Lochner Technologies, LLC v. Apple Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Lochner Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Acer America Corporation, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., Asus Computer International, Casio America, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., NEC Corporation of America, Nokia Inc., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Research In Motion Corporation, Roku, Inc., Samsung Electrionics America, Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Unisys Corporation, VIZIO, Inc. and ViewSonic Corporation
Unknown: Eric Hugh Findlay, Kaiwen Tseng, Jennifer Parker Ainsworth, Donald E Tiller, Louis Brucculeri, Jessica Lea Hannah, E Danielle Thompson Williams, R Tyler Goodwyn, IV, Song K Jung, Renzo Nicola Rocchegiani, Bruce D. Kuyper, Michael Edwin Jones, Russell A Korn, David Jack Levy, Michael Charles Smith, Steven T Snyder, Steven L Park, Joe W Redden, Jr, Michael Ernest Richardson, Allan M. Soobert, Robert David Daniel, Shawn Alexander Latchford, Kirran Bari, Ya-Chiao Chang and Kristina Hendricks
Counter Claimant: Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., Casio America, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Research In Motion Corporation, Samsung Electrionics America, Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, VIZIO, Inc. and ViewSonic Corporation
Mediator: Hon. David Folsom
Counter Defendant: Lochner Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 8:2012cv01659
Filed: October 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Marc L. Goldman
Presiding Judge: Mariana R. Pfaelzer
Nature of Suit: Patent
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment for Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07 and General Order 08-05. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato to Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV12-01659 JVS (RNBx). (dro)
October 3, 2012 Filing 276 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Stanley H Thompson, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Lochner Technologies, LLC (Thompson, Stanley)
October 1, 2012 Filing 275 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed.(rrp)
October 1, 2012 Filing 274 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN. (Attachments: # 1 CV-18)(rrp)
October 1, 2012 Filing 273 ORIGINAL file, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Texas Eastern .
September 24, 2012 Filing 272 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Amazon.com, Inc. Of Compliance To Paragraph 1 of the Discovery Order (Capoccia, Rachel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 24, 2012 Filing 271 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Toshiba America Information Systems Inc re: Initial Disclosures (Pickett, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 21, 2012 Filing 270 NOTICE by Samsung Electrionics America, Inc. of Compliance Pursuant to the Agreed Discovery Order (Haskett, Christine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER granting 266 Motion to Change Venue. This case is hereby transferred to the Central District of California, Southern Division. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/21/2012. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 21, 2012 Filing 268 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lochner Technologies, LLC NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCLOSURES (Ung, Fredricka) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 21, 2012 Filing 267 NOTICE by Apple Inc. OF COMPLIANCE PURSUANT TO PARAGRAPH 1 OF THE DISCOVERY ORDER (Brucculeri, Louis) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 20, 2012 Filing 266 Joint MOTION to Change Venue UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) by ASUS Computer International, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., HTC America, Inc., Lochner Technologies, LLC, Samsung Electrionics America, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Vizio, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brucculeri, Louis) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting 264 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Google Inc., Lochner Technologies, LLC.. All claims and counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice all attorneys fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/18/12. (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 17, 2012 Filing 264 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Google Inc., Lochner Technologies, LLC, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 14, 2012 Filing 263 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE AND STAY ALL FUTURE DEADLINES FOR THIRTY DAYS by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ung, Fredricka) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 14, 2012 Filing 262 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND CERTAIN CASE DEADLINES FOR THIRTY DAYS by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ung, Fredricka) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER, denying 258 JOINT MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A NOTICE OF MEDIATOR filed by Lochner Technologies, LLC. Hon. David Folsom added as mediator. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/4/12. (mrm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER granting 257 Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Comply with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 as to Defendant Panasonic Corporation of North America. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/4/12. (mrm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER granting 256 Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Comply with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 as to Defendant Casio America, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/4/12. (mrm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
August 31, 2012 Filing 258 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File JOINT MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A NOTICE OF MEDIATOR by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ung, Fredricka) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
August 31, 2012 Filing 257 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File PLAINTIFF LOCHNER TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH P.R. 3-1 AND 3-2 AS TO DEFENDANT PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ung, Fredricka) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
August 31, 2012 Filing 256 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File PLAINTIFF LOCHNER TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME for PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH P.R. 3-1 AND 3-2 AS TO DEFENDANT CASIO AMERICA, INC by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ung, Fredricka) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
August 31, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 255 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
August 31, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 254 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
August 31, 2012 Filing 255 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File PLAINTIFF LOCHNER TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH P.R. 3-1 AND 3-2 AS TO DEFENDANT CASIO AMERICA, INC. by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order GRANTING PLAINTIFF LOCHNER TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME for PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH P.R. 3-1 AND 3-2 AS TO DEFENDANT CASIO AMERICA, INC.)(Fenster, Marc) Modified on 8/31/2012 (ch, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
August 30, 2012 Filing 254 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File PLAINTIFF LOCHNER TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH P.R. 3-1 AND 3-2 AS TO DEFENDANT PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH P.R. 3-1 AND 3-2 AS TO DEFENDANT PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA)(Ung, Fredricka) Modified on 8/31/2012 (ch, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER granting 252 Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims and counterclaims between plaintiff and ViewSonic Corporation are dismissed WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys fee. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/29/2012. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
August 24, 2012 Filing 252 STIPULATION of Dismissal STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT VIEWSONIC CORPORATION WITH PREJUDICE by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Fenster, Marc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2012: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
August 23, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. BY CLERK - WRONG CASE Document # 251, DISCOVERY ORDER. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ***FILED IN ERROR BY CLERK. WRONG CASE. PLEASE IGNORE.***DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/23/2012. (ch, ) Modified on 8/23/2012 (ch, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting 249 Motion to Dismiss. All claims for relief asserted by Lochner against LG Electronics USA Inc are dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all attorneys fees, costs of court and expenses shall be bourne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/23/2012. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
August 21, 2012 Filing 249 Joint MOTION to Dismiss JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. WITH PREJUDICE by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order of DISMISSAL of Defendant LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. with Prejudice)(Fenster, Marc) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
August 17, 2012 Filing 248 Submission of Proposed Agreed Protective order by Lochner Technologies, LLC AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Ung, Fredricka) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
