 2012 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Reply Papers on Ruan Motion for Parties Summary Judgment, Discovery Deadline for Class Certification, and Deadline for Plaintiffs to File for Class Certification filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gitt, Cynthia)
August 27, 2012 Filing 13 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court sets the following dates: Class action discovery cutoff is February 22, 2013. Regular discovery cutoff is September 13, 2013. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for December 16, 2013, at 8:30 a.m. A Court Trial is set for January 7, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. Court sets the length of the trial at 8 days. Counsel stipulate to ADR Procedure No. 3, private mediation. Court Reporter: Denise Paddock. (rla)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER SPECIFYING PROCEDURES by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: 1. Discovery Cut-Off: September 13, 2013; 2. Final Pretrial Conference: December 16, 2013 at 8:30 a.m.; 3. Bench Trial: January 7, 2014 at 9:00 a.m.: With this Scheduling Order Specifying Procedures, the Court orders the following concerning the dates and procedures in this case. Counsel are ordered to be completely familiar with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules of the Central District of California, and the FAQs about Judges' Procedures and Schedules posted by these Chambers on the Central District website at http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. If there is a first appearance by any party after the date of this Order, Plaintiff counsel shall give notice of this Order to that party. (See document for further details.) (rla)
August 6, 2012 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 weeks, filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation.. (Gitt, Cynthia)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford Granting Stipulation to Waive 90-Day Deadline Under Local Rule 23-3. Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification is no longer due on August 2, 2012. The scheduling of Plaintiffs class certification motion shall be set according to the briefing schedule confirmed by the Court at its Rule 26 scheduling conference. (db)
July 31, 2012 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification filed by Michael Burnham Michael Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Waive 90-Day Deadline Under Local Rule 23-3)(Desai, Aashish)
June 29, 2012 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation, identifying Ruan Logistics Corporation, Ruan Transportation Management Systems, INC., Ruan Financial Corporation. (Gitt, Cynthia)
June 27, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #5 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Certification of Interested Parties. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (rrp)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: EARLY MEETING OF PARTIES AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2012 at 09:00 a.m. before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (see document for details). (dro)
June 22, 2012 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) #1 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation.(Gitt, Cynthia)
June 14, 2012 Filing 4 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) #1 filed by Defendant Ruan Transportation.(Gitt, Cynthia)
May 2, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed.(lwag)
May 2, 2012 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Michael Burnham, Fernando Castillo, Neva Crawford, Ricky Crawford, Ted Day, John Gugler, Charles Howlett, Eduardo Jimenez, Bill McMahon, Jody Paulson, Robert Rojas, Todd Shook, Tony Skirrow, Dante Steward, Salvador Bucio Suarez and Daniel Ware. (lwag)
May 2, 2012 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendant Ruan Transportation. (lwag)
May 2, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Ruan Transportation and Does. Case assigned to Judge Andrew J. Guilford for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato.(Filing fee $ 350 Paid). Jury Demanded. Filed by Plaintiffs John Gugler, Robert Rojas, Ricky Crawford, Bill McMahon, Michael Burnham, Todd Shook, Charles Howlett, Salvador Bucio Suarez, Tony Skirrow, Dante Steward, Fernando Castillo, Ted Day, Eduardo Jimenez, Jody Paulson, Daniel Ware and Neva Crawford.(lwag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Burnham et al v. Ruan Logistics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Burnham
Represented By: Aashish Y Desai
Represented By: Maria Adrianne De Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Castillo
Represented By: Aashish Y Desai
Represented By: Maria Adrianne De Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neva Crawford
Represented By: Aashish Y Desai
Represented By: Maria Adrianne De Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Crawford
Represented By: Aashish Y Desai
Represented By: Maria Adrianne De Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Day
Represented By: Aashish Y Desai
Represented By: Maria Adrianne De Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gugler
Represented By: Aashish Y Desai
Represented By: Maria Adrianne De Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Howlett
Represented By: Aashish Y Desai
Represented By: Maria Adrianne De Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Jimenez
Represented By: Aashish Y Desai
Represented By: Maria Adrianne De Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill McMahon
Represented By: Aashish Y Desai
Represented By: Maria Adrianne De Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Paulson
Represented By: Aashish Y Desai
Represented By: Maria Adrianne De Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Rojas
Represented By: Aashish Y Desai
Represented By: Maria Adrianne De Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Shook
Represented By: Aashish Y Desai
Represented By: Maria Adrianne De Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Skirrow
Represented By: Aashish Y Desai
Represented By: Maria Adrianne De Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dante Steward
Represented By: Aashish Y Desai
Represented By: Maria Adrianne De Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Bucio Suarez
Represented By: Aashish Y Desai
Represented By: Maria Adrianne De Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ware
Represented By: Aashish Y Desai
Represented By: Maria Adrianne De Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruan Transportation
Represented By: Cynthia E Gitt
Represented By: Lawrence L Yang
Represented By: Ani Markarian Akopyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?