Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc. v Ego Premium Liquids, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Ego Premium Liquids Inc and Ahmad Abufarie
Case Number: 8:2014cv00269
Filed: February 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2014 Filing 27 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (twdb)
June 19, 2014 Filing 26 DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Related to: MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Ego Premium Liquids, Inc. and Ahmad Abufarie #22 . Starbuzz shall have and recover from Defendants statutory damages in the amount of $3,000 for infringement of Starbuzzs trademarks.( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (twdb)
June 19, 2014 Filing 25 PERMANENT INJUNCTION filed by Judge Cormac J. Carney against defendants Ahmad Abufarie, Ego Premium Liquids Inc. (twdb)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #22 Motion for Default Judgment. As stated in the Judgment issued concurrently with this order, Starbuzz shall recover statutory damages in the amount of $3,000. Additionally, Starbuzzs request for a permanent injunction against Defendants is GRANTED, as specified in the Permanent Injunction issued herewith. (twdb)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Continuing Hearing Date on Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment [filed 4/28/14] #22 .( Motion hearing continued to 6/23/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney.) (twdb)
April 28, 2014 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Amended MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Ego Premium Liquids, Inc. and Ahmad Abufarie filed by Plaintiff Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/2/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amended Jerisat Declaration, #2 Declaration Amended Elhalwani Declaration, #3 Proposed Order Amended Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Order Amended Proposed Judgment)(Jerisat, Martin)
April 24, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Ego Premium Liquids, Inc. and Ahmad Abufarie filed by Plaintiff Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/5/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin E. Jerisat, #2 Declaration of Wael S. Elhalwani, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Judgment)(Jerisat, Martin)
March 31, 2014 Filing 19 DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED as to *Ahmad Abufarie* (lwag) Modified on 4/1/2014 to correct the party name(lwag).
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Cormac J. Carney, ORDERING Motion for Extension of Time submitted by Defendant Ahmad Abufarie received on 03/25/14 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Local Rule 11-4.1 No copy provided for Judge; FRCvP Rule 5(d) No proof of service; Corporation must be represented by counsel. (nbo)
March 28, 2014 Filing 18 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Ahmad Abufarie Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc. filed by Starbuzz Tobacco Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.. (Jerisat, Martin)
March 27, 2014 Filing 17 DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED as to *Defendant Ego Premium Liquids Inc* (twdb)
March 26, 2014 Filing 16 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Ego Premiun Liquids, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.. Request set for hearing on 3/31/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Jerisat, Martin)
March 13, 2014 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc., upon Defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Original Summons NOT returned. (Jerisat, Martin)
March 13, 2014 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.. correcting Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #12 (Jerisat, Martin)
March 11, 2014 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc., upon Defendant Ego Premiun Liquids, Inc. served on 3/5/2014, answer due 3/26/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ahmad Abufarie, Owner Authorized to Receive in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Jerisat, Martin)
March 11, 2014 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc., upon Defendant Ahmad Abufarie served on 3/6/2014, answer due 3/27/2014. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Jerisat, Martin)
February 26, 2014 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ahmad Abufarie. (mba)
February 26, 2014 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ego Premiun Liquids, Inc. (mba)
February 26, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (mba)
February 26, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (mba)
February 25, 2014 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.. (Jerisat, Martin)
February 25, 2014 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.. (Jerisat, Martin)
February 25, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc., identifying None. (Jerisat, Martin)
February 25, 2014 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.. (Jerisat, Martin)
February 25, 2014 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.. (Jerisat, Martin)
February 25, 2014 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.. (Jerisat, Martin)
February 25, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-13421480 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Attorney Martin E Jerisat added to party Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.(pty:bkmov))(Jerisat, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc. v Ego Premium Liquids, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ego Premium Liquids Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmad Abufarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starbuzz Tobacco, Inc.
Represented By: Martin E Jerisat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?