August 16, 2012 Filing 247 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Susan K Knoll on behalf of Apple Inc. (Knoll, Susan) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER granting 245 Motion for Extension of Time to File Agreed Protective Order. Deadline for the parties to submit an agreed Protective Order (or their competing versions) is extended up to and including Friday, August 17, 2012.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/14/12. (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
August 13, 2012 Filing 245 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER (2nd Unopposed Motion) by ASUS Computer International, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., Casio America, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., NEC Corporation of America, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Research In Motion Corporation, Samsung Electrionics America, Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, ViewSonic Corporation, Vizio, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brucculeri, Louis) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER granting 243 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Donald E Tiller; John Russell Emerson and Phillip Brett Philbin terminated as counsel for Google Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/6/12. (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
August 1, 2012 Filing 243 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tiller, Donald) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER granting 237 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Bruce D. Kuyper terminated as counsel for Lochner Technologies LLC. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/31/12. (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting 240 Motion for Extension of Time to File Agreed Protective Order. The deadline for the parties to submit an agreed Protective Order (or their competing versions) is extended up to and including Monday, August 13, 2012. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/31/12. (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
July 30, 2012 Filing 240 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File AN AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER by ASUS Computer International, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., Casio America, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Research In Motion Corporation, Samsung Electrionics America, Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, ViewSonic Corporation, Vizio, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brucculeri, Louis) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
July 30, 2012 Filing 239 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by ASUS Computer International, Amazon.com, Inc., Casio America, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Lochner Technologies, LLC, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Research In Motion Corporation, Samsung Electrionics America, Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Unisys Corporation, ViewSonic Corporation, Vizio, Inc.. (Ung, Fredricka) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
July 30, 2012 Filing 238 Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by ASUS Computer International, Amazon.com, Inc., Casio America, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Lochner Technologies, LLC, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Research In Motion Corporation, Samsung Electrionics America, Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Unisys Corporation, ViewSonic Corporation, Vizio, Inc.. (Ung, Fredricka) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
July 27, 2012 Filing 237 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Bruce D. Kuyper by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kuyper, Bruce) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 236 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica Lea Hannah on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hannah, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 235 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica Lea Hannah on behalf of Google Inc. (Hannah, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting 233 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Jennifer Parker Ainsworth for Motorola Mobility, Inc. Attorneys Allen Franklin Gardner and Michael E. Jones terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on July 23, 2012. (ldh, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
July 18, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 232, Motion to Substititute Party. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 233 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 232 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) Modified on 7/18/2012 (ch, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER - to submit agreed Proposed Docket Control Order, Proposed Discovery Order, and Proposed Protective Order within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. The Docket Control Order shall reflect a jury selection date of November 4, 2013, a pretrial hearing date of October 21, 2013, and a Markman hearing date of March 27, 2013. The parties are directed to the Courts Web site for a sample of each. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/16/2012. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
July 13, 2012 Filing 230 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by E Danielle Thompson Williams on behalf of Google Inc. (Williams, E Danielle) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
July 13, 2012 Filing 229 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by E Danielle Thompson Williams on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Williams, E Danielle) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
June 29, 2012 Filing 228 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 220 Opposed MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SCHEDULING ORDER IN RELATED CASES re 218 Notice (Other) PLAINTIFF LOCHNER TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS SUR-REPLY TO REPLY TO RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SCHEDULING ORDER IN RELATED CASES filed by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Ung, Fredricka) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
June 21, 2012 Filing 227 REPLY to Response to Motion re 220 Opposed MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SCHEDULING ORDER IN RELATED CASES re 218 Notice (Other) filed by ASUS Computer International, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., Casio America, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Samsung Electrionics America, Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, ViewSonic Corporation, Vizio, Inc.. (Brucculeri, Louis) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
June 11, 2012 Filing 226 RESPONSE in Opposition re 220 Opposed MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SCHEDULING ORDER IN RELATED CASES re 218 Notice (Other) filed by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kuyper, Bruce) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER granting 224 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kirran Bari terminated as counsel of record for Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/24/12. (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
May 23, 2012 Filing 224 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kirran Bari by Samsung Electrionics America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haskett, Christine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
May 23, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 221, Notice of Withdrawal of attorney. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
May 23, 2012 Filing 223 NOTICE by Research In Motion Corporation Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Redden, Joe) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
May 23, 2012 Filing 222 NOTICE by Research In Motion Corporation Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Richardson, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
May 23, 2012 Filing 221 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Samsung Electrionics America, Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Kirran Bari) (Haskett, Christine) Modified on 5/23/2012 (ch, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
May 23, 2012 Filing 220 Opposed MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SCHEDULING ORDER IN RELATED CASES re 218 Notice (Other) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit)(Brucculeri, Louis) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER re 217 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Lochner Technologies, LLC as to deft Acer America Corporation. All claims asserted by Lochner against Acer in this action are dismissed with prejudice. Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys fee. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/10/12. (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
May 1, 2012 Filing 218 NOTICE by Lochner Technologies, LLC of Readiness for Status Conference (Davis, William) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
April 26, 2012 Filing 217 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lochner Technologies, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kuyper, Bruce) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER - granting 214 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. All claims asserted by Lochner against Research In Motion in this action are dismissed with prejudice and all counterclaims asserted by RIM against Lochner in this action are dismissed without prejudice. Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/25/2012. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
April 25, 2012 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Acer America Corporation to 5/14/2012. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting 210 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Acer America Corporation deadline is 5/14/2012. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/25/2012. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
April 24, 2012 Filing 214 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lochner Technologies, LLC, Research In Motion Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kuyper, Bruce) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
April 24, 2012 Filing 213 NOTICE by NEC Corporation of America (Request for Termination of Electronic Notices) (Levy, David) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
April 23, 2012 Filing 212 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin Jack Setnick on behalf of Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. (Setnick, Benjamin) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
April 10, 2012 Filing 211 NOTICE by Toshiba America Information Systems Inc - Notice of Change of Firm Name and E-Mail Address (Pickett, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
March 28, 2012 Filing 210 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Acer America Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MISC 12-1 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap for all further proceedings. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on March 16, 2012. (rml, ) (rml, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
March 16, 2012 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Acer America Corporation to 3/29/2012. (mrm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting 207 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Acer America Corporation is given to and including March 29, 2012 to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/16/12. (mrm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
March 12, 2012 Filing 207 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Acer America Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
March 11, 2012 Filing 206 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sony Mobile Communications AB for Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc.. (McDowell, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER pursuant to pltf's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of defendant NEC Corporation of America, all claims asserted by Lochner against NEC in this action are dismissed with prejudice. Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/9/12. (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
March 8, 2012 Filing 204 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lochner Technologies, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kuyper, Bruce) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 203 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Samsung Electrionics America, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 202 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Acer America Corporation to 3/15/2012. (mrm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting 200 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendant Acer America Corporation is given to and including March 15, 2012 to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/29/12. (mrm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
February 28, 2012 Filing 200 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Acer America Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER, granting 197 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. Cisco Systems, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/23/12. (mrm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
February 23, 2012 Filing 198 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Orville R Cockings for Sony Electronics Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-7326) (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
February 22, 2012 Filing 197 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yuan, Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting 193 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Cisco Systems, Inc. shall have up to and including February 29, 2012, to answer or otherwise respond to Lochner Technologies, LLC 's Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/16/12. (mrm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting 192 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Acer America Corporation is given to and including March 1, 2012, to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/16/12. (mrm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
February 16, 2012 Filing 194 Plaintiff Lochner Technologies, LLC's ANSWER to 179 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. by Lochner Technologies, LLC.(Kuyper, Bruce) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
February 15, 2012 Filing 193 Fifth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yuan, Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
February 15, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 191, Dft Unopposed Application for Extension of Time. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
February 15, 2012 Filing 192 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Acer America Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
February 15, 2012 Filing 191 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Defendant's Unopposed Fifth Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cisco Systems, Inc..( Yuan, Wesley) Modified on 2/15/2012 (ch, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
February 14, 2012 Filing 190 NOTICE of Change of Address by Deron R Dacus (Dacus, Deron) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
February 13, 2012 Answer Due Deadline Updated for NEC Corporation of America to 3/14/2012. (mrm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting 187 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; NEC has until and through March 14, 2012, to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/13/12. (mrm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
February 10, 2012 Filing 188 RESPONSE to 173 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim LOCHNER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.S ANSWER TO VIEWSONIC CORPORATIONS COUNTERCLAIMS by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Kuyper, Bruce) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
February 9, 2012 Filing 187 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, David) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting 185 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Lochner Technologies, LLC., Roku, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/1/12. (mrm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 31, 2012 Filing 185 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lochner Technologies, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kuyper, Bruce) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 30, 2012 Filing 184 Plaintiff Lochner Technologies, LLC's ANSWER to 165 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Sony Ericsson by Lochner Technologies, LLC.(Kuyper, Bruce) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting 182 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Cisco Systems Inc deadline is extended to 2/15/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/24/2012. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 23, 2012 Filing 182 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer DEFENDANT CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.S FOURTH UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE TO FILE ITS RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yuan, Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting 178 Motion to Substitute Party. Toshiba America, Inc. terminated and substituted entity Toshiba American Information Systems Inc. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/23/11. (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 23, 2012 Filing 180 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Toshiba America Information Systems Inc identifying Corporate Parent Toshiba Corporation for Toshiba America Information Systems Inc. (Pickett, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 23, 2012 Filing 179 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Lochner Technologies, LLC by Toshiba America Information Systems Inc.(Pickett, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 20, 2012 Filing 178 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party Joint Motion to Dismiss Toshiba America, Inc. and Substitute the Correct Toshiba Entity by Lochner Technologies, LLC, Toshiba America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kuyper, Bruce) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting 176 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Nokia with prejudice. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/19/2012. (sm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 18, 2012 Filing 176 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Nokia Inc. by Lochner Technologies, LLC, Nokia Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kuyper, Bruce) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 18, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed Fifth Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Toshiba America, Inc. to 1/23/2012. 5 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 18, 2012 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 17, 2012 Filing 175 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ViewSonic Corporation (Adamo, Kenneth) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 17, 2012 Filing 174 Defendant's Unopposed Fifth Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Toshiba America, Inc..( Pickett, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 17, 2012 Filing 173 ANSWER to 1 Complaint Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Lochner Technologies, LLC by ViewSonic Corporation.(Adamo, Kenneth) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 17, 2012 Answer Due Deadline Updated for NEC Corporation of America to 2/13/2012. (mrm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting 170 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendant NEC has until and through February 13, 2012, to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/17/12. (mrm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 17, 2012 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. to 1/6/2012. (mrm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting 141 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint until and including January 6, 2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/17/12. (mrm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 13, 2012 Filing 170 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, David) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 11, 2012 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Acer America Corporation to 2/16/2012. (mrm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting 168 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Acer America Corporation be given to and including February 16, 2012 to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/11/12. (mrm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 10, 2012 Filing 168 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Acer America Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 9, 2012 Filing 167 RESPONSE to 131 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim LOCHNER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.S ANSWER TO RESEARCH IN MOTION CORPORATIONS COUNTERCLAIMS by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Ung, Fredricka) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 6, 2012 Filing 166 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB for Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc.. (McDowell, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 6, 2012 Filing 165 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Lochner Technologies, LLC by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc..(McDowell, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 6, 2012 Filing 164 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony Electronics Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sony Corporation for Sony Electronics Inc.. (Dacus, Deron) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 6, 2012 Filing 163 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Sony Electronics Inc..(Dacus, Deron) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 6, 2012 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Cisco Systems, Inc. to 1/25/2012. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting 160 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Cisco Systems Inc deadline is 1/25/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/6/2012. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 6, 2012 Filing 161 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Kenneth Plimack on behalf of Samsung Electrionics America, Inc. (Plimack, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 4, 2012 Filing 160 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint DEFENDANT CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.'S THIRD UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE TO FILE ITS RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yuan, Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 4, 2012 The previous case assigned to Judge Davis is hereby reassigned to Judge Folsom per Local Rule CV 63-B (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Rodney Gilstrap recused. Case reassigned to Judge Leonard Davis for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/3/2012. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
January 3, 2012 Filing 158 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 100 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF LOCHNER TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS SUR-REPLY TO REPLY TO RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT filed by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Ung, Fredricka) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 30, 2011 Filing 157 RESPONSE to 118 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim LOCHNER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.S ANSWER TO GOOGLE INC.S COUNTERCLAIM by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Ung, Fredricka) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 27, 2011 Filing 156 RESPONSE to 107 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim LOCHNER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.S ANSWER TO AMAZON.COM, INC.S COUNTERCLAIMS by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Ung, Fredricka) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 27, 2011 Filing 155 RESPONSE to 109 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim LOCHNER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.S ANSWER TO PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICAS COUNTERCLAIMS by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Ung, Fredricka) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 27, 2011 Filing 154 RESPONSE to 101 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim LOCHNER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.S ANSWER TO VIZIO, INC.S COUNTERCLAIMS by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Ung, Fredricka) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 27, 2011 Filing 153 RESPONSE to 111 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim LOCHNER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.S ANSWER TO HTC AMERICA, INC.S COUNTERCLAIMS by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Ung, Fredricka) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 27, 2011 Filing 152 RESPONSE to 103 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim LOCHNER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.S ANSWER TO MOTOROLA MOBILITY, INC.S COUNTERCLAIMS by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Ung, Fredricka) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 27, 2011 Filing 151 RESPONSE to 105 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim LOCHNER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.S ANSWER TO APPLE, INC.S COUNTERCLAIMS by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Ung, Fredricka) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 27, 2011 Filing 150 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LG Electronics Inc. for LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Ainsworth, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 22, 2011 Filing 149 REPLY to Response to Motion re 100 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Ainsworth, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 21, 2011 Filing 148 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven D Moore on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Moore, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 20, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Cisco Systems, Inc. to 1/5/2012. 20 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 20, 2011 Filing 147 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cisco Systems, Inc..( Yuan, Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 20, 2011 Filing 146 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Avraham Schwartz on behalf of Vizio, Inc. (Schwartz, Avraham) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 20, 2011 Filing 145 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Christian Koole on behalf of Vizio, Inc. (Koole, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 20, 2011 Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap re: misc order 11-2. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to the case. (rvw, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 19, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Roku, Inc. to 2/6/2012. 40 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 19, 2011 Filing 144 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Roku, Inc..( Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 15, 2011 Filing 143 NOTICE of Change of Address by Adrian Mary Pruetz (Pruetz, Adrian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 15, 2011 Filing 142 NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles Christian Koole (Koole, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 15, 2011 Filing 141 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (second) by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McDowell, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 15, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 140, Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 15, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Acer America Corporation to 1/16/2012; ViewSonic Corporation to 1/16/2012. (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ***FILED IN ERROR PLEASE IGNORE***ORDER granting 136 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. DIRECTV shall have through January 6, 2012 to answer. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/15/11. (ehs, ) Modified on 12/15/2011 (ehs, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting 134 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Acer America answer extended to January 16, 2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/15/11. (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting 133 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ViewSonic Corporations deadline to answer extended to January 16, 2012.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/15/11. (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 15, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for NEC Corporation of America to 1/13/2012. (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting 130 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant NEC has until and through January 13, 2012, to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/15/11. (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 15, 2011 Filing 136 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Sony Electronics Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 15, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Fourth Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Toshiba America, Inc. to 1/16/2012. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 14, 2011 Filing 135 Defendant's Unopposed Fourth Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Toshiba America, Inc..( Pickett, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 14, 2011 Filing 134 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Acer America Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 14, 2011 Filing 133 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint (Second Agreed Motion) by ViewSonic Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adamo, Kenneth) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 14, 2011 Filing 132 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Research In Motion Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Research In Motion Limited for Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Corporation. (Park, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 14, 2011 Filing 131 ANSWER to 1 Complaint Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Lochner Technologies, LLC by Research In Motion Corporation.(Park, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 13, 2011 Filing 130 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, David) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 12, 2011 Filing 129 RESPONSE in Opposition re 100 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF LOCHNER TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT filed by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Fredricka Ung, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ung, Fredricka) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 12, 2011 Filing 128 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Song K Jung on behalf of LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Jung, Song) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 12, 2011 Filing 127 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Renzo Nicola Rocchegiani on behalf of LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Rocchegiani, Renzo) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 12, 2011 Filing 126 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by R Tyler Goodwyn, IV on behalf of LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Goodwyn, R) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 12, 2011 Filing 125 RESPONSE to 96 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim LOCHNER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.S ANSWER TO SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.S COUNTERCLAIM by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Ung, Fredricka) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting 119 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Dfts Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/12/2011. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 12, 2011 Filing 123 RESPONSE to 88 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim LOCHNER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.S ANSWER TO CASIO AMERICA, INC.S COUNTERCLAIM by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Ung, Fredricka) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 7, 2011 Filing 122 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google Inc. (Emerson, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 6, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Sony Electronics Inc. to 12/15/2011. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting 115 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Sony Electronics, Inc's deadline is 12/15/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/6/2011. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 6, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Nokia Inc. to 12/14/2011. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting 114 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Nokia Inc.s deadline is 12/14/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/6/2011. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 5, 2011 Filing 119 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ung, Fredricka) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 5, 2011 Filing 118 GOOGLE'S ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Lochner Technologies, LLC by Google Inc..(Emerson, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 2, 2011 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 117 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 2, 2011 Filing 117 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE REFILE.***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 100 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF LOCHNER TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ung, Fredricka) Modified on 12/2/2011 (ch, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 2, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Toshiba America, Inc. to 12/15/2011. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
December 1, 2011 Filing 116 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Toshiba America, Inc..( Pickett, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 115 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Sony Electronics Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 114 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Nokia Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 113 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Charles Smith on behalf of Nokia Inc. (Smith, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 112 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HTC America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent HTC Corporation for HTC America, Inc.. (McBrayer, Ryan) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 111 HTC America, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Lochner Technologies, LLC by HTC America, Inc..(McBrayer, Ryan) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 110 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America identifying Corporate Parent Panasonic Corporation for Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Capoccia, Rachel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 109 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Lochner Technologies, LLC by Panasonic Corporation of North America.(Capoccia, Rachel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 108 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amazon.com, Inc. (Eskandari-Azari, Mitra) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 107 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Lochner Technologies, LLC by Amazon.com, Inc..(Eskandari-Azari, Mitra) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 106 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc. (Brucculeri, Louis) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 105 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM Defendant Apple Inc.'s Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Plaintiff Lochner Technologies, LLC's Complaint against Lochner Technologies, LLC by Apple Inc..(Brucculeri, Louis) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 104 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Korn, Russell) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 103 ANSWER to 1 Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Lochner Technologies, LLC by Motorola Mobility, Inc..(Korn, Russell) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 29, 2011 Filing 102 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Vizio, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd. for Vizio, Inc., Vizio, Inc.. (Pruetz, Adrian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 29, 2011 Filing 101 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Lochner Technologies, LLC by Vizio, Inc..(Pruetz, Adrian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 18, 2011 Filing 100 MOTION to Dismiss by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 17, 2011 Filing 99 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kristina Hendricks for ViewSonic Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-818 (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 17, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for ViewSonic Corporation to 12/16/2011. (bga, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting 74 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ViewSonic Corporations deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended from November 16, 2011 until and including December 16, 2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/17/2011. (bga, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 17, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. to 12/16/2011. (bga, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 84 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court extends the date for Defendant Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint until and including December 16, 2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/17/2011. (bga, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 16, 2011 Filing 96 ANSWER to 1 Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Lochner Technologies, LLC by Samsung Electrionics America, Inc..(Haskett, Christine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 16, 2011 Filing 95 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electrionics America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. for Samsung Electrionics America, Inc.. (Haskett, Christine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 16, 2011 Filing 94 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christine Saunders Haskett on behalf of Samsung Electrionics America, Inc. (Haskett, Christine) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 16, 2011 Filing 93 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kirran Bari on behalf of Samsung Electrionics America, Inc. (Bari, Kirran) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 16, 2011 Filing 92 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ASUS Computer International identifying Corporate Parent ASUSTeK Computer, Inc. for ASUS Computer International. (Boyd, Karen) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 16, 2011 Filing 91 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by ASUS Computer International.(Boyd, Karen) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 16, 2011 Filing 90 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karen I Boyd on behalf of ASUS Computer International (Boyd, Karen) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 16, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Sony Electronics Inc. to 12/1/2011. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 16, 2011 Filing 89 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Casio America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Casio Computer, Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent Casio Holdings, Inc. for Casio America, Inc., Casio America, Inc.. (Hardy, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 16, 2011 Filing 88 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Lochner Technologies, LLC by Casio America, Inc..(Hardy, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 16, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Toshiba America, Inc. to 12/1/2011. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 16, 2011 Filing 87 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sony Electronics Inc..( Dacus, Deron) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 16, 2011 Filing 86 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kaiwen Tseng on behalf of Acer America Corporation (Tseng, Kaiwen) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 15, 2011 Filing 85 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Toshiba America, Inc..( Pickett, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 15, 2011 Filing 84 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDowell, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 15, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Nokia Inc. to 11/30/2011. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 15, 2011 Filing 83 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nokia Inc..( Altersohn, Allison) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 15, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Vizio, Inc. to 11/30/2011. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 15, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google Inc. to 12/5/2011. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 15, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Cisco Systems, Inc. to 12/21/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 15, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Acer America Corporation to 12/16/2011. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting 67 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Acer America Corporations deadline is extended to 12/16/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/14/2011. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 15, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Research In Motion Corporation to 12/14/2011. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 65 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Research In Motion Corporation deadline is 12/14/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/14/2011. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 15, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for NEC Corporation of America to 12/14/2011. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 63 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant NEC Corporation of America deadline is 12/14/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/14/2011. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 14, 2011 Filing 79 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re VIZIO, Inc. (Pruetz, Adrian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 14, 2011 Filing 78 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google Inc..( Emerson, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 14, 2011 Filing 77 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cisco Systems, Inc..( Yuan, Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 14, 2011 Filing 76 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wesley W Yuan on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Yuan, Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 14, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for HTC America, Inc. to 11/30/2011. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 14, 2011 Filing 75 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re HTC America, Inc..( McBrayer, Ryan) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 14, 2011 Filing 74 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by ViewSonic Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adamo, Kenneth) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 14, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Panasonic Corporation of North America to 11/30/2011. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 14, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Amazon.com, Inc. to 11/30/2011. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 11, 2011 Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert F Perry on behalf of Nokia Inc. (Perry, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 11, 2011 Filing 72 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allison H Altersohn on behalf of Nokia Inc. (Altersohn, Allison) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 10, 2011 Filing 71 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Panasonic Corporation of North America.( Azari, Mitra) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 10, 2011 Filing 70 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amazon.com, Inc..( Azari, Mitra) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 10, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Motorola Mobility, Inc. to 11/30/2011. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 10, 2011 Filing 69 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Motorola Mobility, Inc..( Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 10, 2011 Filing 68 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allan M. Soobert on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation (Soobert, Allan) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 10, 2011 Filing 67 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Acer America Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 10, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 11/30/2011. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 9, 2011 Filing 66 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc..( Brucculeri, Louis) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 9, 2011 Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Research In Motion Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 8, 2011 Filing 64 NOTICE by Lochner Technologies, LLC of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Unisys Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kuyper, Bruce) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 8, 2011 Filing 63 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, David) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 3, 2011 Filing 62 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Louis A Karasik on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc., Panasonic Corporation of North America (Karasik, Louis) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 3, 2011 Filing 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mitra Melissa Eskandari-Azari on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc., Panasonic Corporation of North America (Eskandari-Azari, Mitra) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
November 1, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid by Dori Hines; Fee: $100, receipt number: 5-129 (rml, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 31, 2011 Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Phillip Brett Philbin on behalf of Google Inc. (Philbin, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 31, 2011 Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven L Park on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation (Park, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 28, 2011 Filing 58 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Russell Emerson on behalf of Google Inc. (Emerson, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 28, 2011 Filing 57 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Acer America Corporation (Craft, Roger) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 28, 2011 Filing 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn Alexander Latchford on behalf of Roku, Inc. (Latchford, Shawn) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 27, 2011 Filing 54 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lochner Technologies, LLC. Toshiba America, Inc. served on 9/26/2011, answer due 11/17/2011. (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 27, 2011 Filing 53 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lochner Technologies, LLC. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. served on 9/27/2011, answer due 11/18/2011. (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 26, 2011 Filing 55 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Roku, Inc. waiver sent on 10/25/2011, answer due 12/27/2011. (sm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 25, 2011 Filing 52 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Doris Johnson Hines for Toshiba America, Inc. (fee paid). (rml, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 21, 2011 Filing 51 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David C Lee for Casio America, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-764) (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 21, 2011 Filing 50 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott David Stimpson for Casio America, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-764) (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 21, 2011 Filing 49 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Katherine M Lieb for Casio America, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-764)(ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 20, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Toshiba America, Inc. to 11/17/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 20, 2011 Filing 48 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Toshiba America, Inc..( Pickett, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 20, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Amazon.com, Inc. to 11/16/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 19, 2011 Filing 47 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amazon.com, Inc..( Capoccia, Rachel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 19, 2011 Filing 46 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gregory S Gewirtz for Sony Electronics Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-5481) (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 19, 2011 Filing 45 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert B Hander for Sony Electronics Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-5481)(ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 19, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Samsung Electrionics America, Inc. to 11/16/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 18, 2011 Filing 44 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Samsung Electrionics America, Inc.(Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 18, 2011 Filing 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Thomas Haslam, III on behalf of Samsung Electrionics America, Inc. (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 18, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ASUS Computer International to 11/16/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 18, 2011 Filing 42 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ASUS Computer International.(Masur, Joshua) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 18, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. to 11/18/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 18, 2011 Filing 41 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc..( Ainsworth, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 18, 2011 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Parker Ainsworth on behalf of Google Inc. (Ainsworth, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 18, 2011 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ya-Chiao Chang on behalf of ViewSonic Corporation (Chang, Ya-Chiao) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 17, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Sony Electronics Inc. to 11/17/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 17, 2011 Filing 38 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sony Electronics Inc..( Dacus, Deron) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 17, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Nokia Inc. to 11/16/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 17, 2011 Filing 37 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nokia Inc..( Snyder, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 17, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Unisys Corporation to 11/16/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 14, 2011 Filing 36 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Unisys Corporation.( Ainsworth, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 14, 2011 Filing 35 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert W Busby for NEC Corporation of America. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-5396) (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 14, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ViewSonic Corporation to 11/16/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 14, 2011 Filing 34 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ViewSonic Corporation.( Adamo, Kenneth) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 14, 2011 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth Robert Adamo on behalf of ViewSonic Corporation (Adamo, Kenneth) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 13, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Panasonic Corporation of North America to 11/16/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 13, 2011 Filing 32 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Panasonic Corporation of North America.( Capoccia, Rachel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 12, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 11/16/2011; Casio America, Inc. to 11/16/2011; Acer America Corporation to 11/16/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 12, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Vizio, Inc. to 11/16/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 12, 2011 Filing 31 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Casio America, Inc..(Hardy, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 12, 2011 Filing 30 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc..( Brucculeri, Louis) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 12, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Alan Rutherford on behalf of Apple Inc. (Rutherford, Keith) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 12, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Louis Brucculeri on behalf of Apple Inc. (Brucculeri, Louis) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 12, 2011 Filing 27 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Acer America Corporation.(Findlay, Eric) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 11, 2011 Filing 26 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re VIZIO, Inc..( Pruetz, Adrian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 11, 2011 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adrian Mary Pruetz on behalf of Vizio, Inc. (Pruetz, Adrian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 11, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for NEC Corporation of America to 11/14/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 11, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Motorola Mobility, Inc. to 11/16/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 11, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. to 11/16/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 11, 2011 Filing 24 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re NEC Corporation of America.(Levy, David) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 10, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Roku, Inc. (Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 10, 2011 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Gardner, Allen) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 10, 2011 Filing 21 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Motorola Mobility, Inc..( Jones, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 10, 2011 Filing 20 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc.(McDowell, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 7, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Research In Motion Corporation to 11/14/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 7, 2011 Filing 19 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Research In Motion Corporation.( Richardson, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 7, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for HTC America, Inc. to 11/16/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 6, 2011 Filing 18 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Fredricka Ung for Lochner Technologies, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID R-6-5279) (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 6, 2011 Filing 17 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re HTC America, Inc..( Selinger, Jerry) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MISC 11-1 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Judge T. John Ward no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/3/2011. (poa, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 4, 2011 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lochner Technologies, LLC. Cisco Systems, Inc. waiver sent on 9/20/2011, answer due 11/21/2011. (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 3, 2011 Filing 16 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lochner Technologies, LLC. Acer America Corporation served on 9/26/2011, answer due 10/17/2011; Amazon.com, Inc. served on 9/26/2011, answer due 10/17/2011; HTC America, Inc. served on 9/26/2011, answer due 10/17/2011; Samsung Electrionics America, Inc. served on 9/26/2011, answer due 10/17/2011; Sony Electronics Inc. served on 9/26/2011, answer due 10/17/2011; Unisys Corporation served on 9/26/2011, answer due 10/17/2011. Defts served by CM RRR through Registered Agents (Attachments: # 1 Amazon.com, # 2 Sony Electronics, # 3 Unisys Corp, # 4 Acer Am Corp, # 5 Samsung Electronics Am)(ehs, ) Modified on 10/6/2011 (ehs, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 3, 2011 Filing 15 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lochner Technologies, LLC. ASUS Computer International served on 9/26/2011, answer due 10/17/2011; Apple Inc. served on 9/26/2011, answer due 10/17/2011; Motorola Mobility, Inc. served on 9/26/2011, answer due 10/17/2011; Nokia Inc. served on 9/26/2011, answer due 10/17/2011; Panasonic Corporation of North America served on 9/26/2011, answer due 10/17/2011; Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. served on 9/26/2011, answer due 10/17/2011; ViewSonic Corporation served on 9/26/2011, answer due 10/17/2011; Vizio, Inc. served on 9/26/2011, answer due 10/17/2011.Defts served by CM RRR through Registered Agents (Attachments: # 1 ViewSonic, # 2 Apple, # 3 Sony Ericsson Mobile Comm, # 4 Nokia, # 5 Panasonic Corp of N. Am, # 6 ASUS Computer International, # 7 Vizio)(ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
October 3, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Google Inc. to 11/21/2011; NEC Corporation of America to 10/14/2011; Research In Motion Corporation to 10/14/2011. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 30, 2011 Filing 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lochner Technologies, LLC. NEC Corporation of America served on 9/23/2011, answer due 10/14/2011; Research In Motion Corporation served on 9/23/2011, answer due 10/14/2011. Defts served by CM RRR through Registered Agents (Attachments: # 1 NEC Corp of America)(ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 21, 2011 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lochner Technologies, LLC. Google Inc. waiver sent on 9/20/2011 received by Jennifer P Ainworth counsel for Google, answer due 11/21/2011. (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 14, 2011 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert David Daniel on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation (Daniel, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 12, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joe W Redden, Jr on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation (Redden, Joe) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 12, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Ernest Richardson on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation (Richardson, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 9, 2011 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 9, 2011 Judge T. John Ward added. (ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 9, 2011 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of Lochner Technologies, LLC (Fenster, Marc) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 9, 2011 Filing 6 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 9, 2011 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lochner Technologies, LLC (Davis, William) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 9, 2011 Filing 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Panasonic Corporation of North America, Research In Motion Corporation, Roku, Inc., Samsung Electrionics America, Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Toshiba America, Inc., Unisys Corporation, ViewSonic Corporation, Vizio, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Panasonic Corp, # 2 Research In Motion, # 3 Roku Inc, # 4 Samsung Electronics Am, # 5 Sony Electronic, # 6 Sony Ericsson Mobile, # 7 Toshiba America, # 8 Unisys Corp, # 9 ViewSonic Corp, # 10 Vizio Inc)(ehs, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 9, 2011 Filing 3 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS ISSUED by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Apple, # 2 Cisco System Inc, # 3 Google, # 4 HTC America Inc, # 5 LG Electronics USA Inc, # 6 Motorola Mobility Inc, # 7 ASUS Computer Intern'l, # 8 Amazon, # 9 Casio America, # 10 NEC Corp of Am, # 11 Nokia)(ehs, ) Modified on 10/3/2011 (ch, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 9, 2011 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Ellsworth Davis, III on behalf of Lochner Technologies, LLC (Davis, William) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]
September 8, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3215132.), filed by Lochner Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kuyper, Bruce) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/1/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lochner Technologies, LLC v. Apple Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer America Corporation
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Mitra Eskandari Azari
Represented By: Louis Brucculeri
Represented By: Rachel M Capoccia
Represented By: Mitra Melissa Eskandari-Azari
Represented By: Louis A Karasik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Louis Brucculeri
Represented By: Susan K Knoll
Represented By: Keith Alan Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asus Computer International
Represented By: Karen I Boyd
Represented By: Louis Brucculeri
Represented By: Steven W Flanders
Represented By: Joshua M Masur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casio America, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Brucculeri
Represented By: Hardy & Atherton
Represented By: David C Lee
Represented By: Katherine M Lieb
Represented By: Scott David Stimpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Wesley W Yuan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: John Russell Emerson
Represented By: Phillip Brett Philbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Brucculeri
Represented By: Ryan J McBrayer
Represented By: Jerry Robin Selinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation of America
Represented By: Robert W Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia Inc.
Represented By: Allison H Altersohn
Represented By: Robert F Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America
Represented By: Mitra Eskandari Azari
Represented By: Louis Brucculeri
Represented By: Rachel M Capoccia
Represented By: Mitra Melissa Eskandari-Azari
Represented By: Louis A Karasik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research In Motion Corporation
Represented By: Louis Brucculeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roku, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electrionics America, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Brucculeri
Represented By: Christine Saunders Haskett
Represented By: Covington & Burling LLP - Redwood Shores
Represented By: Michael Kenneth Plimack
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Electronics Inc.
Represented By: Louis Brucculeri
Represented By: Orville R Cockings
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Gregory S Gewirtz
Represented By: Robert B Hander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc.
Represented By: John H McDowell, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin Jack Setnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems Inc
Represented By: Louis Brucculeri
Represented By: John Michael Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unisys Corporation
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIZIO, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Brucculeri
Represented By: Charles Christian Koole
Represented By: Adrian M Pruetz
Represented By: Avraham Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViewSonic Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth Robert Adamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Kaiwen Tseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Donald E Tiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Louis Brucculeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Jessica Lea Hannah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: E Danielle Thompson Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: R Tyler Goodwyn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Song K Jung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Renzo Nicola Rocchegiani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Bruce D. Kuyper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Michael Edwin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Russell A Korn
Represented By: Steven D Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: David Jack Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Michael Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Steven T Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Steven L Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Joe W Redden, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Michael Ernest Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Allan M. Soobert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Robert David Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Shawn Alexander Latchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Kirran Bari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Ya-Chiao Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Kristina Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Mitra Eskandari Azari
Represented By: Rachel M Capoccia
Represented By: Mitra Melissa Eskandari-Azari
Represented By: Louis A Karasik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Louis Brucculeri
Represented By: Keith Alan Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Casio America, Inc.
Represented By: Hardy & Atherton
Represented By: Katherine M Lieb
Represented By: Scott David Stimpson
Represented By: David C Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Google Inc.
Represented By: John Russell Emerson
Represented By: Phillip Brett Philbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: HTC America, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan J McBrayer
Represented By: Jerry Robin Selinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Represented By: Russell A Korn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Panasonic Corporation of North America
Represented By: Mitra Eskandari Azari
Represented By: Rachel M Capoccia
Represented By: Mitra Melissa Eskandari-Azari
Represented By: Louis A Karasik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Research In Motion Corporation
Represented By: Robert David Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Samsung Electrionics America, Inc.
Represented By: Christine Saunders Haskett
Represented By: Covington & Burling LLP - Redwood Shores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc.
Represented By: John H McDowell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Toshiba America Information Systems Inc
Represented By: Doris Johnson Hines
Represented By: John Michael Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: VIZIO, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Christian Koole
Represented By: Adrian M Pruetz
Represented By: Avraham Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: ViewSonic Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth Robert Adamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Hon. David Folsom
Represented By: David Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Lochner Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Marc A Fenster
Represented By: Fredricka Ung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lochner Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Marc A Fenster
Represented By: Stanley H Thompson, Jr
Represented By: Fredricka Ung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?